Original Case: 1:98-cv-01517

D.C. Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:16-cvpri-07002
Typecivil private / private
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Case Filed:Jan 15, 2016
Terminated:Feb 15, 2019
Last checked: Monday Feb 18, 2019 3:21 AM EST
Defendant - Appellee
Hilton Hotel Retirement Plan
Represented By
Andrew McHie Lacy
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett
contact info
Jonathan K. Youngwood
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP
contact info
Thomas Charles Rice
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Hilton Hotels Corporation
Represented By
Andrew McHie Lacy
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett
contact info
Jonathan K. Youngwood
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP
contact info
Thomas Charles Rice
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
James M. Anderson
Represented By
Andrew McHie Lacy
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett
contact info
Jonathan K. Youngwood
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP
contact info
Thomas Charles Rice
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Matthew J. Hart
Represented By
Andrew McHie Lacy
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett
contact info
Jonathan K. Youngwood
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP
contact info
Thomas Charles Rice
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Dieter Huckestein
Represented By
Andrew McHie Lacy
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett
contact info
Jonathan K. Youngwood
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP
contact info
Thomas Charles Rice
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Sam D. Young, Jr.
Represented By
Andrew McHie Lacy
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett
contact info
Jonathan K. Youngwood
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP
contact info
Thomas Charles Rice
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Barron Hilton
Represented By
Andrew McHie Lacy
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett
contact info
Jonathan K. Youngwood
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP
contact info
Thomas Charles Rice
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Jamal J. Kifafi
Represented By
Stephen Robert Bruce
Stephen R. Bruce Law Offices
contact info
Allison Caalim Pienta
Stephen R. Bruce Law Offices
contact info

GPO Feb 15 2019
PER CURIAM JUDGMENT [1773536] filed (without memorandum) that the judgment of the District Court is AFFIRMED. (SEE JUDGMENT FOR DETAILS) withholding issuance of the mandate. Before Judges: Garland, Pillard, and Wilkins. [16-7002]

Docket last updated: 02/18/2019 3:21 AM EST
Friday, January 15, 2016
PRIVATE CIVIL CASE docketed. 16-7002
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF APPEAL [1593945] filed by Jamal J. Kifafi seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:98-cv-01517-CKK. Assigned USCA Case Number 16-7002
Related: [-]
CLERK'S ORDER [1593982] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 02/16/2016. APPELLANT certificate as to parties, etc. due 02/16/2016. APPELLANT statement of issues due 02/16/2016. APPELLANT underlying decision due 02/16/2016. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 02/16/2016. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 02/16/2016. APPELLANT transcript status report due 02/16/2016. APPELLANT procedural motions due 02/16/2016. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 02/29/2016; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties, etc. due 02/16/2016. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 02/16/2016. APPELLEE procedural motions due 02/16/2016. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 02/29/2016 16-7002
Related: [-]