Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:15-bk-41395

Ohio Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Kay Woods
Case #: 4:15-ap-04054
Nature of Suit63 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(8), student loan
Case Filed:Nov 17, 2015
Terminated:Jan 30, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
GREAT LAKES EDUCATIONAL SERVICES INC
4400 Easton Commons Way Suite 125
Columbus, OH 43219
Represented By
GREAT LAKES EDUCATIONAL SERVICES INC
contact info
Defendant
Navient
50 W. Broad Street Suite 1800
Columbus, OH 43215
Represented By
Navient
contact info
Defendant
SLM Private Credit Student Loan
1100 Superior Avenue 19th Floor
Cleveland, OH 44114
Represented By
SLM Private Credit Student Loan
contact info
Defendant
U.S. Dept of Ed/GSL/ATL
P.O. Box 4222
Iowa City, IA 52244
Represented By
U.S. Dept of Ed/GSL/ATL
contact info
Defendant
Youngstown State University
606 Wick Avenue
Youngstown, OH 44502
Represented By
Youngstown State University
contact info
Plaintiff
Heather L. Owen
129 Maple Drive
Youngstown, OH 44512
Represented By
Ursula P. Shugart
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Thursday, February 02, 2017
court ADI Returned Mail Thu 02/02 8:30 AM
Returned Mail: Mail originally sent on 01/19/2017 returned as undeliverable. Could not mail Form pdf701 to: U.S. Dept of Ed/GSL/ATL P.O. Box 4222 Iowa City, IA 52244. (ADIrm adi)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 30, 2017
utility Disposition of Adversary Mon 01/30 4:18 PM
Disposition of Adversary 4:15-ap-4054; Order Entered On January 17, 2017 Dismissing Adversary Proceeding. (kmigl)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Mon 01/30 4:19 PM
Adversary Case 4:15-ap-4054 Closed. (kmigl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 19, 2017
28 28 BNC Notice of Order (PDF) Fri 01/20 12:38 AM
Notice of Order (PDF) w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 01/19/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 27
Tuesday, January 17, 2017
27 27 order Order (PDF) Tue 01/17 4:13 PM
Order Granting Motion To Dismiss Adversary. Signed on 1/17/2017 Related [+]. (kmigl crt)
Related: [-] 26 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
26 26 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Tue 01/17 11:43 AM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Without Prejudice Filed by Heather L. Owen (Shugart, Ursula aty)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 30, 2016
court ADI Returned Mail Thu 06/30 8:30 AM
Returned Mail: Mail originally sent on 06/15/2016 returned as undeliverable. Could not mail Form pdf701 to: U.S. Dept of Ed/GSL/ATL P.O. Box 4222 Iowa City, IA 52244. (ADIrm adi)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 15, 2016
25 25 BNC Notice of Order (PDF) Thu 06/16 12:23 AM
Notice of Order (PDF) w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 06/15/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 24
Monday, June 13, 2016
24 24 order Order (PDF) Mon 06/13 2:09 PM
Stipulated And Agreed Order Regarding Defendant, YSU. Signed on 6/13/2016 Related [+]. (kmigl crt)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
court Hearing Held Mon 06/13 2:33 PM
Telephonic Status Conference Held Related [+]. 1) Resolved Regarding Defendant, Youngstown State University - Order To Be Submitted. 2) Parties To Provide A Status To The Court Within 60 Days Regarding Defendant, U. S. Department Of Education. (mjanc)
Related: [-] related document1 Complaint
Monday, May 16, 2016
court ADI Returned Mail Mon 05/16 8:30 AM
Returned Mail: Mail originally sent on 05/04/2016 returned as undeliverable. Could not mail Form pdf701 to: U.S. Dept of Ed/GSL/ATL P.O. Box 4222 Iowa City, IA 52244. (ADIrm adi)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 15, 2016
court ADI Returned Mail Mon 05/16 8:30 AM
Returned Mail: Mail originally sent on 05/01/2016 returned as undeliverable. Could not mail Form 187 to: U.S. Dept of Ed/GSL/ATL P.O. Box 4222 Iowa City, IA 52244. (ADIrm adi)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 13, 2016
court ADI Returned Mail Fri 05/13 8:30 AM
