Member Case
Lead case is: 5:15-bk-52722

Ohio Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Alan M Koschik
Case #: 5:15-bk-52734
Case Filed:Nov 16, 2015
Terminated:Jun 28, 2019

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
QSL Intellectual Properties, Inc.
101 Chestnut Ave
Sharon, PA 16146-1751
Represented By
Scott N. Opincar
Mcdonald Hopkins LLC
contact info

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 6:07 PM EDT
Friday, June 28, 2019
9 9 court Close Bankruptcy Case Fri 06/28 2:49 PM
Final Decree Issued. Case Closed. (bhemi)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 06, 2016
8 8 misc Statement of Financial Affairs Wed 01/06 7:47 PM
Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual Filed by Debtor QSL Intellectual Properties, Inc. Related [+]. (Kaczka, Michael aty)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
7 7 misc Schedules A-J Wed 01/06 7:46 PM
Schedules A-J AND SUMMARY OF SCHEDULES Filed by Debtor QSL Intellectual Properties, Inc. Related [+]. (Kaczka, Michael aty)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Att: 1 GLOBAL NOTES
Thursday, November 19, 2015
6 6 BNC Notice of Order on Motion for Joint Administration Fri 11/20 12:24 AM
Notice of Order on Motion for Joint Administration w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 11/19/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5
Tuesday, November 17, 2015
5 5 order Joint Administration Tue 11/17 4:51 PM
Order of Joint Administration -- Docket all Pleadings and Claims in Lead Case Number 15-52722 Related [+]. (spete crt)
Related: [-] 4 Motion for Joint Administration
court Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched No Notice Tue 11/17 8:18 AM
Initial Chapter 11 Status Conference and First Day Motions Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 11/17/2015 at 02:30 PM at 260 Fed Bldg Akron. (bhemi)
Related: [-] 4 Motion for Joint Administration
Monday, November 16, 2015
4 4 motion Joint Administration Mon 11/16 11:54 PM
Motion for Joint Administration for an Order (I) Directing Joint Administration of Cases; and (II) Approving Caption for Jointly Administered Cases Filed by Debtor QSL Intellectual Properties, Inc. (Opincar, Scott aty)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
3 3 misc Corporate Resolution Mon 11/16 8:32 PM
Corporate Resolution Filed by Debtor QSL Intellectual Properties, Inc.. (Opincar, Scott aty)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Declaration Re: Electronic Filing Mon 11/16 8:28 PM
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing Filed by Debtor QSL Intellectual Properties, Inc.. (Opincar, Scott aty)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Mon 11/16 5:25 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by QSL Intellectual Properties, Inc. Chapter 11 Plan due by 03/15/2016. Disclosure Statement due by 03/15/2016. Corporate Ownership Statement Due by 11/16/2015. Atty Disclosure Statement due 11/30/2015. Attorney Signature Exhibit B due 11/30/2015. Attorney Signature Page 2 due 11/30/2015. Balance Sheet due by 11/30/2015. Declaration and Signature of Non-Attorney due by 11/30/2015. Cash Flow Statement due by 11/30/2015. Debtor Signature re: Relief Availability due 11/30/2015. Employee Income Record due by 11/30/2015. Inventory of Property due 11/30/2015.Means Test Form Due: 11/30/2015. Schedule A due 11/30/2015. Schedule B due 11/30/2015. Schedule C due 11/30/2015. Schedule D due 11/30/2015. Schedule E due 11/30/2015. Schedule F due 11/30/2015. Schedule G due 11/30/2015. Schedule H due 11/30/2015. Schedule I due 11/30/2015. Schedule J due 11/30/2015. Schedules A-J due 11/30/2015. Statement of Financial Affairs due 11/30/2015. Statement of Operations due by 11/30/2015. Summary of schedules due 11/30/2015. Incomplete Filings due by 11/30/2015. (Opincar, Scott aty)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Verification of Consolidated Matrix
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Mon 11/16 5:26 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 15-52734 [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 32860354. Fee amount 1717.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1