Original Case: 7:15-cv-00224

Eleventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:17-prici-15693
Typeprivate civil / diversity
Nature of Suit320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander
Case Filed:Dec 20, 2017
Last checked: Thursday Dec 28, 2017 3:17 AM EST
Defendant - Appellee
FREDERIC A. ROSEN
Represented By
Kate Calender
Carlton Fields Jorden Burt, PA
contact info
Gail Podolsky
Carlton Fields Jorden Burt, PA
contact info
Justan Caleaf Bounds
Rogers & Hardin, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
JOHNSON PUBLISHING COMPANY, LLC, a.k.a. Johnson Publishing Company, Inc.
Represented By
Kate Calender
Carlton Fields Jorden Burt, PA
contact info
Gail Podolsky
Carlton Fields Jorden Burt, PA
contact info
Justan Caleaf Bounds
Rogers & Hardin, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
TAYLOR REEDABETH EAKIN
Represented By
Paul H. Threlkeld
Oliver Maner, LLP
contact info
Mitchell B. Ladson Jr.
Ladson Law Firm
contact info
David William Bobo Mullens
Oliver Maner, LLP
contact info
Patrick T. O'Connor
Oliver Maner, LLP
contact info
Lauren E. H. Meadows
Oliver Maner, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/28/2017 3:17 AM EST
Wednesday, December 20, 2017
CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Taylor Reedabeth Eakin on 12/20/2017. Fee Status: Fee Paid. The appellant's brief is due on or before 01/29/2018. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 01/03/2018 as to Appellant Taylor Reedabeth Eakin. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 01/17/2018 as to Appellee Johnson Publishing Company, LLC
Related: [-]
Att: 1 4 pgs Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal
Att: 2 11 pgs DC Order DE #49
Att: 3 3 pgs DKT-7CIV Notice to Counsel/Parties