Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:15-bk-04671

Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Michael G Williamson
Case #: 8:16-ap-00001
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Jan 05, 2016
Terminated:Dec 29, 2016
Last checked: never
Defendant
Howard Fertilizer & Chemical Company, Inc.
Post Office Box 2854
Orlando, FL 32802
Represented By
Howard Fertilizer & Chemical Company, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Grainger Farms, Inc.
P.O. Box 20938
Bradenton, FL 34204
Represented By
Scott A. Stichter
Stichter, Riedel, Blain & Postler, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Thursday, December 29, 2016
court Close Adversary Case Thu 12/29 10:35 AM
Adversary Case 8:16-ap-1 Closed. (Ryan S.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 28, 2016
16 16 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Wed 09/28 3:16 PM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Scott Stichter for Dbtr RULING: 3rd Cont. Pretrial Conference - Stip. for Dismissal filed Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Dkt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 27, 2016
15 15 misc Stipulation Tue 09/27 2:45 PM
Stipulation Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Filed by Amy Denton Harris on behalf of Plaintiff Grainger Farms, Inc.. (Harris, Amy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 17, 2016
14 14 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Thu 08/18 12:38 AM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Amy Harris for Dbtr RULING: 2nd Cont. Pretrial Conference - Cont. to 9/28 @ 9:30 a.m. [AOCNFNG] Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Dkt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 22, 2016
13 13 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Wed 06/22 5:37 PM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Scott Stichter & Amy Harris: Pltf Atty RULING: Cont. Pretrial Conference - Cont. to 8/17 @ 9:30 a.m. [AOCNFNG] Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Dkt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 25, 2016
12 12 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Thu 05/26 12:48 AM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Amy Harris: Pltf Atty RULING: Cont. Pretrial Conference - Cont. to 6/22 @ 11:00 a.m. [AOCNFNG] Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Dkt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 30, 2016
misc Electronic Service Text Entry (TEXT ONLY) Wed 03/30 9:25 AM
Service completed via CM/ECF electronic notification. Filed by Amy Denton Harris on behalf of Plaintiff Grainger Farms, Inc. Related [+]. (Harris, Amy)
Related: [-] 11
Tuesday, March 29, 2016
11 11 order Order Abating Tue 03/29 2:21 PM
Order Abating Adversary Proceeding Pending Confirmation and Setting Status Conference for May 25, 2016 at 11:00 am. . Service Instructions: Scott Stichter is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Sabrina)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 23, 2016
10 10 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Thu 03/24 6:53 PM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: AMY HARRIS, DENISE BARNETT, GARY BARNES, MICHAEL MARKHAM, KEN MCINTYRE, JOHN MUELLER, NOEL BOEKE, MICHAEL LESSNE(CC) RULING: Pretrial Conference: CONT. TO 05/25/2016 @11AM AOCNFNG Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Dkt)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 20, 2016
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Notice Sun 02/21 12:38 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing Related [+]. Notice Date 02/20/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #8 )
Thursday, February 18, 2016
8 8 court Notice Of Pretrial / Status Conference Thu 02/18 3:19 PM
Notice of Pretrial/ Status Conference. . Pre-Trial Conference set for 3/23/2016 at 10:30 AM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8A, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. (Sabrina)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 16, 2016
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 02/16 11:42 AM
Answer to Complaint Related [+]. Filed by Phil A D'Aniello on behalf of Defendant Howard Fertilizer & Chemical Company, Inc.. (D'Aniello, Phil)
Related: [-] 1
Monday, February 08, 2016
6 6 misc Certificate of Mailing Mon 02/08 11:27 AM
Certificate of Mailing Filed by Phil A D'Aniello on behalf of Defendant Howard Fertilizer & Chemical Company, Inc. Related [+]. (D'Aniello, Phil)
Related: [-] 5
Friday, February 05, 2016
5 5 order Extend Time Fri 02/05 2:47 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint. Extended to 02/16/16. Related [+]. Service Instructions: Phil D'Aniello is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Sabrina)
Related: [-] 4
Tuesday, February 02, 2016
4 4 motion Motion to Extend Time Tue 02/02 11:19 AM
Agreed Motion to Extend Time Filed by Phil A D'Aniello on behalf of Defendant Howard Fertilizer & Chemical Company, Inc. Related [+]. (D'Aniello, Phil)
Related: [-] 1
Friday, January 22, 2016
3 3 misc Summons Service Executed Fri 01/22 11:23 AM
Service Executed of Summons, Complaint, Administrative Order FLMB-2014-10 on Robert M. Howard, Jr., Registered Agent of Howard Fertilizer & Chemical Co., Inc. Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Plaintiff Grainger Farms, Inc. Related [+]. (Stichter, Scott)
Related: [-] 2 ,1
Thursday, January 07, 2016
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Thu 01/07 8:32 AM
Summons issued along with Administrative Order FLMB-2014-10 - Prescribing Procedures for Adversary Proceedings. Answer Due 02/08/2016. If one or more defendants are the United States or an officer or agency thereof, add an additional five days to the Answer Due date. (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 05, 2016
1 1 cmp Complaint - Original Tue 01/05 4:26 PM
Complaint by Grainger Farms, Inc. against Howard Fertilizer & Chemical Company, Inc.. Filing Fee Not Required. Nature of Suit: [12 Related [+]]. (Stichter, Scott)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preference