Original Case: 3:15-cv-01436

Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:15-cv-17362
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Case Filed:Dec 02, 2015
Terminated:Jul 22, 2016
Last checked: Monday Jul 25, 2016 4:19 AM PDT
Defendant - Appellee
TICKETMASTER, LLC
Represented By
Daniel Murray Wall
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Timothy L. O'Mara
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Sadik Harry Huseny
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Andrew Michael Gass
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
GOLDEN STATE WARRIORS, LLC
Represented By
Daniel B. Asimow
Arnold & Porter LLP
contact info
Emily Holding Wood
Arnold & Porter LLP
contact info
Charles Scott Lent
Arnold & Porter LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
STUBHUB, INC.
Represented By
Kevin Arquit
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP
contact info
Matthew Reilly
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP
contact info
Stephen Victor Bomse
Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
contact info
Shannon Christine Leong
Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
contact info
Abram Ellis
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/25/2016 4:09 AM PDT
Wednesday, December 02, 2015
1 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 12/09/2015. Appellant StubHub, Inc. opening brief due 03/10/2016. Appellees Golden State Warriors, LLC and Ticketmaster, LLC answering brief due 04/11/2016. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [9776362] (IV) [Entered: 12/02/2015 09:22 AM]
Related: [-]