District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Case #: 1:98-cv-01517
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause28:1001 E.R.I.S.A.
Case Filed:Jun 17, 1998
Terminated:Mar 01, 2021
Defendant
BARRON HILTON
Defendant
DIETER HUCKESTEIN
Defendant
HILTON HOTEL RETIREMENT PLAN
Defendant
HILTON HOTELS CORPORATION
Defendant
JAMES M. ANDERSON
Defendant
MATTHEW J. HART
Defendant
SAM D. YOUNG JR.
Movant
EDNA OGBONNA
Movant
FANNY CANAR
Movant
MARC TOUSSAINT
Plaintiff
JAMAL J. KIFAFI

GPO May 15 2009
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on May 15, 2009. (lcckk1)
GPO Sep 07 2010
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on September 7, 2010. (lcckk1)
GPO Aug 31 2011
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on August 31, 2011. (lcckk1)
GPO Nov 21 2011
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 11/21/11. (lcckk2)
GPO Nov 23 2011
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 11/23/11. (lcckk2)
GPO Dec 02 2011
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 12/2/11. (lcckk2)
GPO Aug 15 2012
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 8/15/12. (lcckk2)
GPO Nov 18 2013
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 11/18/2013.(lcckk3)
GPO Feb 04 2015
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 2/4/2015.(lcckk3)
GPO Jun 04 2015
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 6/4/2015.(lcckk3)
GPO Dec 07 2015
MEMORANDUM OPINION re: 433 Order. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 12/7/2015. (lcckk2)

Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Friday, April 18, 2025
appeal USCA Case Number Fri 04/18 1:21 PM
USCA Case Number 25-7053 for474 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by JAMAL J. KIFAFI. (znmw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
475 475 appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Tue 04/15 3:50 PM
Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid re474 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court,. (zjm)
Related: [-]
474 474 appeal Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Tue 04/15 12:51 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to470 Order on Motion for Discovery, Order on Motion for Leave to File,471 Memorandum & Opinion by JAMAL J. KIFAFI. Filing fee $ 605, receipt number BDCDC-11616915. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Bruce, Stephen)
Related: [-]