Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:15-bk-00076

Alaska Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Herbert A Ross
Case #: 3:15-ap-90021
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Dec 21, 2015
Terminated:Mar 17, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
True Value Company
215 N. Pioneer Avenue
Woodland, CA 95776
Represented By
True Value Company
contact info
Plaintiff
Nacole M. Jipping(7)
PO Box 110502
Anchorage, AK 99511
Represented By
Cabot C. Christianson
Law Offices Of Cabot Christianson, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Friday, March 17, 2017
court Close Adversary Case Fri 03/17 1:48 PM
Adversary Case Closed.(JS)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 25, 2017
25 25 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 02/25 8:58 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 02/25/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] DE#22 Order Reassigning Judge (SA)
Thursday, February 23, 2017
24 24 order Judgment of Dismissal (Adversary Cases) (SA) Thu 02/23 10:13 AM
Judgment of Dismissal. Related [+]. (LD)
Related: [-] DE#1 Complaint,23 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding
23 23 order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (SA) Thu 02/23 10:09 AM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding. Related [+]. (LD)
Related: [-] DE#21 Order Re Intent to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (SA)
22 22 order Reassigning Judge (SA) Thu 02/23 9:00 AM
Administrative Order Reassigning Case [from HAR to GS]. (LD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 02, 2017
21 21 order Intent to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (SA) Thu 02/02 3:46 PM
Order Regarding Intent to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding. Objections due by 2/16/2017. (LD)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 16, 2016
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Notice Fri 09/16 9:05 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/16/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] DE#19 Order Approving Stipulation (SA)
Wednesday, September 14, 2016
19 19 order Approving Stipulation (SA) Wed 09/14 4:45 PM
[COPY of Order from maincase A15-00076-HAR] Order Granting Trustee's Application for Authority to Settle Jipping v. True Value Company Adversary Action. Related [+].(MW)
Related: [-] DE#1 Complaint
Wednesday, July 27, 2016
18 18 order Extend Time Wed 07/27 3:45 PM
Order Granting Fourth Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Related [+] (MW)
Related: [-] 17
Monday, July 25, 2016
17 17 motion Extend Time Mon 07/25 3:45 PM
Motion to Extend Time Plaintiff's Fourth Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time . Related [+]. Filed by Cabot C. Christianson on behalf of Nacole M. Jipping(7).(Christianson, Cabot)
Related: [-] DE#15 Motion to Extend Time
Tuesday, July 12, 2016
16 16 order Extend Time Tue 07/12 3:49 PM
Order Granting Third Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Related [+] (MW)
Related: [-] 15
15 15 motion Extend Time Tue 07/12 2:34 PM
Third Motion to Extend Time . Related [+]. Filed by Cabot C. Christianson on behalf of Nacole M. Jipping(7).(Christianson, Cabot)
Related: [-] DE#9 Proceeding Memo
Monday, June 27, 2016
14 14 order Extend Time Mon 06/27 2:32 PM
Order Granting Second Unopposed Motion For Extension Of Time. Extended to July 12, 2016. Related [+] (MB)
Related: [-] 13
Friday, June 24, 2016
13 13 motion Extend Time Fri 06/24 4:59 PM
Motion to Extend Time [Unopposed] . Related [+]. Filed by Cabot C. Christianson on behalf of Nacole M. Jipping(7).(Christianson, Cabot)
Related: [-] DE#9 Proceeding Memo
Wednesday, June 15, 2016
12 12 order Extend Time Wed 06/15 11:34 AM
Order Granting Unopposed Motion For Extension of Time [until 6/27/2016]. Related [+] (LD)
Related: [-] 11
11 11 motion Extend Time Wed 06/15 9:14 AM
Motion to Extend Time [Unopposed] . Related [+]. Filed by Cabot C. Christianson on behalf of Nacole M. Jipping(7).(Christianson, Cabot)
Related: [-] DE#9 Proceeding Memo
Friday, April 15, 2016
10 10 audio Audio File Fri 04/15 4:00 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 4/14/2016 9:08:00 AM ]. File Size [ 2340 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:09:45 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 14, 2016
9 9 court Proceeding Memo Thu 04/14 11:46 AM
Proceeding Memo Re: TELEPHONIC Scheduling and Planning Conference. See proceeding memo for specifics/ruling. Related [+]. (LD)
Related: [-] DE#8 Order Setting Hearing (SA)
Friday, April 01, 2016
8 8 order Setting Hearing (SA) Fri 04/01 11:41 AM
Order Setting Scheduling and Planning Conference. Scheduling and Planning Conference set for 4/14/2016 at 09:00 AM in Historic Courtroom - Anchorage, Old Fed Bldg. Related [+].(LD)
Related: [-] DE#1 Complaint
Wednesday, March 23, 2016
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint (APANS01) Wed 03/23 3:37 PM
Answer to Complaint . Filed by Michael R. Mills on behalf of True Value Company.(Mills, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 15, 2016
6 6 misc Entry of Appearance Tue 03/15 1:27 PM
*** Notice of Appearance. Filed by Michael R. Mills on behalf of True Value Company.(Mills, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 15, 2016
5 5 misc Summons Service Executed Fri 01/15 3:52 PM
Summons Service Executed on The Corporation Trust Company, defendant, on 1/15/2016. Related [+]. (Christianson, Cabot)
Related: [-] DE#1 Complaint
Thursday, January 14, 2016
4 4 court Summons Issued Thu 01/14 11:21 AM
Copy of Supplemental Summons Issued on True Value Company Date Issued 1/14/2016, Answer Due 2/16/2016. *On 1/14/16 at 11:15am , I called and spoke with Margaret @ Cabot Christianson's office to let her know their issued summons is ready for pick up. (MB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 23, 2015
3 3 misc Summons Service Executed Wed 12/23 10:40 AM
Summons Service Executed on True Value Company, defendant, on 12/23/15. Related [+]. (Christianson, Cabot)
Related: [-] DE#1 Complaint
Monday, December 21, 2015
2 2 court Summons Issued Mon 12/21 4:47 PM
Copy of Summons Issued on True Value Company Date Issued 12/21/2015, Answer Due 1/20/2016. (DG)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Used in Open AP Case) Mon 12/21 11:17 AM
Adversary case 15-90021 Complaint by Nacole M. Jipping(7) against True Value Company. Fee Amount $350. Filed by Cabot C. Christianson. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Christianson, Cabot)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Adversary Cover Sheet
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Mon 12/21 11:20 AM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 15-90021 ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A1418527. Fee amount 350.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
utility Adversary Review Completed Mon 12/21 4:46 PM
Adversary Review Completed. Related [+].(DG)
Related: [-] DE#1 Complaint