Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:15-bk-03547

Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Tamara O Mitchell
Case #: 2:15-ap-00134
Nature of Suit62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Dec 02, 2015
Terminated:Mar 16, 2016
Last checked: never
Defendant
James Bradley Runnels
2042 Chalybe Way
Hoover, AL 35226
Represented By
James Bradley Runnels
contact info
Defendant
Nikki J. Runnels
2042 Chalybe Way
Hoover, AL 35226
Represented By
Nikki J. Runnels
contact info
Plaintiff
ECO Credit Union
P O Box 2385
Birmingham, AL 35201
Represented By
Michael A. Harrison
Key, Greer, Frawley, Key & Harrison
contact info
Trustee
James G Henderson
1210 Financial Center 505 N. 20th Street
Birmingham, AL 35203


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Friday, March 18, 2016
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 03/19 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 03/18/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Consent Order
Wednesday, March 16, 2016
9 9 order Consent Judgment Wed 03/16 11:00 AM
Consent Order Excepting Certain Debts from Discharge Signed on 3/16/2016 Related [+]. (klt)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff ECO Credit Union
court Close Adversary Case Wed 03/16 11:01 AM
Adversary Case 2:15-ap-134 Closed (klt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 23, 2016
8 8 court Courtroom Deputy Notes (Public) Tue 02/23 8:28 AM
Courtroom Deputy Notes (Based on agreement of the parties, this matter is settled; Michael Harrison to submit a separate order.) RE: Doc #1; Pretrial Conference on Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Debt(s) (cmc)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 15, 2016
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 01/16 12:20 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 01/15/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Notice and Order
Wednesday, January 13, 2016
6 6 order Notice and Order Wed 01/13 2:37 PM
Order Rescheduling Heraing Signed on 1/13/2016 Related [+]. Hearing scheduled 2/22/2016 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham. (klt)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff ECO Credit Union
Friday, December 04, 2015
5 5 misc Cover Sheet Fri 12/04 10:48 AM
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet Filed by Plaintiff ECO Credit Union. (Harrison, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 03, 2015
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 12/03 9:37 AM
Summons Service Executed on James Bradley Runnels 12/3/2015; Nikki J. Runnels 12/3/2015 (Harrison, Michael)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Thu 12/03 8:08 AM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conferenc Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 1/11/2016 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham. (klt)
Related: [-] 1 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff ECO Credit Union
2 2 court Incorrect Event (Notice of) Thu 12/03 8:06 AM
Notice of Deficient Filing or Incorrect Event: PROBLEM: The filer, Michael Harrison, has failed to file an Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet when filing the Complaint. SOLUTION: The filer, Michael Harrison, should file an Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet on the new Official Form B1040. If the filer does not complete the SOLUTION within two business days of this Notice, the Court may deny the requested relief, or the Clerk's Office may take no further action. Related [+] (klt)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff ECO Credit Union
Wednesday, December 02, 2015
1 1 3 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 12/02 3:14 PM
Adversary case 15-00134 62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) Complaint by ECO Credit Union against James Bradley Runnels, Nikki J. Runnels. Fee Amount $350 (Harrison, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Wed 12/02 3:16 PM
Receipt of Complaint 15-00134 TOM) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 18774377. Fee Amount 350.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1