Joint Admin
|
1:08-bk-10102 - 18th and Peoria, LLC
|
04/23/2008
|
Joint Admin
|
1:08-bk-10107 - KH Financial Holding Company
|
04/23/2008
|
Joint Admin
|
1:08-bk-10111 - KH Ingham Park South, LLC
|
04/23/2008
|
Joint Admin
|
1:08-bk-10116 - KHH Texas Trading Company L.P.
|
04/23/2008
|
Joint Admin
|
1:08-bk-10119 - Kimball Hill Far East Detroit, LLC
|
04/23/2008
|
Joint Admin
|
1:08-bk-10121 - Kimball Hill Homes Austin, L. P.
|
04/23/2008
|
Joint Admin
|
1:08-bk-10122 - Kimball Hill Homes California, Inc.
|
04/23/2008
|
Joint Admin
|
1:08-bk-10123 - Kimball Hill Homes Dallas, L.P.
|
04/23/2008
|
Joint Admin
|
1:08-bk-10125 - Kimball Hill Homes Florida, Inc.
|
04/23/2008
|
Joint Admin
|
1:08-bk-10126 - Kimball Hill Homes Houston, L.P.
|
04/23/2008
|
Joint Admin
|
1:08-bk-10128 - Kimball Hill Homes Illinois, LLC
|
04/23/2008
|
Joint Admin
|
1:08-bk-10130 - Kimball Hill Homes Nevada, Inc.
|
04/23/2008
|
Joint Admin
|
1:08-bk-10131 - Kimball Hill Homes Ohio, Inc.
|
04/23/2008
|
Joint Admin
|
1:08-bk-10132 - Kimball Hill Homes Oregon, Inc.
|
04/23/2008
|
Joint Admin
|
1:08-bk-10134 - Kimball Hill Homes Realty Florida, Inc.
|
04/23/2008
|
Joint Admin
|
1:08-bk-10135 - Kimball Hill Homes San Antonio, L.P.
|
04/23/2008
|
Joint Admin
|
1:08-bk-10138 - Kimball Hill Homes Texas Operations, L.L.C.
|
04/23/2008
|
Joint Admin
|
1:08-bk-10159 - The Hamilton Place Partnership
|
04/23/2008
|
Joint Admin
|
1:08-bk-10136 - Kimball Hill Homes Texas Investments, L.L.C.
|
04/23/2008
|
Joint Admin
|
1:08-bk-10140 - Kimball Hill Homes Texas, Inc.
|
04/23/2008
|
Joint Admin
|
1:08-bk-10141 - Kimball HIll Homes Washington, Inc.
|
04/23/2008
|
Joint Admin
|
1:08-bk-10144 - Kimball Hill Homes Wisconsin, Inc.
|
04/23/2008
|
Joint Admin
|
1:08-bk-10146 - Kimball Hill Stateway, Inc.
|
04/23/2008
|
Joint Admin
|
1:08-bk-10147 - Kimball Hill Texas Investment Company, L.L.C.
|
04/23/2008
|
Joint Admin
|
1:08-bk-10149 - Kimball Hill Urban Centers Chicago One, L.L.C.
|
04/23/2008
|
Joint Admin
|
1:08-bk-10151 - Kimball Hill Urban Centers Chicago Two, L.L.C.
|
04/23/2008
|
Joint Admin
|
1:08-bk-10153 - Kimball Hill Urban Centers Special Purposes, LLC
|
04/23/2008
|
Joint Admin
|
1:08-bk-10156 - Kimball Hill Urban Centers, L.L.C.
|
04/23/2008
|
Joint Admin
|
1:08-bk-10158 - National Credit and Guaranty Corporation
|
04/23/2008
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00495 - KHI Liquidation Trust v. Carpio's Painting
|
04/12/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00497 - KHI Liquidation Trust v. Curie Enterprises, Inc. et al
|
04/12/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00499 - KHI Liquidation Trust v. D R McGee Concrete, Inc.
