Xia v. Kang Lan Medical PLLC et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Cheryl L Pollak |
Referred: | Cheryl L Pollak |
Case #: | 1:15-cv-06440 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Nov 10, 2015 |
Terminated: | Mar 28, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday May 08, 2016 4:20 AM EDT |
Defendant
Jane Doe
|
|
Defendant
John Doe
|
|
Defendant
Kang Lan Medical PLLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Summer R. Zhang
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Doe and Jane Doe #1-10
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Zheng Ji Xia
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
37 | 37
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 03/28 9:51 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE, this action be and the same hereby is discontinued with prejudice, as against all Defts, without costs to either party as against the other except if provided otherwise in a settlement agreement. (So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 3/27/2017). (Galeano, Sonia) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
36 | 36
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 03/27 2:54 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by John Doe and Jane Doe #1-10, Kang Lan Medical PLLC, Hao Zhang, Summer R. Zhang (Boyd, Patrick) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
order
Order on Motion for Settlement
Mon 03/13 4:31 PM
ORDER granting29 re34 : Having reviewed plaintiffs' submission and the revised settlement agreement, conducted a fairness hearing with the parties, and being familiar with the issues involved in this case, the Court finds the settlement and amount allocated to attorneys' fees as indicated in the revised settlement agreement to be fair and reasonable under all the factors and hereby approves the settlement. The parties are directed to file a stipulation of dismissal by April 12, 2017 . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 3/13/2017. (Caggiano, Diana) |
|
Thursday, March 09, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
misc
Settlement Agreement
Thu 03/09 11:03 AM
SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT by John Doe and Jane Doe #1-10, Kang Lan Medical PLLC, Hao Zhang, Summer R. Zhang (Li, William) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit | ||
Monday, February 27, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
minutes
Settlement Conference
Mon 02/27 12:06 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for Fairness Hearing re29 proceeding held before MJ Pollak on 2/27/2017. Fairness hearing held. Parties to submit revised settlement agreement by 3/13/17 . (Tape #10:32-10:44) (Caggiano, Diana) |
|
Friday, February 24, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
order
Order(Other)
Fri 02/24 3:11 PM
ORDER re29 : Accordingly, the parties should be prepared to discuss these issues at the fairness hearing on February 27, 2017. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 2/24/2017. (Singer, Jacob) |
|
Thursday, February 16, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
motion
Appear by Telephone
Thu 02/16 3:44 PM
Motion to Appear by Telephone by John Doe and Jane Doe #1-10, Kang Lan Medical PLLC, Hao Zhang, Summer R. Zhang. (Li, William) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Appear by Telephone
Thu 02/16 3:57 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting31 : The fairness hearing scheduled for 2/27/2017 will proceed by telephone. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 2/16/2017. (Singer, Jacob) |
||
Wednesday, February 15, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Wed 02/15 2:39 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak for all further proceedings. Judge Carol Bagley Amon no longer assigned to case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Lee, Tiffeny) |
|
utility
Case No Longer Referred
Wed 02/15 2:37 PM
Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. (Lee, Tiffeny) |
||
Monday, February 13, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Settlement
Mon 02/13 3:42 PM
Letter MOTION for Settlement Approval by Zheng Ji Xia. (Liu, Keli) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A. Settlement Agreement, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B. Bill | ||
order
~Util - Set Hearings
Mon 02/13 4:44 PM
ELECTRONIC SCHEDULING ORDER re29 : A fairness hearing before the undersigned is scheduled on February 27, 2017 at 10:30 a.m. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 2/13/2017. (Singer, Jacob) |
||
Tuesday, February 07, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Tue 02/07 1:01 PM
ENDORSED LETTER ORDER granting26 Motion for Extension of Time to File - 2/13/17 . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 2/7/2017. (Caggiano, Diana) |
|
Monday, February 06, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Mon 02/06 6:18 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Zheng Ji Xia. (Liu, Keli) |
|
26 | 26
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Mon 02/06 6:10 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Settlement Documents for Approval by Zheng Ji Xia. (Liu, Keli) |
|
Tuesday, January 31, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Tue 01/31 2:06 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting25 Motion for Extension of Time to File. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 1/31/2017. (Caggiano, Diana) |
