Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:08-bk-10095

Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Timothy A Barnes
Case #: 1:16-ap-00031
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 14, 2016
Terminated:Mar 17, 2016
Last checked: never
Defendant
Timothy and Regina Dayton
Represented By
Timothy and Regina Dayton
contact info
Plaintiff
KHI Liquidation Trust
Represented By
Mark L Radtke
Shaw Fishman Glantz & Towbin LLC
contact info
Gordon E. Gouveia
Shaw Fishman Glantz & Towbin LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, March 17, 2016
19 19 court Close Adversary Case Thu 03/17 3:29 PM
Adversary Case 1:16-ap-31 Closed . (Mendoza, Catherine)
Related: [-]
18 18 court Hearing Stricken (Other) Thu 03/17 3:15 PM
Hearing Scheduled for 03/22/2016 at 11:00 AM is Stricken Related [+]. (McClendon, Annette)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, March 16, 2016
17 17 order Stipulation and Order Thu 03/17 2:11 PM
Agreed Order and Stipulation Dismissing Adversary Case and Disallowing Claim(s) #762 & 764 of Timothy J Dayton and Regina L Dayton and Modifying Claim(s) #763 of Timothy J Dayton and Regina L Dayton. Related [+]. Signed on 3/16/2016 (Sims, Mildred)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, February 23, 2016
16 16 order Consolidate for Hearing/Trial Wed 02/24 10:33 AM
Order Granting Motion to Consolidate for Hearing with Case(s) 08-10095 Kimball Hill Inc. Related [+]. Signed on 2/23/2016. (Mendoza, Catherine)
Related: [-] 12
15 15 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Tue 02/23 4:09 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Hearing Scheduled for 03/22/2016 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 744 219 South Dearborn, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 02/23/2016. (McClendon, Annette)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,
Monday, February 22, 2016
14 14 utility U - Corrective Entry Mon 02/22 10:11 AM
CORRECTIVE ENTRY: Docketed On Wrong Case, Filer to be Notified Related [+]. (Brown, Venita)
Related: [-] 13 Answer to Complaint
Tuesday, February 16, 2016
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 02/16 2:21 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Kevin Murnighan on behalf of Timothy and Regina Dayton. (Murnighan, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 01, 2016
12 12 motion Consolidate for Hearing/Trial Mon 02/01 5:36 PM
Notice of Motion and Motion to Consolidate for Hearing with Case(s) 08-10095 Filed by Mark L Radtke on behalf of KHI Liquidation Trust. Hearing scheduled for 2/23/2016 at 11:00 AM at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 744, Chicago, Illinois 60604. (Radtke, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, January 22, 2016
11 11 utility U - Corrective Entry Fri 01/22 4:45 PM
CORRECTIVE ENTRY: to include text Alias Related [+]. (Brown, Venita)
Related: [-] 10 Summons Service Executed
Wednesday, January 20, 2016
10 10 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 01/20 10:53 AM
Summons Service Executed on Timothy and Regina Dayton Related [+]. (Radtke, Mark)
Related: [-] 8 Alias Summons Issued
Monday, January 18, 2016
9 9 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 01/18 9:57 AM
Summons Service Executed on Timothy and Regina Dayton Related [+]. (Radtke, Mark)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
8 8 court Alias Summons Issued (auto) Mon 01/18 9:50 AM
Alias Summons Issued on Timothy and Regina Dayton Answer Due 02/17/2016 (Admin)
Related: [-]
7 7 cmp Request for Issuance of Alias Summons Mon 01/18 9:50 AM
Request for Issuance of Alias Summons by KHI Liquidation Trust against Timothy and Regina Dayton. Related [+]. Status hearing to be held on 2/23/2016 at 10:30 AM at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 744, Chicago, Illinois 60604. (Radtke, Mark)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Friday, January 15, 2016
6 6 utility U - Corrective Entry Fri 01/15 4:57 PM
CORRECTIVE ENTRY: To correct plaintiffs name Related [+]. (Sirmons, Dornesa)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
5 5 misc Appearance Fri 01/15 3:08 PM
Appearance Filed by Gordon E. Gouveia on behalf of U.S. Bank National Association, as the Liquidation Trust Administrator for the KHI Liquidation Trust, as successor to Kimball Hill, Inc. and certain of its debtor subsidiaries. (Gouveia, Gordon)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Appearance Fri 01/15 3:06 PM
Appearance for Joseph L. Cohen Filed by Mark L Radtke on behalf of U.S. Bank National Association, as the Liquidation Trust Administrator for the KHI Liquidation Trust, as successor to Kimball Hill, Inc. and certain of its debtor subsidiaries. (Radtke, Mark)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 14, 2016
3 3 crditcrd none Thu 01/14 4:09 PM
Receipt of Complaint 16-00031 [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 31030708. Fee Amount $ 350.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Thu 01/14 4:03 PM
Summons Issued on Timothy and Regina Dayton Answer Due 02/16/2016 (Admin)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 01/14 4:03 PM
Adversary case 16-00031 (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)): Complaint by U.S. Bank National Association, as the Liquidation Trust Administrator for the KHI Liquidation Trust, as successor to Kimball Hill, Inc. and certain of its debtor subsidiaries against Timothy and Regina Dayton. Fee Amount $350. Status hearing to be held on 2/23/2016 at 10:30 AM at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 744, Chicago, Illinois 60604. (Radtke, Mark) Modified on 1/15/2016 To correct plaintiffs name (Sirmons, Dornesa).
Related: [-]