Original Case: 2:10-cv-00193

Sixth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:13-pr-06090
Typeprisoner / state / habeas corpus
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Case Filed:Aug 22, 2013
Terminated:Mar 18, 2014
Last checked: Tuesday May 13, 2025 3:40 PM CDT
Petitioner - Appellant
LIONEL R. LINDSEY
Represented By
Lionel R. Lindsey
Northwest Correctional Complex
contact info
Respondent - Appellee
TONY PARKER
Represented By
John H. Bledsoe
Office of the Attorney General
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 3:40 PM CDT
Thursday, August 22, 2013
The case manager for this case is: Linda Niesen (LMN)
Related: [-]
2 pgs Prisoner Case Docketed with certificate of appealability denied. Notice filed by Appellant Lionel R. Lindsey. Transcript needed: n. (LMN)
Related: [-]