Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:15-bk-00076

Alaska Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Herbert A Ross
Case #: 3:15-ap-90018
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Nov 23, 2015
Terminated:Nov 07, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
First National Bank Alaska
Represented By
First National Bank Alaska
contact info
Plaintiff
Nacole M. Jipping(7)
PO Box 110502
Anchorage, AK 99511
Represented By
Cabot C. Christianson
Law Offices Of Cabot Christianson, P.C.
contact info

GPO May 31 2016
Memorandum Decision Regarding Cross-Motions For Summary Judgment. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit F - 2013 Security Agreement) (RE: DE#12 Motion for Summary Judgment, 13 Cross Motion for Summary Judgment).(LD)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:05 PM AKDT
Thursday, November 07, 2019
court Close Adversary Case Thu 11/07 8:22 AM
Adversary Case Closed.(JS)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2019
74 74 misc Satisfaction of Judgment Mon 11/04 10:44 AM
Notice of Satisfaction of Judgment . Related [+]. Filed by Cabot C. Christianson on behalf of Nacole M. Jipping(7).(Christianson, Cabot)
Related: [-] DE#73 Judgment (Adversary) (SA)