Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Michael G Williamson
Case #: 8:15-bk-04671
Case Filed:May 04, 2015
Creditor Meeting:Jun 01, 2015
Claims Deadline:Aug 17, 2015
Terminated:Mar 31, 2017
Plan Confirmed:Jul 20, 2016

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Grainger Farms. Inc.
PO Box 20938
Bradenton, FL 34204-0938
Represented By
Amy Denton Harris
Stichter Riedel Blain & Prosser PA
contact info
Debtor
Grainger Farms, Inc.
PO Box 110597
Lakewood Rch, FL 34211-0008
Represented By
Amy Denton Harris
Stichter Riedel Blain & Prosser PA
contact info
Scott A. Stichter
Stichter, Riedel, Blain & Postler, P.A.
contact info
Timothy A Knowles
contact info
Susan H Sharp
Stichter, Riedel, Blain & Postler, P.A.
contact info
Last checked: never
Creditor Committee
Barnes Walker Goethe Hoonhout & Perron, Chartered
3119 Manatee Avenue West
Bradenton, FL 34205
Represented By
Andre R Perron
Barnes Walker Goethe Hoonhout & Perron
contact info
J. Kenneth McIntyre
Barnes Walker Goethe Hoonhout Perron
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee - TPA
Timberlake Annex, Suite 1200 501 E Polk Street
Tampa, FL 33602
Represented By
Denise E Barnett
United States Trustee
contact info


1. Manatee tomato farm companies file for bankruptcy (bradenton.com)
Submitted Mon 05/11/2015
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Monday, August 24, 2020
court (NO PAPER) - Removal of Restrictions on Transcript Mon 08/24 10:56 AM
Removal of Viewing Restrictions on Transcript Due to No Request for Redaction from Hearing Participants Related [+]. (Deborah K.)
Related: [-] 630
court (NO PAPER) - Removal of Restrictions on Transcript Mon 08/24 10:57 AM
Removal of Viewing Restrictions on Transcript Due to No Request for Redaction from Hearing Participants Related [+]. (Deborah K.)
Related: [-] 631