Member Case
Lead case is: 1:14-bk-10745

Tennessee Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Nicholas W Whittenburg
Case #: 1:16-bk-10182
Case Filed:Jan 15, 2016
Creditor Meeting:Feb 24, 2016

Debtor
Cornerstone of River City, LLC
100 W Ml King Blvd Ste 816
Chattanooga, TN 37402-2553
Represented By
Jerrold D. Farinash
Farinash & Hayduk
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Douglas R. Johnson
Johnson & Mulroony, PC P. O. Box 2188
Chattanooga, TN 37409
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Historic U.S. Courthouse 31 E. Eleventh Street Fourth Floor
Chattanooga, TN 37402
Represented By
Kimberly C. Swafford
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/16/2016 2:49 PM EST
Friday, January 15, 2016
1 1 Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals. Schedules A/B,D,E/F,I,J,J-2 & Statement of Financial Affairs Fee Amount $335 filed by Jerrold D. Farinash of Farinash & Hayduk on behalf of Cornerstone of River City, LLC. (Farinash, Jerrold)
Related: [-]
2 2 Receipt of Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition - case upload(1:16-bk-10182) [caseupld,1027u] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 14873161. Fee amount 335.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
3 3 Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 02/24/2016 at 01:00 PM at Basement Room 18, Chattanooga, TN. (Farinash, Jerrold)
Related: [-]