Returned Mail: Mail originally sent on 04/28/2016 returned as undeliverable. Could not mail Form pdf701 to: U.S. Dept of Ed/GSL/ATL P.O. Box 4222 Iowa City, IA 52244. (ADIrm adi)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 04, 2016
23 23 BNC Notice of Order (PDF) Thu 05/05 12:23 AM
Notice of Order (PDF) w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 05/04/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 22
Monday, May 02, 2016
22 22 order Order (PDF) Mon 05/02 2:59 PM
Order Approving Stipulation For Discharge Of Educational Loan Debt Between Plaintiff And Navient Solutions, Inc. And Dismissing Navient And SLM Private Credit Student Loan As Defendants. Signed on 5/2/2016 Related [+]
Related: [-] Related document(s)20 Document filed by Defendant Navient, Defendant SLM Private Credit Student Loan
Sunday, May 01, 2016
21 21 BNC Notice of Hearing Mon 05/02 12:22 AM
Notice of Hearing w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 05/01/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19
Friday, April 29, 2016
20 20 misc Document Fri 04/29 4:13 PM
Document Stipulation for Discharge of Educational Loan Debt Between Plaintiff and Navient Solutions, Inc. and for Dismissal of "Navient" and "SLM Private Credit Student Loan" as Defendants in this Adversary Proceeding Filed by Navient, SLM Private Credit Student Loan Related [+]. (Ulrich, Phyllis aty)
Related: [-] 1
19 19 court Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched w/ Notice Fri 04/29 10:36 AM
Telephonic Status Conference Scheduled To Be Held On 6/13/2016 At 9:30 AM Related [+]. Court To Initiate Call. (mjanc)
Related: [-] related document1 Complaint
Thursday, April 28, 2016
18 18 BNC Notice of Order (PDF) Fri 04/29 12:20 AM
Notice of Order (PDF) w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 04/28/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17
Tuesday, April 26, 2016
17 17 order Order (PDF) Tue 04/26 2:24 PM
Stipulated And Agreed Order Finding Certain Student Loans Dischargeable Held By Defendant/Intervener Educational Credit Management Corporation ("ECMC") Signed on 4/26/2016. Related [+]. (mbokr crt)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Monday, April 04, 2016
16 16 court Certificate of Service Mon 04/04 1:51 PM
Certificate of Service of First Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents Filed by Plaintiff Heather L. Owen Related [+]. (Shugart, Ursula aty)
Related: [-] 12 Certificate of Service
Thursday, March 31, 2016
15 15 misc Document Thu 03/31 3:01 PM
Proposed Discovery Plan of ECMC Filed by Educational Credit Management Corporation. (Coombs, Frederick aty)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 19, 2016
court ADI Returned Mail Fri 02/19 8:30 AM
Returned Mail: Mail originally sent on 02/03/2016 returned as undeliverable. Could not mail Form pdf812 to: U.S. Dept of Ed/GSL/ATL P.O. Box 4222 Iowa City, IA 52244. (ADIrm adi)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 05, 2016
14 14 notice Notice (PDF) Fri 02/05 3:50 PM
Notice of Service of Answers to Defendant Navient Solutions' First set of Interrogatories; Production of Documents; and First set of Request for Admission Filed by Heather L. Owen. (Shugart, Ursula aty)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 03, 2016
13 13 BNC Notice of Order on Motion to Intervene Thu 02/04 12:23 AM
Notice of Order on Motion to Intervene w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 02/03/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10
Monday, February 01, 2016
12 12 misc Certificate of Service Mon 02/01 4:21 PM
Certificate of Service of Discovery Requests Filed by Educational Credit Management Corporation. (Coombs, Frederick aty)
Related: [-]
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 02/01 11:58 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Educational Credit Management Corporation. (Coombs, Frederick aty)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Intervene Mon 02/01 10:55 AM
Order Granting Motion To Intervene and Permitting Educational Credit Management Corporation to File Its Answer Instanter Related [+] Signed on 2/1/2016. (mbokr crt)
Related: [-] 9
Wednesday, January 27, 2016
9 9 motion Intervene Wed 01/27 12:15 PM