|
04/12/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00506 - KHI Liquidation Trust v. DPIS Engineering, LLC
|
04/12/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00515 - KHI Liquidation Trust v. Alvarado Masonry, Inc.
|
04/12/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00532 - KHI Liquidation Trust v. Builders Blinds of Texas, Inc.
|
04/12/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00510 - KHI Liquidation Trust et al v. Puga
|
04/12/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00527 - KHI Liquidation Trust et al v. Balencia
|
04/12/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00549 - KHI Liquidation Trust v. Gutierrez Masonry Company Inc. et al
|
04/13/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00559 - KHI Liquidation Trust v. John H. Blackmer et al
|
04/13/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00573 - KHI Liquidation Trust v. Aguilar
|
04/13/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00577 - KHI Liquidation Trust v. Interspace Airport Advertising
|
04/13/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00578 - KHI Liquidation Trust v. Ironwood Connection
|
04/13/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00579 - KHI Liquidation Trust v. J & M Excavation, Inc.
|
04/13/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00580 - KHI Liquidation Trust v. JD Landscaping Service, Inc. et al
|
04/13/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00581 - KHI Liquidation Trust v. J H Craddock Construction, LLC
|
04/13/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00546 - KHI Liquidation Trust v. Rosas
|
04/13/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00591 - KHI Liquidation Trust v. Martinez
|
04/13/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00541 - KHI Liquidation Trust v. Hometeam Pest Defense, LLC
|
04/13/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00544 - KHI Liquidation Trust v. Game Film Consultants
|
04/13/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00561 - KHI Liquidation Trust et al v. Andrade
|
04/13/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00568 - KHI Liquidation Trust et al v. Reyes
|
04/13/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00602 - KHI Liquidation Trust v. Amerigas, Inc.
|
04/14/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00607 - KHI Liquidation Trust v. Metropolitan Sweeping
|
04/14/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00611 - KHI Liquidation Trust v. Midwest Technical Consultants, Inc.
|
04/14/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00622 - KHI Liquidation Trust v. Careerbuilder, LLC
|
04/14/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00625 - KHI Liquidation Trust v. Clean Rite Inc. of Illinois
|
04/14/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00642 - KHI Liquidation Trust v. Inland Electric Corp.
|
04/14/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00645 - KHI Liquidation Trust v. Kap Roofing, Inc.
|
04/14/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00603 - KHI Liquidation Trust v. Marblecast Granite & Marble, Inc.
|
04/14/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00656 - KHI Liquidation Trust v. Marble Works
|
04/15/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00663 - KHI Liquidation Trust v. Granite Telecommunications, LLC
|
04/15/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00701 - KHI Liquidation Trust v. Siltmaster, Inc.
|
04/15/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00665 - KHI Liquidation Trust v. Truenorth Development, Inc.
|
04/15/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00711 - KHI Liquidation Trust v. Framecon Incorporated
|
04/16/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00727 - KHI Liquidation Trust v. A & A Portables, Inc.
|
04/16/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00730 - KHI Liquidation Trust v. Acme Unlimited Inc.
|
04/16/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00734 - KHI Liquidation Trust v. Pearson Masonry, Inc.
|
04/16/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00735 - KHI Liquidation Trust v. Allied Aluminum, Inc.
|
04/16/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00737 - KHI Liquidation Trust v. Alufab Southwest, Inc.
|
04/16/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00740 - KHI Liquidation Trust v. American Labor Pool Inc.
|
04/16/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00751 - KHI Liquidation Trust v. C & C Window & Door Company, Inc.
|
04/16/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00758 - KHI Liquidation Trust v. Roadrunner Drywall Corp.
|
04/16/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00761 - KHI Liquidation Trust v. Southern Vegas Valley Contracting LLC
|
04/16/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00768 - KHI Liquidation Trust v. Terra Green Landscape
|
04/16/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00742 - KHI Liquidation Trust v. B.D.L. Painting, Inc.
