Indiana Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Paul E Singleton
Case #: 3:16-bk-30078
Case Filed:Jan 25, 2016
Creditor Meeting:Feb 29, 2016
Plan Confirmed:May 10, 2018

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
5 Star Investment Group, LLC
3131 Grape Road
Mishawaka, IN 46545
Represented By
Thomas G. Wallrich
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Katherine C. O'Malley
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Last checked: never
Cred. Comm. Chair
Grant Swartzentruber
As the representative for Creditor Omar Wagler 201 E. Main Street Suite 206
Washington, IN 47501
Represented By
R. William Jonas, Jr.
Hammerschmidt, Amaral & Jonas
contact info
R. William Jonas(TT), Jr.
Hammerschmidt, Amaral & Jonas
contact info
Creditor Committee
Thomas Adamczyk
520 N Van Buren Street
Shipshewana, IN 46565
Represented By
R. William Jonas, Jr.
Hammerschmidt, Amaral & Jonas
contact info
Creditor Committee
Larry Kruse
55045 Cobus Lane
Elkhart, IN 46514
Represented By
R. William Jonas, Jr.
Hammerschmidt, Amaral & Jonas
contact info
Creditor Committee
Wade Wenger
21717 Knobcone Court
Bristol, IN 46507
Represented By
R. William Jonas, Jr.
Hammerschmidt, Amaral & Jonas
contact info
Creditor Committee
John R Rader
591 Ironwood Road
Bremen, IN 46506
Represented By
R. William Jonas, Jr.
Hammerschmidt, Amaral & Jonas
contact info
Creditor Committee
Samuel M. Schwartz
8112 Ricker Road
Grabill, IN 46741
Represented By
R. William Jonas, Jr.
Hammerschmidt, Amaral & Jonas
contact info
Creditor Committee
Karen Andrews
916 Lynwood Drive
Goshen, IN 46526
Represented By
R. William Jonas, Jr.
Hammerschmidt, Amaral & Jonas
contact info
Trustee
Douglas R. Adelsperger
111 W. Wayne St.
Fort Wayne, IN 46802
Represented By
Yvette Gaff Kleven
Adelsperger & Kleven, LLP
contact info
James E. Rossow
Rubin & Levin, P.C.
contact info
Edmund P. Kos
Kos & Associate
contact info
Meredith R. Theisen
Rubin & Levin, P.C.
contact info
Douglas R. Adelsperger
Adelsperger & Kleven, LLP
contact info
Deborah J. Caruso
Rubin & Levin, P.C.
contact info
John C. Hoard(CMB)
Rubin And Levin, P.C.
contact info
David M. Mustard
Kos & Associates
contact info
U.S. Trustee
Nancy J. Gargula
One Michiana Square Building Suite 555 100 East Wayne Street
South Bend, IN 46601
Represented By
Ellen L. Triebold
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info
Susan Jaffe Roberts
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 12:00 PM EDT
Thursday, April 24, 2025
1958 1958 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Thu 04/24 8:49 AM
Trustee's Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for the Quarter Ending: 03/31/2025 Filed by Trustee Douglas R. Adelsperger (Adelsperger, Douglas)
Related: [-]