||
Monday, January 30, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Mon 01/30 6:14 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File To submit settlement agreement for approval by Kang Lan Medical PLLC, Hao Zhang, Summer R. Zhang. (Li, William) |
|
Thursday, January 05, 2017 | ||
adr
Report of Mediation(Settled/Unsettled)
Thu 01/05 9:41 AM
REPORT of Mediation settled. Both parties must submit a Mediation Report which can be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. The Mediation Report must be e-mailed to Robyn Weinstein at Robyn_Weinstein@nyed.uscourts.gov within two weeks following mediation session.Mediation Report Questionnaires due by 1/19/2017. (Weinstein, Robyn) |
||
Wednesday, December 21, 2016 | ||
24 | 24
order
Order(Other)
Wed 12/21 11:22 AM
ENDORSED LETTER ORDER re23 Request granted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 12/21/2016. (Caggiano, Diana) |
|
Tuesday, December 20, 2016 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Letter
Tue 12/20 9:57 AM
Letter Informing Court of Settlement in Principle by John Doe and Jane Doe #1-10, Kang Lan Medical PLLC, Hao Zhang, Summer R. Zhang (Li, William) |
|
Monday, October 31, 2016 | ||
adr
Selection of Mediator
Mon 10/31 2:49 PM
SELECTION OF MEDIATOR Marjorie E. Berman selected as Mediator. The first mediation session will take place at a date and time to be agreed upon by the parties. Fourteen days on or before the session date, counsel shall file with the Mediator their client's mediation statement summarizing the facts, legal issues, particulars of any prior settlement discussions, and the name and title of the client or client representative with full settlement authority who will attend the mediation in person. Attendance in person is required of the trial attorney, insurance adjuster, and client or client representative with full settlement authority. The Confidentiality Stipulation must be signed at the mediation session by all participants and the Mediator and returned to Robyn Weinstein, ADR Administrator, Robyn_Weinstein@nyed.uscourts.gov or fax (718) 613-2333. Contact information for the Mediator is on the docket sheet. Upon completion of the mediation, both parties must submit a Mediation Report which can be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. The Mediation Report must be e-mailed to Robyn Weinstein at Robyn_Weinstein@nyed.uscourts.gov within two weeks following mediation session.Report of Mediation due by 12/26/2016. (Weinstein, Robyn) |
||
Thursday, October 13, 2016 | ||
adr
Mediation Instructions
Thu 10/13 8:49 AM
MEDIATION INSTRUCTIONS for Counsel are available at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. Counsel are to select a mediator, schedule the first mediation session, and file the name of the mediator, date, time and place of the first mediation session via CM/ECF using the event Selection of Mediator. For a list of the EDNY Mediators and their qualifications, see the Court's website at https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr/Mediation/displayAll.cfm. EDNY Mediators are compensated in accordance with EDNY Local Civil Rule 83.8(f)(1)[formerly EDNY Local Civil Rule 83.11(f)(1)]. The Confidentiality Stipulation must be signed at the mediation session by all participants, including the mediator, and sent via email to Robyn_Weinstein@nyed.uscourts.gov. The Confidentiality Stipulation is available at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. Upon completion of the mediation, both parties must submit a Mediation Report which can be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. The Mediation Report must be e-mailed to Robyn Weinstein at Robyn_Weinstein@nyed.uscourts.gov within two weeks following mediation session. (Weinstein, Robyn) |
||
Wednesday, October 12, 2016 | ||
22 | 22
minutes
Settlement Conference
Wed 10/12 9:20 AM
MINUTE ENTRY for Settlement Conference proceeding held before MJ Pollak on 10/11/2016. Case to be sent to mediation. (Caggiano, Diana) |
|
order
Order Referring Case to Mediation
Wed 10/12 9:24 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Mediation shall be completed by 12/12/16. Selection of Mediator (FLSA mediation panel) due by 10/31/2016. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 10/12/2016. (Caggiano, Diana) |
||
Friday, September 02, 2016 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference ~Util - Set Hearings
Fri 09/02 3:17 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting21 Motion to Adjourn Conference. Settlement Conference adjourned to 10/11/2016 @ 3:30 PM. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 9/2/2016. (Caggiano, Diana) |
||
Thursday, September 01, 2016 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Adjourn Conference
Thu 09/01 3:50 PM
MOTION to Adjourn Conference Settlement Conference by Kang Lan Medical PLLC, Hao Zhang, Summer R. Zhang. (Li, William) |
|
Thursday, July 28, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Thu 07/28 5:17 PM
ANSWER to19 Amended Complaint by Kang Lan Medical PLLC, Summer R. Zhang. (Li, William) |
|
Monday, July 11, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 07/11 5:31 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against John Doe and Jane Doe #1-10, Kang Lan Medical PLLC, Summer R. Zhang, filed by Zheng Ji Xia. (Liu, Keli) |
|
Att: 1 Stipulation to Amendment | ||
