Nevada District Court
Judge:Howard D Mckibben
Referred: Lawrence R Leavitt
Case #: 2:97-cv-00911
Nature of Suit140 Contract - Negotiable Instrument
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Negotiable Instrument
Case Filed:Jul 18, 1997
Terminated:Nov 10, 1997

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, November 12, 2021
23 23 1 pgs order Order Fri 11/12 5:03 PM
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Judgment in favor of MGM Grand Hotel, LLC dba MGM GRAND HOTEL/CASINO and against Paulo Sergio Ribeiro, a/k/a Paulo F. Ribeiro, a/k/a Paulo S. Ribeiro, be renewed and extended for six years from the date of entry of this order. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 11/12/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - YAW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 11, 2021
22 22 misc Proposed Order Submission Thu 11/11 2:58 PM
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on21 Affidavit by Plaintiff MGM Grand Hotel, LLC. (Whitworth, Scott)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Affidavit Thu 11/11 2:51 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Renewal of Judgment re20 Order, by Plaintiff MGM Grand Hotel, LLC. (Whitworth, Scott)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 13, 2015
20 20 order Order Fri 11/13 3:24 PM
ORDER re16 , 27 Affidavits of Renewal of Judgment. ORDERED that the Judgment in favor of Plaintiff, MGM Grand Hotel, Inc. dba MGM Grand Hotel/Casino, and against Defendant, Paulo Sergio Ribeiro aka Paulo F. Ribeiro aka Paulo S. Ribeiro, is hereby renewed and extended for six years from November 11, 2015. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 11/13/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 11, 2015
19 19 respm Proposed Order Submission Wed 11/11 2:32 PM
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER re:16 and17 AFFIDAVIT of Renewal of Judgment; filed by Plaintiff MGM Grand Hotel, LLC. (Newman, Craig)
Related: [-]
18 18 service Certificate of Service Wed 11/11 2:26 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for16 Affidavit,17 Affidavit by Plaintiff MGM Grand Hotel, LLC. (Newman, Craig)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Affidavit Wed 11/11 12:53 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Renewal of Judgment by Plaintiff MGM Grand Hotel, LLC. (Newman, Craig)
Related: [-]
16 16 20 pgs misc Affidavit Wed 11/11 12:51 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Application for Renewal of Judgment by Plaintiff MGM Grand Hotel, LLC. (Newman, Craig)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 16, 2009
14 14 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER filed by Plaintiff MGM Grand Hotel, LLC. (Peterman, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 13, 2009
15 15 ORDER Granting13 Motion Renew of Judgment. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the judgment in favor of MGM Grand Hotel, LLC, f/k/a MGM Grand Hotel, Inc., d/b/a MGM Grand Hotel/Casino and against Paulo Sergio Ribeiro, a/k/a Paulo S. Ribeiro, a/k/a Paulo F. Ribeiro, be renewed and extended for six years from the date of entry of this order. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 11/13/2009. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 11, 2009
13 13 8 pgs MOTION for Renewal of Judgment by Plaintiff MGM Grand Hotel, LLC. (Peterman, Thomas) Event type corrected on 11/12/09. (MJZ)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 10, 2003
12 12 ORDER ORD: Jdgmnt in favor of P & against D shall be RENEWED and EXTND'D for 6 yrs from EOD. cps dis
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 05, 2003
11 11 MOTION FOR MISCELLANEOUS RELIEF APPLICATION for renewal of judgment obo P(DISPO: ord #12 GRNTD (Entered: 11/05/2003)
Related: [-]