South Carolina District Court
Judge:J Michelle Childs
Referred: Paige J Gossett
Case #: 1:15-cv-04697
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights, State Filers
Case Filed:Nov 20, 2015
Terminated:Aug 25, 2017
Last checked: Monday Apr 04, 2016 1:49 PM EDT
Defendant
Aiken Department of Public Safety
Represented By
Daniel C Plyler
Davidson And Lindemann
contact info
Defendant
Aiken, the City of
Represented By
Daniel C Plyler
Davidson And Lindemann
contact info
Defendant
Charles Barranco
Represented By
Daniel C Plyler
Davidson And Lindemann
contact info
Defendant
Jane Doe
Defendant
John Doe
Defendant
Chris Medlin
Represented By
Daniel C Plyler
Davidson And Lindemann
contact info
Defendant
Clark Smith
Represented By
Daniel C Plyler
Davidson And Lindemann
contact info
Plaintiff
Lakeya Hicks
Represented By
Robert V Phillips
Mcgowan Hood And Felder
contact info
Plaintiff
Elijah Pontoon
Represented By
Robert V Phillips
Mcgowan Hood And Felder
contact info


1. South Carolina police sued for illegal public cavity search (chicagotribune.com)
Submitted Mon 04/04/2016
Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, August 25, 2017
69 69 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 08/25 3:47 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with by Aiken Department of Public Safety, Aiken, the City of, Charles Barranco. (Morrison, David)
Related: [-]