Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Tamara O Mitchell
Case #: 2:15-bk-03547
Case Filed:Sep 04, 2015
Creditor Meeting:Oct 05, 2015
Discharged:Dec 14, 2015
Terminated:Mar 23, 2016
Discharge Objection Deadline:Dec 04, 2015

Debtor
James Bradley Runnels
2042 Chalybe Way
Hoover, AL 35226-6290
Represented By
Joshua C. Snable
Snable Law, LLC
contact info
Debtor
Nikki J. Runnels
2042 Chalybe Way
Hoover, AL 35226
Represented By
Joshua C. Snable
Snable Law, LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
James G Henderson
1210 Financial Center 505 N. 20th Street
Birmingham, AL 35203


Docket last updated: 03/03/2022 6:54 PM CST
Friday, September 04, 2015
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) 15-03547 7) [misc,volp7] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 18439094. Fee Amount 335.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 63 pgs Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $335 Filed by James Bradley Runnels, Nikki J. Runnels (Snable, Joshua)
Related: [-]
3 3 Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor and Joint Debtor Filed Filed by Debtor James Bradley Runnels, Joint Debtor Nikki J. Runnels. (Snable, Joshua)
Related: [-]
4 4 4 pgs Employee Income Records Affidavits for Debtor and Joint Debtor Filed by Debtor James Bradley Runnels, Joint Debtor Nikki J. Runnels. (Snable, Joshua)
Related: [-]
5 5 Tax Documents for the Year for 2014 Filed by Debtor James Bradley Runnels, Joint Debtor Nikki J. Runnels. (Snable, Joshua)
Related: [-]
8 8 Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/05/2015 at 09:00 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Objections for Discharge due by 12/04/2015.
Related: [-]