Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:14-bk-19675

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:A Jay Cristol
Case #: 1:15-ap-01708
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Dec 03, 2015
Terminated:Apr 18, 2016
Last checked: never
Defendant
Abboud Trading Corporation
10910 NW 92nd Terrace
Miami, FL 33178
Represented By
Abboud Trading Corporation
contact info
Plaintiff
Joel L. Tabas, Trustee
14 NE 1 Ave, PH
Miami, FL 33132
Represented By
Alan R Rosenberg
contact info
Joel L Tabas, Esq
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Monday, April 18, 2016
19 19 court Close Adversary Case Mon 04/18 12:13 PM
Adversary Case 1:15-ap-1708 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Cargill, Barbara)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of Dismissal [Adversary] Mon 04/18 11:54 AM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding (Voluntary) Pursuant to Settlement Agreement Filed by Plaintiff Joel L. Tabas, Trustee. (Rosenberg, Alan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 23, 2016
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 03/24 12:30 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 03/23/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Order Granting Plaintiff's Agreed Ex Parte Motion for Abatement of Adversary Proceeding and all Pending Deadlines (Re:14 )
Monday, March 21, 2016
16 16 attydoc Certificate of Service [Attorney] Mon 03/21 1:18 PM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Alan R Rosenberg Related [+]. (Rosenberg, Alan)
Related: [-] 15 Order on Motion to Abate
Sunday, March 20, 2016
15 15 order Abate Order Sun 03/20 7:24 PM
Order Granting Plaintiff's Agreed Ex Parte Motion for Abatement of Adversary Proceeding and all Pending Deadlines Related [+] (Rios, Amber)
Related: [-] #14
Thursday, March 17, 2016
14 14 motion Abate Thu 03/17 10:32 AM
Ex Parte Motion to Abate Adversary Proceeding and all Pending Deadlines (Agreed) Filed by Plaintiff Joel L. Tabas, Trustee (Rosenberg, Alan)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 29, 2016
13 13 notice Notice of Filing Mon 02/29 11:27 AM
Notice of Filing Trustee's Motion to Approve Stipulation to Compromise Controversy and Mutual General Release Between Trustee and Abboud Trading, Corp. , Filed by Plaintiff Joel L. Tabas, Trustee. (Rosenberg, Alan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 25, 2016
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 02/26 12:22 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 02/25/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Order Granting In Part Motion To Continue Hearing On: (1 Complaint). Pre-Trial Conference set for 04/25/2016 at 10:00 AM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (AJC), Miami, FL 33128.
11 11 attydoc Certificate of Service [Attorney] Thu 02/25 12:08 PM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Alan R Rosenberg Related [+]. (Rosenberg, Alan)
Related: [-] 10 Order on Motion to Continue Hearing
Tuesday, February 23, 2016
10 10 order Continue Hearing Order Tue 02/23 3:15 PM
Order Granting In Part Motion To Continue Hearing On: (1 Complaint). Pre-Trial Conference set for 04/25/2016 at 10:00 AM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (AJC), Miami, FL 33128. (Rios, Amber)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 22, 2016
9 9 motion Continue Hearing Mon 02/22 11:24 AM
Agreed Ex Parte Motion to Continue Hearing on: (1 Complaint) Filed by Plaintiff Joel L. Tabas, Trustee (Rosenberg, Alan). Modified on 2/22/2016 to correct link (Rodriguez, Marcelo)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 08, 2016
8 8 attydoc Certificate of Service [Attorney] Fri 01/08 9:17 AM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Alan R Rosenberg Related [+]. (Rosenberg, Alan)
Related: [-] 7 Notice of Hearing Amended/Renoticed/Continued
Thursday, January 07, 2016
7 7 court Notice of Hearing [Amd/Rntc/Cntd] (AP) Thu 01/07 2:55 PM
Re- Notice of Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 03/24/2016 at 10:30 AM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (AJC), Miami, FL 33128. (Cargill, Barbara)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 15-01708 Complaint by Joel L. Tabas, Trustee against Abboud Trading Corporation. Filing Fee Paid. Nature of Suit:,(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))
Wednesday, January 06, 2016
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 01/06 9:40 AM
Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint Filed by Abboud Trading Corporation. (Katzen, Bruce)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 23, 2015
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Service Wed 12/23 11:34 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Bruce A Katzen Filed by Defendant Abboud Trading Corporation. (Katzen, Bruce)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 08, 2015
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 12/08 12:48 PM
Summons Service Executed on Abboud Trading Corporation 12/8/2015 Filed by Plaintiff Joel L. Tabas, Trustee, Defendant Abboud Trading Corporation. (Tabas, Joel)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 07, 2015
3 3 order Order Setting Requirements (Adv) Mon 12/07 10:38 PM
Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial. Initial Disclosure of Witnesses and Documents Shall Be Made at Least 30 Days Before Pretrial Date . (Catala, Nilda)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued Mon 12/07 10:34 PM
Summons Issued on Abboud Trading Corporation Answer Due 1/6/2016 [Trial Shall be Held During One-Week Trial Period Beginning on the Date of Pretrial] Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 03/29/2016 at 10:00 AM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (AJC), Miami, FL 33128. (Catala, Nilda)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Joel L. Tabas, Trustee
Thursday, December 03, 2015
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 12/03 1:52 PM
Adversary case 15-01708 Complaint by Joel L. Tabas, Trustee against Abboud Trading Corporation. Filing Fee Paid. Nature of Suit:,(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Rosenberg, Alan)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Thu 12/03 1:58 PM
Receipt of Complaint 15-01708 AJC) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 26227212. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]