Minnesota District Court
Judge:Wilhelmina M Wright
Referred: Becky R Thorson
Case #: 0:15-cv-04151
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Nov 17, 2015
Terminated:Oct 10, 2017
Last checked: Sunday May 15, 2016 3:20 AM CDT
Defendant
John Roberts Company, Inc., The
Represented By
Hannah J Woolsey
Foley & Mansfield, Pllp
contact info
Thomas A Harder
Foley & Mansfield, Pllp
contact info
Plaintiff
Bernard Palmer
760 89th Ave NW
Coon Rapids, MN 55433
Represented By
John J Steffenhagen
Hellmuth & Johnson PLLC
contact info
Brian N Niemczyk
Hellmuth & Johnson PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, October 11, 2017
50 50 order Judgment (Clerk's Office Only) Wed 10/11 1:21 PM
JUDGMENT(kt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Notice - appeal
Tuesday, October 10, 2017
49 49 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 10/10 2:32 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 10/10/2017. (TJB)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2017
48 48 misc Proposed Order to Judge re Stipluation Fri 10/06 4:15 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re47 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Niemczyk, Brian)
Related: [-]
47 47 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 10/06 4:14 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Bernard Palmer. Jointly Signed by Bernard Palmer and The John Roberts Company, Inc.. (Niemczyk, Brian)
Related: [-]