Georgia Middle District Court
Judge:Hugh Lawson
Case #: 7:15-cv-00224
Nature of Suit320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Case Filed:Dec 11, 2015
Terminated:Nov 27, 2017
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 08, 2016 5:51 AM EDT
Defendant
JOHNSON PUBLISHING COMPANY LLC
Represented By
GAIL PODOLSKY
contact info
Defendant
FREDERIC A ROSEN
Represented By
GAIL PODOLSKY
contact info
Plaintiff
TAYLOR REEDABETH EAKIN
Represented By
LAUREN E H MEADOWS
contact info
MITCHELL BRICE LADSON
contact info
PATRICK T O'CONNOR
contact info
PAUL H THRELKELD
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Plaintiff
NORA KAY EAKIN
Terminated: 03/11/2016
Represented By
LAUREN E H MEADOWS
contact info
MITCHELL BRICE LADSON
contact info
PATRICK T O'CONNOR
contact info
PAUL H THRELKELD
contact info
Plaintiff
WILLIAM JOEL EAKIN
Terminated: 03/11/2016
Represented By
LAUREN E H MEADOWS
contact info
MITCHELL BRICE LADSON
contact info
PATRICK T O'CONNOR
contact info
PAUL H THRELKELD
contact info

GPO Dec 11 2015
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 9 Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Venue, or in the Alternative, Motion for More Definitive Statement and Memorandum of Law in Support. This case is hereby TRANSFERRED to the U.S.D.C. for the Middle District of Georgia, Valdosta Division. The Clerk is DIRECTED to transmit a complete record of this case, including all pending motions, to the clerk's office of the Middle District of Georgia for filing. Signed by Chief Judge Lisa G. Wood on 12/11/2015. (ca) [Transferred from gasd on 12/11/2015.]
GPO Nov 27 2017
ORDER granting 42 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE HUGH LAWSON on 11/27/2017. (aks)

Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, March 09, 2018
57 57 1 pgs appeal USCA Mandate Fri 03/09 10:44 AM
MANDATE of USCA DISMISSING appeal pursuant to appellant's motion to dismiss as to51 Notice of Appeal filed by TAYLOR REEDABETH EAKIN.(rlw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Cover Letter