Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:13-bk-01520

Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:K Rodney May
Case #: 8:16-ap-00081
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Jan 29, 2016
Terminated:Jan 25, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Republican Party of Florida
420 E. Jefferson Street
Tallahassee, FL 32301
Represented By
Republican Party of Florida
contact info
Plaintiff
Soneet Kapila
Liquidating Agent for estate of Univers Trenam Law c/o Lori V. Vaughan PO Box 1102
Tampa, FL 33601
Represented By
Lori V Vaughan
Trenam Kemker
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, January 25, 2017
court Close Adversary Case Wed 01/25 4:12 PM
Adversary Case 8:16-ap-81 Closed. (Susan M.)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 16, 2016
18 18 misc Stipulation Fri 12/16 1:52 PM
Joint Stipulation for Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice Filed by Lori V Vaughan on behalf of Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Vaughan, Lori)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 09, 2016
17 17 order Reschedule Hearing Wed 11/09 3:07 PM
Order Granting Motion To Reschedule Hearing on Pretrial Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 1/26/2017 at 11:00 AM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 9B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. Service Instructions: Lori Vaughan is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Anel)
Related: [-] 16
16 16 motion Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing Wed 11/09 10:54 AM
Unopposed Motion to Reschedule Hearing On November 10, 2016 at 2:00 p.m. Filed by Lori V Vaughan on behalf of Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Vaughan, Lori)
Related: [-] 15
misc Electronic Service Text Entry (TEXT ONLY) Wed 11/09 5:27 PM
Service completed via CM/ECF electronic notification. Filed by Lori V Vaughan on behalf of Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Vaughan, Lori)
Related: [-] 17
Tuesday, November 08, 2016
court Compromise Cross-Reference Tue 11/08 11:16 AM
Order Granting Motion to Approve Compromise filed in Case No. 8:13-bk-01520-KRM Universal Health Care Group, Inc. . (Anel)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 10, 2016
court Compromise Cross-Reference Tue 10/11 10:45 AM
Motion to Approve Compromise filed in Case No. 8:13-bk-01520-KRM Universal Health Care Group, Inc. . (Anel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 18, 2016
court (NO PAPER) - Removal of Restrictions on Transcript Thu 08/18 12:49 PM
Removal of Viewing Restrictions on Transcript Due to No Request for Redaction from Hearing Participants Related [+]. (Anel)
Related: [-] 12
Thursday, July 21, 2016
15 15 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Fri 07/22 5:43 PM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Megan Murray. RULING: Pretrial on Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Republican Party of Florida Related [+] (Vaughan, Lori), Doc. #1 (Cont'd from 5/12/2016) - Cont'd to 11/10/2016 at 2:00 pm; Announced in open court. Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Dkt)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer
Sunday, May 22, 2016
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 05/23 12:33 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+]. Notice Date 05/22/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #13 )
Friday, May 20, 2016
13 13 court Notice Regarding Filing of Transcript and Deadline for Filing Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Fri 05/20 9:46 AM
Notice Regarding Filing of Transcript and Deadline for Filing Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of Transcript. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of Transcript to be filed within 7 calendar days of the date of service of this notice, but an additional three days may be added if the notice is served by U.S. Mail Related [+]. (Anel)
Related: [-] 12
Thursday, May 19, 2016
12 12 court Transcript Thu 05/19 4:03 PM
Transcript Regarding Hearing Held May 12, 2016 on Postconfirmation Status Conference. To purchase a copy of this transcript, please contact Statewide Reporting Service: 904-353-7706 Related [+]. Transcript access will be restricted through 08/17/2016. (Statewide Reporting Service)
Related: [-] 11
Att: 1 Signature Page
Thursday, May 12, 2016
11 11 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Mon 05/16 4:31 PM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Lori Vaughan, Chris Barker. RULING: Pretrial on Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Republican Party of Florida Related [+] (Vaughan, Lori), Doc. #1 - Cont'd to 7/21/2016 at 3:00 pm; Announced in open court. Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Dkt)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer
Saturday, April 09, 2016
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Notice Sun 04/10 12:30 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing Related [+]. Notice Date 04/09/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #9 )
Thursday, April 07, 2016
9 9 court Notice Of Pretrial / Status Conference Thu 04/07 8:01 AM
Notice of Pretrial/ Status Conference. Related [+]. Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/12/2016 at 03:30 PM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 9B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. (Anel)
Related: [-] 8 ,1
Friday, April 01, 2016
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 04/01 2:17 PM
Answer to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses Related [+]. Filed by Chris A Barker on behalf of Defendant Republican Party of Florida. (Barker, Chris)
Related: [-] 1
Wednesday, March 16, 2016
7 7 misc Proof of Service Wed 03/16 3:03 PM
Proof of Service of Order Granting Agreed Motion to Extend Time. Filed by Lori V Vaughan on behalf of Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Vaughan, Lori)
Related: [-] 6
6 6 order Extend Time Wed 03/16 2:30 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint and Deadline to Seek Default to May 16, 2016 Related [+]. Service Instructions: Lori Vaughan is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Anel)
Related: [-] 5
Tuesday, March 15, 2016
5 5 motion Motion to Extend Time Tue 03/15 4:00 PM
Agreed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint and Deadline to Seek Default Filed by Lori V Vaughan on behalf of Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Vaughan, Lori)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 17, 2016
4 4 notice Notice (DO NOT USE for appearances or hearings) Wed 02/17 1:29 PM
Notice of Acceptance of Service of Process on behalf of Defendant Filed by Lori V Vaughan on behalf of Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Vaughan, Lori)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, February 02, 2016
3 3 misc Summons Service Executed Tue 02/02 2:44 PM
Service Executed of Summons, Complaint, Administrative Order FLMB-2014-10 on Republican Party of Florida Filed by Lori V Vaughan on behalf of Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Vaughan, Lori)
Related: [-] 1
Monday, February 01, 2016
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Mon 02/01 10:30 AM
Summons issued on Republican Party of Florida along with Administrative Order FLMB-2014-10 - Prescribing Procedures for Adversary Proceedings. Answer Due 03/02/2016. If one or more defendants are the United States or an officer or agency thereof, add an additional five days to the Answer Due date. (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 29, 2016
1 1 cmp Complaint - Original Fri 01/29 3:08 PM
Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Republican Party of Florida. Filing Fee Deferred. Nature of Suit: [13 Related [+]]. (Vaughan, Lori)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer