Lube Aggregator, Inc.
Member Case
Lead case is: 5:15-bk-52722
Lead case is: 5:15-bk-52722
Ohio Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Alan M Koschik |
Case #: | 5:15-bk-52724 |
Case Filed: | Nov 16, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jun 28, 2019 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Lube Aggregator, Inc.
101 Chestnut Ave
Sharon, PA 16146-1751 |
Represented By
|
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 6:07 PM EDT |
Friday, June 28, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Final Decree Issued. Case Closed. (kdege) |
|
Wednesday, January 06, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual Filed by Debtor Lube Aggregator, Inc. . (Kaczka, Michael aty) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Schedules A-J AND SUMMARY OF SCHEDULES Filed by Debtor Lube Aggregator, Inc. . (Kaczka, Michael aty) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, November 19, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Notice of Order on Motion for Joint Administration w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 11/19/2015. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, November 17, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Order of Joint Administration Signed on 11/17/2015 |
|
court
Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched No Notice
Tue 11/17 7:50 AM
Initial Chapter 11 Status Conference and First Day Motions Hearing scheduled for 11/17/2015 at 02:30 PM at 260 Fed Bldg Akron. (bhemi) |
||
Monday, November 16, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Motion for Joint Administration and II Approving Caption for Jointly Administered Cases Filed by Debtor Lube Aggregator, Inc. (Opincar, Scott aty) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
3 | 3
![]() Corporate Resolution Filed by Debtor Lube Aggregator, Inc.. (Opincar, Scott aty) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Declaration Re: Electronic Filing Filed by Debtor Lube Aggregator, Inc.. (Opincar, Scott aty) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Lube Aggregator, Inc. Chapter 11 Plan due by 03/15/2016. Disclosure Statement due by 03/15/2016. Corporate Ownership Statement Due by 11/16/2015. Atty Disclosure Statement due 11/30/2015. Attorney Signature Exhibit B due 11/30/2015. Attorney Signature Page 2 due 11/30/2015. Balance Sheet due by 11/30/2015. Declaration and Signature of Non-Attorney due by 11/30/2015. Cash Flow Statement due by 11/30/2015. Debtor Signature re: Relief Availability due 11/30/2015. Employee Income Record due by 11/30/2015. Inventory of Property due 11/30/2015.Means Test Form Due: 11/30/2015. Schedule A due 11/30/2015. Schedule B due 11/30/2015. Schedule C due 11/30/2015. Schedule D due 11/30/2015. Schedule E due 11/30/2015. Schedule F due 11/30/2015. Schedule G due 11/30/2015. Schedule H due 11/30/2015. Schedule I due 11/30/2015. Schedule J due 11/30/2015. Schedules A-J due 11/30/2015. Statement of Financial Affairs due 11/30/2015. Statement of Operations due by 11/30/2015. Summary of schedules due 11/30/2015. Incomplete Filings due by 11/30/2015. (Opincar, Scott aty) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Mon 11/16 2:59 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 15-52724 [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 32858285. Fee amount 1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |