Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:14-bk-19675

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:A Jay Cristol
Case #: 1:15-ap-01709
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Dec 03, 2015
Terminated:Apr 18, 2016
Last checked: never
Defendant
Tech Data Corporation
5350 Tech Data Drive
Clearwater, FL 33760
Represented By
Tech Data Corporation
contact info
Plaintiff
Joel L. Tabas, Trustee
14 NE 1 Ave, PH
Miami, FL 33132
Represented By
Alan R Rosenberg
contact info
Joel L Tabas, Esq
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Monday, April 18, 2016
19 19 court Close Adversary Case Mon 04/18 12:14 PM
Adversary Case 1:15-ap-1709 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Cargill, Barbara)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 14, 2016
18 18 notice Notice of Dismissal [Adversary] Thu 04/14 10:58 AM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding (Voluntary) Pursuant to Settlement Agreement Filed by Plaintiff Joel L. Tabas, Trustee. (Rosenberg, Alan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 23, 2016
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 03/24 12:30 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 03/23/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Order Granting Plaintiff's Agreed Ex Parte Motion for Abatement of Adversary Proceeding and all Pending Deadlines (Re:14 )
Monday, March 21, 2016
16 16 attydoc Certificate of Service [Attorney] Mon 03/21 1:19 PM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Alan R Rosenberg Related [+]. (Rosenberg, Alan)
Related: [-] 15 Order on Motion to Abate
Sunday, March 20, 2016
15 15 order Abate Order Sun 03/20 7:26 PM
Order Granting Plaintiff's Agreed Ex Parte Motion for Abatement of Adversary Proceeding and all Pending Deadlines Related [+] (Rios, Amber)
Related: [-] #14
Thursday, March 17, 2016
14 14 motion Abate Thu 03/17 10:35 AM
Ex Parte Motion to Abate Adversary Proceeding and all Pending Deadlines (Agreed) Filed by Plaintiff Joel L. Tabas, Trustee (Rosenberg, Alan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 03, 2016
13 13 notice Notice of Filing Thu 03/03 3:46 PM
Notice of Filing Trustee's Motion to Approve Stipulation to Compromise Controversy and Mutual General Release Between Trustee and Tech Data Corporation , Filed by Plaintiff Joel L. Tabas, Trustee. (Rosenberg, Alan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 14, 2016
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 01/15 12:24 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 01/14/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Order Granting Motion To Continue Hearing On: (2 Amended Complaint). Pre-Trial Conference set for 04/25/2016 at 10:00 AM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (AJC), Miami, FL 33128.
11 11 attydoc Certificate of Service [Attorney] Thu 01/14 11:00 AM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Alan R Rosenberg Related [+]. (Rosenberg, Alan)
Related: [-] 10 Order on Motion to Continue Hearing
Tuesday, January 12, 2016
10 10 order Continue Hearing Order Tue 01/12 1:34 PM
Order Granting Motion To Continue Hearing On: (2 Amended Complaint). Pre-Trial Conference set for 04/25/2016 at 10:00 AM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (AJC), Miami, FL 33128. (Rios, Amber)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 11, 2016
9 9 motion Continue Hearing Mon 01/11 1:42 PM
Agreed Ex Parte Motion to Continue Hearing On: [(1 Complaint)] and to Extend All Related Deadlines Set Forth in Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial Filed by Plaintiff Joel L. Tabas, Trustee (Rosenberg, Alan)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 09, 2016
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing-Hearing BK Sun 01/10 12:22 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Related [+] Notice Date 01/09/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Re- Notice of Hearing Pre-Trial Re: (Re:1 Adversary case 15-01709 Complaint by Joel L. Tabas, Trustee against Tech Data Corporation. Filing Fee Paid. Nature of Suit:,(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))) Hearing scheduled for 03/24/2016 at 10:30 AM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (AJC), Miami, FL 33128.
Friday, January 08, 2016
7 7 attydoc Certificate of Service [Attorney] Fri 01/08 9:17 AM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Alan R Rosenberg Related [+]. (Rosenberg, Alan)
Related: [-] 6 Notice of Hearing Amended/Renoticed/Continued
Thursday, January 07, 2016
6 6 court Notice of Hearing [Amd/Rntc/Cntd] (AP) Thu 01/07 3:00 PM
Re- Notice of Hearing Pre-Trial Re: Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 03/24/2016 at 10:30 AM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (AJC), Miami, FL 33128. (Cargill, Barbara)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 15-01709 Complaint by Joel L. Tabas, Trustee against Tech Data Corporation. Filing Fee Paid. Nature of Suit:,(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))
Tuesday, December 08, 2015
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 12/08 12:49 PM
Summons Service Executed on Tech Data Corporation 12/8/2015 Filed by Plaintiff Joel L. Tabas, Trustee, Defendant Tech Data Corporation. (Tabas, Joel)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 07, 2015
4 4 order Order Setting Requirements (Adv) Mon 12/07 10:46 PM
Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial. Initial Disclosure of Witnesses and Documents Shall Be Made at Least 30 Days Before Pretrial Date. (Catala, Nilda)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Summons Issued Mon 12/07 10:41 PM
Summons Issued on Tech Data Corporation Answer Due 1/6/2016 [Trial Shall be Held During One-Week Trial Period Beginning on the Date of Pretrial] Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 03/29/2016 at 10:00 AM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (AJC), Miami, FL 33128. (Catala, Nilda)
Related: [-] 2 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Joel L. Tabas, Trustee
Thursday, December 03, 2015
2 2 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 12/03 2:43 PM
Amended Complaint by Joel L. Tabas, Trustee against Tech Data Corporation. Complaint Amended to to Attach the Correct Exhibits.. Related [+]. (Rosenberg, Alan)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 15-01709 Complaint by Joel L. Tabas, Trustee against Tech Data Corporation. Filing Fee Paid. Nature of Suit:,(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) filed by Plaintiff Joel L. Tabas, Trustee
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 12/03 2:20 PM
Adversary case 15-01709 Complaint by Joel L. Tabas, Trustee against Tech Data Corporation. Filing Fee Paid. Nature of Suit:,(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Rosenberg, Alan)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Thu 12/03 2:22 PM
Receipt of Complaint 15-01709 AJC) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 26227577. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]