Alaska Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Gary Spraker
Case #: 3:15-bk-00076
Case Filed:Mar 31, 2015
Creditor Meeting:Jun 17, 2015
Claims Deadline:Jul 08, 2015
Terminated:Aug 11, 2021

Debtor
Omni Enterprises, Inc.
5326 A St Ste 1
Anchorage, AK 99518-1200
Represented By
Erik LeRoy
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Nacole M. Jipping(7)
PO Box 110502
Anchorage, AK 99511
Represented By
Cabot C. Christianson
Law Offices Of Cabot Christianson, P.C.
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee's Office
605 West 4th Avenue, Suite 203
Anchorage, AK 99501
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee
700 Stewart Street, Suite 5103
Seattle, WA 98101
Represented By
Thomas A. Buford, III
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info

GPO Mar 31 2020
Memorandum on Trustee's Objection to Amended Proof of Claim No. 41. (RE: DE#189 Generic Motion / Application, 190 Objection).(JS)

Docket last updated: 03/31/2015 3:04 PM AKDT
Tuesday, March 31, 2015
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) 15-00076 [misc,volp7] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 1336293. Fee amount 335.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 91 pgs Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $335. Filed by Erik LeRoy on behalf of Omni Enterprises, Inc. (LeRoy, Erik)
Related: [-]
2 2 2 pgs Addendum to Schedules . Filed by Erik LeRoy on behalf of Omni Enterprises, Inc..(LeRoy, Erik)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 4 pgs Sch Petition corp resolution
Att: 2 2 pgs Sch A DOT summary
Att: 3 10 pgs Sch B 13 stock ownership
Att: 4 4 pgs Sch B 16 A/R's
Att: 5 9 pgs Sch B 21 Claim against FNBA
Att: 6 3 pgs Sch B25 DMV
Att: 7 3 pgs Sch B28 equipment
Att: 8 12 pgs Sch B28, 29, 30 UCC search anno.
Att: 9 3 pgs Sch D non-inventory, equip liens
Att: 10 23 pgs Sch E 507 a 5 ESOP
Att: 11 1 pgs Sch I/J draft income statement
Att: 12 28 pgs SFA 3(b) 90 day checks & transfers
Att: 13 4 pgs SFA 3(c) payments to insiders
Att: 14 1 pgs SFA 19(d) FS recipients