Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:A Jay Cristol
Case #: 1:14-bk-19675
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2014
Creditor Meeting:Jun 04, 2014
Claims Deadline:Sep 02, 2014
Terminated:Dec 04, 2018

Debtor
C.V.M. Technology, Inc
1432 NW 82nd Ave
Doral, FL 33126-1508
Represented By
Timothy S Kingcade, Esq
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Joel L Tabas
14 NE 1 Ave PH
Miami, FL 33132
Represented By
Alan R Rosenberg
contact info
Joel L Tabas, Esq
contact info
U.S. Trustee
Office of the US Trustee
51 S.W. 1st Ave. Suite 1204
Miami, FL 33130


Docket last updated: 04/29/2014 2:51 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2014
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) 14-19675 [misc,volp7a] ( 306.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21020421. Fee amount 306.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition . [Fee Amount $306] (Kingcade, Timothy)
Related: [-]
2 2 Meeting of Creditors to be held on 06/04/2014 at 08:30 AM at 51 SW First Ave Room 102, Miami. Proofs of Claim due by 09/02/2014. (Kingcade, Timothy)
Related: [-]
3 3 Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury to Accompany Petitions, Schedules and Statements Filed Electronically by Attorney Timothy S Kingcade Esq Related [+]. (Kingcade, Timothy)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) filed by Debtor C.V.M. Technology, Inc
4 4 Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by Debtor C.V.M. Technology, Inc. (Kingcade, Timothy)
Related: [-]
5 5 Notice of Filing furniture inventory list , Filed by Debtor C.V.M. Technology, Inc. (Kingcade, Timothy)
Related: [-]
6 6 Disclosure of Compensation by Attorney Timothy S Kingcade Esq. (Kingcade, Timothy)
Related: [-]