Motion to Intervene and for leave to File Answer Instanter Filed by Educational Credit Management Corporation (Coombs, Frederick aty)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A Assignment of Loans
Tuesday, January 19, 2016
8 8 misc Document Tue 01/19 2:32 PM
Document Unilateral Proposed Discovery Plan Filed by Navient, SLM Private Credit Student Loan Related [+]. (Ulrich, Phyllis aty)
Related: [-] 2
Tuesday, December 22, 2015
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 12/22 2:09 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by United States of America, U.S. Dept. of Education, U.S. Dept of Ed/GSL/ATL. (Paffilas, Steven aty)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 18, 2015
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 12/18 11:54 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Youngstown State University. (Baker, Brent aty)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 14, 2015
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 12/14 10:53 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Navient, SLM Private Credit Student Loan. (Ulrich, Phyllis aty)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 10, 2015
4 4 court Correspondence (Public Document) Thu 12/10 2:03 PM
Correspondence Filed By Great Lakes (GLELSI) (Public Document). (kmigl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 18, 2015
3 3 cmp Summons Issued Wed 11/18 10:05 AM
Summons issued on Plaintiff for service on Defendant(s) GREAT LAKES EDUCATIONAL SERVICES INC Answer due 12/18/2015; Navient Answer due 12/18/2015; SLM Private Credit Student Loan Answer due 12/18/2015; U.S. Dept of Ed/GSL/ATL Answer due 12/18/2015; Youngstown State University Answer due 12/18/2015. This Court has adopted a paperless procedure for issuing the summons in an adversary proceeding. The attached summons has been sealed, processed, and docketed by the Clerk. Electronic filers will only receive electronic email notice of this docket entry. No paper copy of the summons will be mailed; it must be printed from CM/ECF. Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 7004(a) and F.R.C.P. 4, it is the responsibility of the plaintiff or plaintiff's counsel to promptly serve the summons, a copy of the complaint, and, if applicable, a copy of any pre-trial or adversary case management order on defendant(s). To be timely, the summons and a copy of the complaint must be served within seven (7) days of issuance per Bankruptcy Rule 7004(e). Service of the summons is prescribed by Bankruptcy Rule 7004 and F.R.C.P. 4. If a summons is not timely served, an ''alias'' summons must be requested from the Clerk. Certification or proof of service by plaintiff or plaintiff's counsel is made by completing the Certificate of Service portion of the original summons. Attorneys should docket the summons, once served, using the Summons Service Executed event within CM/ECF. Related [+] (mbokr)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Heather L. Owen
2 2 order Initial Pretrial and/or Adversary Case Management Wed 11/18 10:03 AM
This Court has adopted a paperless procedure for issuing the pretrial or case management order in an adversary proceeding. The enclosed order has been issued by the Court and electronically placed on the adversary case docket. Electronic filers will only receive electronic email notice of this docket entry. No paper copy of this order will be mailed; it must be printed from CM/ECF. It is the responsibility of the plaintiff or plaintiff's counsel to serve the pretrial or case management order on defendants(s) pursuant to applicable rules and instructions. Initial Pretrial and/or Adversary Case Management Order Signed on 11/18/2015. Related [+]. (mbokr crt)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, November 17, 2015
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 11/17 3:09 PM
Adversary case 15-04054 Complaint by Heather L. Owen against GREAT LAKES EDUCATIONAL SERVICES INC, Navient, SLM Private Credit Student Loan, U.S. Dept of Ed/GSL/ATL, Youngstown State University. Fee Amount $0 Nature of Suit:63 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(8), student loan) (Shugart, Ursula aty)
Related: [-]