|
04/16/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00754 - KHI Liquidation Trust v. Cast-Crete Corporation
|
04/16/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00789 - KHI Liquidation Trust v. Stacy Kropik Trucking, Inc.
|
04/19/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00795 - KHI Liquidation Trust v. Metro Cutting and Sealing, Inc.
|
04/19/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00809 - KHI Liquidation Trust v. Tobias M. Flores dba Tobias Flores Landscape Servi
|
04/19/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00810 - KHI Liquidation Trust v. Triad Sand Corp.
|
04/19/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00839 - KHI Liquidation Trust v. Sandoval et al
|
04/19/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00840 - KHI Liquidation Trust v. RJG Clean Up & Roll Off Service
|
04/19/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00841 - KHI Liquidation Trust v. Teel
|
04/19/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00778 - KHI Liquidation Trust et al v. Santiago Garcia
|
04/19/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00838 - KHI Liquidation Trust et al v. Guerra
|
04/19/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00802 - KHI Liquidation Trust v. Millie Construction et al
|
04/19/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00790 - KHI Liquidation Trust v. Stockman & Sons
|
04/19/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00825 - KHI Liquidation Trust et al v. Castaneda
|
04/19/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00824 - KHI Liquidation Trust v. Wisenbaker Builder Services, Inc. et al
|
04/19/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00867 - KHI Liquidation Trust v. Fountain Pools L.L.C.
|
04/20/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00869 - KHI Liquidation Trust v. Odyssey Landscape Company, Inc.
|
04/20/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00871 - KHI Liquidation Trust v. Gates Concrete Construction, Inc.
|
04/20/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00873 - KHI Liquidation Trust v. G. Stone Construction, Inc.
|
04/20/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00878 - KHI Liquidation Trust v. Geo Grout, Inc.
|
04/20/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00887 - KHI Liquidation Trust v. Hugh Macdonald Construction, Inc.
|
04/20/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00891 - KHI Liquidation Trust v. Jaguar Data Systems, Inc.
|
04/20/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00893 - KHI Liquidation Trust v. Joellyn Rocha Designs, LLC
|
04/20/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00904 - KHI Liquidation Trust v. Custom Plumbing of Lee County Inc.
|
04/20/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00914 - KHI Liquidation Trust v. Don Sellers Concrete, Inc.
|
04/20/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00880 - KHI Liquidation Trust v. Gulfcoast Marble & Granite, Inc.
|
04/20/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00929 - KHI Liquidation Trust v. Reynaert Contracting, Inc.
|
04/21/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00935 - KHI Liquidation Trust v. Sommerkal Construction, Inc.
|
04/21/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00936 - KHI Liquidation Trust v. S & T Painting, Inc.
|
04/21/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00937 - KHI Liquidation Trust v. South Placer Roofing Company, Inc.
|
04/21/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00941 - KHI Liquidation Trust v. Sarasota Herald Tribune Co.
|
04/21/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00947 - KHI Liquidation Trust v. Universal Fire Systems, Inc.
|
04/21/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00970 - KHI Liquidation Trust v. R. H. Hernandez Drywall, Inc.
|
04/21/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00928 - KHI Liquidation Trust v. Showcase Cultured Marble, Inc.
|
04/21/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00962 - KHI Liquidation Trust v. Wes Day Enterprises
|
04/21/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00966 - KHI Liquidation Trust v. Windwalker Security Patrol, Inc.
|
04/21/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00960 - KHI Liquidation Trust et al v. WCA of Florida, LLC
|
04/21/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-01003 - KHI Liquidation Trust v. Precision Electric, Inc. et al
|
04/22/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-01028 - KHI Liquidation Trust v. B & L Cleaning Service
|
04/22/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:10-ap-00998 - KHI Liquidation Trust v. C Goshy Enterprises, Inc.
|
04/22/2010
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-00031 - U.S. Bank National Association , as the Liquidatio v. Dayton
|
01/14/2016
|