Tennessee Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Nicholas W Whittenburg
Case #: 1:14-bk-10745
Case Filed:Feb 24, 2014
Creditor Meeting:Jul 20, 2015
Claims Deadline:Oct 22, 2015
Converted:Jun 12, 2015
Discharge Objection Deadline:Sep 18, 2015

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
River City Resort, Inc.
501 Manufacturers Rd
Chattanooga, TN 37405-3203
Represented By
David J. Fulton
Scarborough, Fulton & Glass
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Jerrold D. Farinash
Farinash & Hayduk 100 West ML King Blvd., Suite 816
Chattanooga, TN 37402
Represented By
Jerrold D. Farinash
Farinash & Hayduk
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Historic U.S. Courthouse 31 E. Eleventh Street Fourth Floor
Chattanooga, TN 37402
Represented By
David Holesinger
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info
Kimberly C. Swafford
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info

GPO Sep 30 2022
Memorandum Opinion. SDR (RE: related document(s)520 Application for Compensation filed by Trustee Jerrold D. Farinash, Trustee Attorney Jerrold D. Farinash). (dlt)

Docket last updated: 08/25/2015 5:22 PM EDT
Monday, February 24, 2014
1 1 7 pgs Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $1213 Filed by David J. Fulton on behalf of River City Resort, Inc.. Chapter 11 Current Monthly Income Form 22B Due 03/10/2014. Payment Advices Statement due : 03/10/2014. Schedule A due 03/10/2014. Schedule B due 03/10/2014. Schedule C due 03/10/2014. Schedule D due 03/10/2014. Schedule E due 03/10/2014. Schedule F due 03/10/2014. Schedule G due 03/10/2014. Schedule H due 03/10/2014. Schedule I due 03/10/2014. Schedule J due 03/10/2014. Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities and Related Data due:03/10/2014. Statement of Financial Affairs due 03/10/2014. Statement of Compliance with Credit Counseling Requirement due:03/10/2014. Summary of schedules due 03/10/2014. Incomplete Filings due by 03/10/2014. Chapter 11 Plan due by 06/24/2014. Disclosure Statement due by 06/24/2014. Government Proof of Claim due by 8/25/2014. (Fulton, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 Social Security Number Certification Filed by David J. Fulton on behalf of Debtor River City Resort, Inc.. (Fulton, David)
Related: [-]
3 3 Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(1:14-bk-10745) [misc,volp11] (1213.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 12301560. Fee amount 1213.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
4 4 Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by David J. Fulton on behalf of Debtor River City Resort, Inc.. (Fulton, David)
Related: [-]
5 5 Motion for Relief from Stay . Fee Amount $176, Filed by Gary R. Patrick on behalf of Creditors River City Bargeand Cafe, LLC, David Debter, Roy Roach, Gregory Hellwig, John Winesett Hearing to be held on 2/25/2014 at 01:00 PM Courtroom A, Chattanooga, TN (Patrick, Gary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
6 6 Ex Parte Motion to Shorten Time To hear Motion for Relief Filed by Gary R. Patrick on behalf of Creditors David Debter, Gregory Hellwig, River City Bargeand Cafe, LLC, Roy Roach, John Winesett (Patrick, Gary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
7 7 Receipt of Motion for Relief From Stay(1:14-bk-10745) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 176.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 12302041. Fee amount 176.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#5
8 8 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by James A. Fields on behalf of Creditor David L. Moss. (Fields, James)
Related: [-]
17 17 Deficiency/Schedules Due Deadlines Updated Incomplete Filings due by 3/10/2014. Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities and Related Data due:3/10/2014. Summary of schedules due 3/10/2014. (elr)
Related: [-]