California Northern District Court
Judge:Maxine M Chesney
Case #: 3:15-cv-01436
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Cause15:15 Antitrust Litigation
Case Filed:Mar 29, 2015
Terminated:Nov 30, 2015
Last checked: Monday Sep 28, 2015 1:16 PM PDT
Defendant
Golden State Warriors, LLC
Represented By
Emily H. Wood
Arnold & Porter LLP
contact info
Daniel B. Asimow
Arnold & Porter LLP
contact info
Charles Scott Lent
contact info
Defendant
Ticketmaster L.L.C.
Represented By
Daniel Murray Wall
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Sadik Harry Huseny
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Andrew Michael Gass
Latham And Watkins LLP
contact info
Timothy L. O'Mara
Latham & Watkins
contact info
Plaintiff
StubHub, Inc.
Represented By
Kevin J. Arquit
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP
contact info
Shannon Christine Leong
Orrick Herrington And Sutcliffe
contact info
Gordon Schnell
Constantine Cannon PC
contact info
Allison F. Sheedy
Constantine Cannon LLP
contact info
Matthew J. Reilly
Simpson Thacher And Bartlett LLP
contact info
Stephen V. Bomse
Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe
contact info
Abram J. Ellis
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP
contact info
Matthew L Cantor
Constantine Cannon PC
contact info

GPO Apr 01 2015
Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice- Cantor.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2015)
GPO Apr 01 2015
Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice- Schnell.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2015)
GPO Apr 01 2015
Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice- Sheedy.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2015)
GPO Apr 20 2015
Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 19 Motion for Pro Hac Vice- Lent.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2015)
GPO May 04 2015
ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/4/2015. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2015)
GPO May 11 2015
ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 11, 2015. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2015)
GPO May 28 2015
ORDER RE: CHAMBERS COPIES. The parties are directed to submit in single-sided format all chambers copies of documents filed in the future. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 28, 2015. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2015)
GPO Jul 20 2015
ORDER DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS; VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 20, 2015. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2015)
GPO Oct 13 2015
ORDER VACATING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 13, 2015. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2015)
GPO Nov 05 2015
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS; AFFORDING PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO AMEND; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The First Amended Complaint is dismissed in its entirety. If StubHub seeks to amend, StubHub shall file its Second Amended Complaint no later than November 30, 2015. The Case Management Conference is continued from December 4, 2015, to February 26, 2016, at 10:30 a.m. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than February 19, 2016. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 5, 2015. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2015)
GPO Nov 30 2015
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AND ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 30, 2015. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2015)
Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, July 26, 2016
77 77 appeal Clerk's Letter Spreading Mandate Tue 07/26 2:01 PM
CLERK'S Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel re73 Notice of Appeal. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2016)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 22, 2016
76 76 appeal USCA Order Tue 07/26 1:57 PM
Mandate/ORDER of USCA as to73 Notice of Appeal: Pursuant to the arties stipulated agreement (Docket Entry 14), this appeal is voluntarily dismissed. Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). The parties shall bear their own costs and fees on appeal.(ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2016)
Related: [-]