California Central District Court
Judge:Dolly M Gee
Referred: Shashi H Kewalramani
Case #: 2:15-cv-08850
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Nov 13, 2015
Terminated:Nov 20, 2015
Last checked: Wednesday May 11, 2016 2:14 AM PDT
Defendant
Sally C. Reason
Plaintiff
Ricardo Jose Calderon Lopez
P.O. Box 352
Pacific Palisades, CA 90272


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, July 10, 2023
23 23 appeal USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order Tue 07/11 11:04 AM
ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,19 filed by Ricardo Jose Calderon Lopez. CCA # 23-55393 Pursuant to Ninth Circuit Rule 42-1, this appeal is dismissed for failure to prosecute. This order served on the district court shall, 21 days after the date of the order, act as the mandate of this court.(mat)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 04, 2023
22 22 appeal USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order Thu 05/04 12:23 PM
ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,19 filed by Ricardo Jose Calderon Lopez. CCA # 23-55393 A review of this court's docket reflects that the filing and docketing fees for this appeal remain due. Within 21 days after the date of this order, appellant shall pay to the district court the $505.00 filing and docketing fees for this appeal and file in this court proof of such payment or file in this court a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. [See Order for further information.] (car)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 28, 2023
21 21 appeal USCA Notification of Case Number Mon 05/01 8:01 AM
NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 23-55393 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,19 as to Plaintiff Ricardo Jose Calderon Lopez. (mat)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 27, 2023
20 20 appeal Filing Fee Letter (A-15CV) Thu 04/27 3:17 PM
FILING FEE LETTER issued as to plaintiff Ricardo Jose Calderon Lopez, re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,19 . (mat)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 26, 2023
19 19 appeal Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals Thu 04/27 3:07 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by Plaintiff Ricardo Jose Calderon Lopez. Appeal of Order on Motion to Reopen Case, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Order on Motion for Order,18 Filed On: 4/7/23; Entered On: 4/10/23; Filing fee $ 505. Billed. (mat)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 07, 2023
18 18 order Reopen Case Amend/Correct For Order Mon 04/10 10:09 AM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REOPEN15 AND TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT17 by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Plaintiff's motions to reopen and to amend his complaint are respectfully DENIED. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (rolm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 06, 2023
16 16 transfer Reassignment of Case Due to Unavailability of Judicial Officer (MJ) (G-74) - optional html form Thu 04/06 2:23 PM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE due to Unavailability of Judicial Officer filed. The previously assigned Magistrate Judge is no longer available. Pursuant to directive of the Chief Magistrate Judge and in accordance with the rules of this Court, the case has been returned to the Clerk for reassignment. This case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for all proceedings in accordance with General Order 05-07. Case number will now read as 2:15-cv-08850 DMG(SHK). (rn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 05, 2023
17 17 motion Amend/Correct Order Thu 04/06 9:27 PM
MOTION to File First Amended and Reclassify the Complaint to Criminal C.C.P. Sections 472(a), 473(b); 403.10, 403.020(b), 403.040 filed by Plaintiff Ricardo Jose Calderon Lopez. (gk)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 01, 2023
15 15 motion Reopen Case Mon 04/03 9:01 PM
EX PARTE MOTION to Reopen Case filed by Plaintiff Ricardo Jose Calderon Lopez. (gk)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 13, 2016
14 14 1 pgs appeal USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order Tue 06/14 2:35 PM
ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals9 filed by Ricardo J Calderon Lopez. CCA # 16-55251 This appeal is dismissed for failure to pay the docketing/filing fees in this case. This order served on the district court shall constitute the mandate of this court.(mat)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 18, 2016
13 13 2 pgs appeal USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order Thu 05/19 1:37 PM
ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals9 filed by Ricardo Jose Calderon Lopez. CCA # 16-55251 All requests for injunctive relief in appellant's March 16, 2016 filing are denied. Appellant's motion to proceed in forma pauperis is denied because we find that the appeal is frivolous. [See document for all details] (mat)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 22, 2016
12 12 9 pgs appeal USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order Tue 02/23 8:30 AM
ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals9 filed by Ricardo Jose Calderon Lopez. CCA # 16-55251 A review of the docket reflects that appellant has not paid the docketing and filing fees for this appeal. Within 21 days from the date of this order, appellant shall: [See document] If appellant fails to comply with this order, this appeal will be dismissed automatically by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. [See document for all details] (mat)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 19, 2016
11 11 appeal 9th CCA Assigned Case Number Notice Mon 02/22 10:14 AM
NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 16-55251 9th Circuit regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals9 as to Plaintiff Ricardo Jose Calderon Lopez. (mat)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 18, 2016
10 10 appeal Filing Fee Letter (A-15CV) Thu 02/18 4:51 PM
FILING FEE LETTER issued as to Plaintiff Ricardo Jose Calderon Lopez, re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals9 . (mat)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 05, 2016
8 8 order Reconsideration Tue 01/05 4:05 PM
MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION by Judge Dolly M. Gee: This matter is before the Court on Plaintiff Ricardo Jose Calderon Lopez's motion for reconsideration of the Court's 11/20/2015 Order denying his request to proceed in forma pauperis and dismissing the case5 . The Court DENIES Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration6 . The 1/8/2016 hearing is hereby VACATED. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 17, 2015
7 7 order Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order - Rejecting (CV 104A) Thu 12/17 4:56 PM
NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Judge Dolly M. Gee, ORDERING Petition for writ of mandamus submitted by Plaintiff Ricardo Jose Calderon Lopez received on 12/16/2015 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: Case Closed. Plaintiff should confer with pro se legal clinic if what he seeks is review of a termination of Social Security benefits. Check Court website for pro se legal clinic hours. (iv)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 30, 2015
6 6 motion Reconsideration Mon 11/30 4:45 PM
MOTION for Reconsideration re5 filed by Plaintiff Ricardo Jose Calderon Lopez. Motion set for hearing on 1/8/2016 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (gk)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 20, 2015
5 5 order Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60) Mon 11/23 9:45 AM
ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Denying3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is hereby DISMISSED. IT WAS RECOMMENDED that the Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis be DENIED by Magistrate Judge Jay C. Gandhi. Reasons: Legally and/or factually patently frivolous. Immunity as to Defendant ALJ Sally C. Reason. ( MD JS-6, Case Terminated. ) (gk)
Related: [-]
reportrecommend Report and Recommendation (Miscellaneous) Fri 11/20 3:10 PM
RECOMMENDATION issued by Magistrate Judge Jay C. Gandhi re REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support3 . Proposed Order forwarded to the District Judge for approval. (kh)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 13, 2015
4 4 notice Notice of Reference to a US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) - optional html form Mon 11/16 8:58 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and referred to Magistrate Judge Jay C. Gandhi. (esa)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60) Mon 11/16 8:57 AM
REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Ricardo Jose Calderon Lopez. (esa)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 11/16 8:56 AM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Plaintiff Ricardo Jose Calderon Lopez. (esa)
Related: [-]
1 1 70 pgs cmp Complaint - (Referred) Mon 11/16 8:53 AM
COMPLAINT filed against defendant Sally C. Reason Case assigned to Judge Dolly M. Gee and referred to Magistrate Judge Jay C. Gandhi, filed by plaintiff Ricardo Jose Calderon Lopez. (esa) (esa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (11/16/2015) summons not issued