Member Case
Lead case is: 3:16-bk-30078

Indiana Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Paul E Singleton
Case #: 3:16-bk-30082
Case Filed:Jan 25, 2016

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $50,001 to $100,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
5 Star Investment Group VII, LLC
3131 Grape Road
Mishawaka, IN 46545
Represented By
Katherine C. O'Malley
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Nancy J. Gargula
One Michiana Square Building Suite 555 100 East Wayne Street
South Bend, IN 46601


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 12:00 PM EDT
Sunday, June 26, 2016
130 130 court BNC Certificate of Mailing (Auto) Mon 06/27 12:36 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 06/26/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 129 Docket Entry
Friday, June 24, 2016
129 129 court Docket Entry Fri 06/24 1:59 PM
An Order has been entered in this Chapter 11 case substantively consolidating the cases of 5 Star Investment Group, LLC (Case No. 16-30078 , 5 Star Portland Holdings, LLC (Case No. 16-30079 , 5 Star Investment Group V, LLC (Case No. 16-30080 , 5 Star Commercial, LLC (Case No. 16-30081 , 5 Star Investment Group VII, LLC (Case No. 16-30082 , 5 Star Holdings, LLC (Case No. 16-30083 , 5 Star Investment Group III, LLC (Case No. 16-30084 , 5 Star Indiana Holdings, LLC (Case No. 16-30085 , 5 Star Investment Group II, LLC (Case No. 16-30086 , 5 Star Investment Group IV, LLC (Case No. 16-30087 and 5 Star Capital Fund, LLC (Case No. 16-30088 . Related [+]. (cdc)
Related: [-] 127 Order
128 128 court Docket Entry Fri 06/24 12:20 PM
***NOTICE INADVERTENTLY ENTERED WITH WRONG CAPTION*** An Order has been entered in this Chapter 11 case substantively consolidating the cases of 5 Star Investment Group, LLC (Case No. 16-30078 , 5 Star Portland Holdings, LLC (Case No. 16-30079 , 5 Star Investment Group V, LLC (Case No. 16-30080 , 5 Star Commercial, LLC (Case No. 16-30081 , 5 Star Investment Group VII, LLC (Case No. 16-30082 , 5 Star Holdings, LLC (Case No. 16-30083 , 5 Star Investment Group III, LLC (Case No. 16-30084 , 5 Star Indiana Holdings, LLC (Case No. 16-30085 , 5 Star Investment Group II, LLC (Case No. 16-30086 , 5 Star Investment Group IV, LLC (Case No. 16-30087 and 5 Star Capital Fund, LLC (Case No. 16-30088 . Related [+]. (cdc) Modified on 6/24/2016 (cdc)
Related: [-] 127 Order
127 127 order Order Fri 06/24 12:18 PM
Agreed Order Granting Trustee's Motion for Substantive Consolidation. (cdc)
Related: [-]