Friday, June 24, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Letter
Fri 06/24 12:43 PM
Letter in Reply to Defendants' Response to Motion by Zheng Ji Xia (Liu, Keli) |
|
Thursday, June 23, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
respm
Response to Motion
Thu 06/23 4:24 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re16 Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference filed by All Defendants. (Li, William) |
|
Friday, June 10, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Adjourn Conference
Fri 06/10 3:39 PM
Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Zheng Ji Xia. (Liu, Keli) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference ~Util - Set Hearings
Fri 06/10 3:53 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting16 Motion to Adjourn Conference: The settlement conference previously scheduled for 6/14/16 at 10:00 a.m. is adjourned to 9/8/2016 @ 11:00 AM . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 6/10/2016. (Williams, Stefanie) |
||
Monday, March 28, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
minutes
Initial Conference Hearing ~Util - Set Hearings
Mon 03/28 12:55 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for Initial Conference proceeding held before MJ Pollak on 3/28/2016. Parties to exchange discovery requests by 4/29/16 - response 5/31/16. Settlement Conference set for 6/14/2016 @ 10:00 AM. (Caggiano, Diana) |
|
Wednesday, March 23, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Adjourn Conference
Wed 03/23 9:34 AM
First MOTION to Adjourn Conference Initial Conference by John Doe and Jane Doe #1-10, Kang Lan Medical PLLC, Summer R. Zhang. (Li, William) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference ~Util - Set Hearings
Wed 03/23 12:40 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting14 Motion to Adjourn Conference. Initial Conference adjourned to 3/28/2016 @ 11:00 AM. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 3/23/2016. (Caggiano, Diana) |
||
Tuesday, March 22, 2016 | ||
notice
Notice of Hearing
Tue 03/22 11:35 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE: The initial conference previously scheduled for 3/23/16 before MJ Pollak has been rescheduled to 3/24/2016 @ 11:30 AM. (Caggiano, Diana) |
||
Thursday, March 10, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 03/10 6:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Keli Liu on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Liu, Keli) |
|
Wednesday, February 10, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Status Report
Wed 02/10 4:59 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint status letter by John Doe and Jane Doe #1-10, Kang Lan Medical PLLC, Summer R. Zhang (Li, William) |
|
Tuesday, February 09, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 02/09 10:14 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference set for 3/23/2016 @ 4:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 2/9/2016. (Caggiano, Diana) |
|
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 02/09 9:46 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by All Defendants. (Li, William) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 02/09 9:42 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by John Doe and Jane Doe #1-10, Kang Lan Medical PLLC, Summer R. Zhang (Li, William) |
|
Tuesday, January 26, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 01/26 11:02 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zheng Ji Xia. Kang Lan Medical PLLC served on 11/18/2015, answer due 12/9/2015. (Liu, Keli) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 01/26 10:58 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zheng Ji Xia. Summer R. Zhang served on 11/18/2015, answer due 12/9/2015. (Liu, Keli) |
|
order
Status Report Order
Tue 01/26 12:48 PM
ELECTRONIC STATUS REPORT ORDER: The parties are directed to provide a status letter to this Court within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Status Report due by 2/26/2016 . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 1/26/2016. (Caggiano, Diana) |
||
Wednesday, December 16, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 12/16 3:45 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick J Boyd on behalf of Kang Lan Medical PLLC, Summer R. Zhang (aty to be noticed) (Boyd, Patrick) |
|
Monday, November 30, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 11/30 5:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by William Kaining Li on behalf of John Doe and Jane Doe #1-10, Kang Lan Medical PLLC, Summer R. Zhang (aty to be noticed) (Li, William) |
|
Thursday, November 12, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Thu 11/12 3:04 PM
Summons Issued as to Kang Lan Medical PLLC, Summer R. Zhang. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Thu 11/12 3:03 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Thu 11/12 3:01 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 11/12 3:01 PM
Case Assigned to Chief Judge Carol Bagley Amon and Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) |
||
Tuesday, November 10, 2015 | ||
1 | 1
20
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 11/10 6:00 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-8161274 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Zheng Ji Xia. (Hang, Jian) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Proposed Summons |