Yu v. Knighted, LLC
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Kenneth M Karas |
Referred: | Lisa Margaret Smith |
Case #: | 7:15-cv-09340 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000e-2ot Job Discrimination (other) |
Case Filed: | Nov 30, 2015 |
Terminated: | May 13, 2019 |
Last checked: Saturday May 28, 2016 6:51 AM EDT |
Defendant
Knighted, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Siji Yu
81 Fenton Way
Hopewell Junction, NY 12533 |
Docket last updated: 04/29/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, July 21, 2020 | ||
144 | 144
appeal
USCA Mandate
Tue 07/21 3:06 PM
MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to141 Amended Notice of Appeal, filed by Siji Yu,140 Notice of Appeal filed by Siji Yu. USCA Case Number 19-1717 cv. UPON DUE CONSIDERATION WHEREOF, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the judgments of the District Court be and hereby are AFFIRMED.. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 07/21/2020..(nd) |
|
appeal
Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to District Judge
Tue 07/21 3:07 PM
Transmission of USCA Mandate to the District Judge re:144 USCA Mandate,..(nd) |