Tennessee Eastern District Court
Judge:J Ronnie Greer
Referred: Dennis H Inman
Case #: 2:10-cv-00193
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Case Filed:Aug 30, 2010
Terminated:Jul 23, 2013
Case in other court:13-06090
Petitioner
Lionel R Lindsey
Respondent
Tony Parker

GPO Jul 23 2013
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION: this pro se state prisoners application for a writ of habeas corpus will be DENIED and this case will be DISMISSED. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 7/23/2013. (LMC) Modified on 7/23/2013 (LMC, ). C/M to Lionel R. Lindsey.

Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, March 18, 2014
56 56 ORDER of USCA as to52 Notice of Appeal filed by Lionel R Lindsey, Lindsey cannot make a substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right, and his COA application is denied. Lindsey's IFP motion is denied as moot.(BGP, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Other cover letter - no mandate to issue