AFZAL v. BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Madeline Cox Arleo |
Referred: | Leda D Wettre |
Case #: | 2:15-cv-08009 |
Nature of Suit | 385 Torts - Personal Property - Property Damage Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud |
Case Filed: | Nov 10, 2015 |
Re-opened: | Dec 09, 2020 |
Terminated: | Dec 09, 2020 |
Last checked: Sunday May 08, 2016 5:32 AM EDT |
Defendant
BAVARIAN MOTOR WORKS
|
|
Defendant
BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Notice Only
PHV BENJAMIN SIMINOU
|
|
Plaintiff
DAVID AFZAL
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Tuesday, January 05, 2021 | ||
205 | 205
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 01/05 12:08 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AND WITHOUT COSTS re204 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 1/5/2021. (bt, ) |
|
Monday, January 04, 2021 | ||
204 | 204
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal (aty)
Mon 01/04 8:32 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice and Without Attorneys'' Fees or Costs by DAVID AFZAL, ANDY DECHARTIVONG. (GREENBERG, BRUCE) |