Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Caryl E Delano
Case #: 8:13-bk-01520
Case Filed:Feb 06, 2013
Creditor Meeting:Mar 11, 2013
Claims Deadline:Apr 22, 2013
Plan Confirmed:Aug 18, 2015

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$50,000,001 to $100 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Universal Health Care Group, Inc.
100 Central Ave Ste 200
Saint Petersburg, FL 33701-3324
Represented By
Harley E Riedel
Stichter Riedel Blain & Prosser
contact info
Stichter, Riedel, Blain & Prosser, P.A.
contact info
Russell M Blain
Stichter, Riedel, Blain & Prosser
contact info
Barbara A Hart
Stichter, Riedel, Blain & Prosser
contact info
Scott A. Stichter
Stichter, Riedel, Blain & Prosser
contact info
Jeff J Friedman
Katten Muchin Rosenman, LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
Liquidating Trustee
Soneet R. Kapila
P.O. Box 14213
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33302
Represented By
Charles Franklin Ketchey
Trenam Kemker
contact info
Lori V Vaughan
Trenam Kemker
contact info
Megan Wilson Murray
Trenam Kemker
contact info
Soneet R Kapila
contact info
Stephanie C Lieb
Trenam, Kemker
contact info
Michael P. Horan
Trenam Kemker Scharf Barkin Frye Et Al.
contact info
Plaintiff
Sabrina De La Concha
Represented By
James S Myers
Mcrae & Metcalf PA
contact info
Trustee
Soneet R Kapila
Post Office Box 14213
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33302
Represented By
Charles Franklin Ketchey
Trenam Kemker
contact info
Seth P Traub, Attorney for Trustee
Shumaker Loop & Kendrick, LLP
contact info
Shumaker, Loop & Kendrick, LLP
contact info
David C Cimo
Genovese Joblove & Batista PA
contact info
Trenam, Kemker, Scharf, Barkin et al, Attorney for Trustee
contact info
Rhys P Leonard
Trenam Kemker
contact info
Theresa M B Van Vliet
Genovese Joblove & Battista PA
contact info
Jason Mazer
contact info
Paul Steven Singerman
Berger Singerman, PA
contact info
Steven M Berman
Shumaker, Loop & Kendrick, LLP
contact info
David S Jennis
Jennis & Bowen Pl
contact info
Steven M Berman, Attorney for Trustee
Shumaker Loop & Kendrick, LLP
contact info
Erik Johanson
Jennis & Bowen, Pl
contact info
Lori V Vaughan
Trenam Kemker
contact info
Genovese Joblove & Battista, P.A.
contact info
Anne C McAdams
Trenam Kemker
contact info
Megan Wilson Murray
Trenam Kemker
contact info
Kathleen L DiSanto
Jennis & Bowen
contact info
Roberta A Colton
contact info
Jennis & Bowen, PL, Attorney for Trustee
Jennis & Bowen, Pl
contact info
Seth P. Traub
Shumaker Loop & Kendrick, LLP
contact info
James D. Gassenheimer
Berger Singerman. P.A.
contact info
Stephanie C Lieb
Trenam, Kemker
contact info
Michael P. Horan
Trenam Kemker Scharf Barkin Frye Et Al.
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee - TPA
Timberlake Annex, Suite 1200 501 E Polk Street
Tampa, FL 33602
Represented By
Denise E Barnett
United States Trustee
contact info
Nicole Peair
Timberlake Annex
contact info

Docket last updated: 5 minutes ago
Thursday, May 01, 2025
2462 2462 notice Notice of Hearing (BK) Thu 05/01 11:19 AM
Notice of Preliminary Hearing on Motion to Approve Compromise of Controversy or Settlement Agreement and Payment of Contingency Fee and Costs to Special Litigation Counsel, Berger Singerman, LLP Filed by Paul Steven Singerman on behalf of Liquidating Trustee Soneet R. Kapila Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 6/4/2025 at 11:00 AM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 9A, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N Florida Avenue . (Singerman, Paul)
Related: [-] 2453
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
2461 2461 notice Notice (DO NOT USE for appearances or hearings) Wed 04/30 1:02 PM
Notice of Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses and Opportunity to Object and Request for Hearing (American Managed Care, LLC) Filed by Lara Roeske Fernandez on behalf of Liquidating Trustee Soneet R. Kapila Related [+]. (Fernandez, Lara)
Related: [-] 2460
2460 2460 motion Application for Compensation (incl. Quantum Meruit) Wed 04/30 12:59 PM
Verified Application for Compensation (American Managed Care, LLC)
Related: [-]
2459 2459 notice Notice (DO NOT USE for appearances or hearings) Wed 04/30 12:56 PM
Notice of Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses and Opportunity to Object and Request for Hearing (Universal Health Care Group, Inc.) Filed by Lara Roeske Fernandez on behalf of Liquidating Trustee Soneet R. Kapila Related [+]. (Fernandez, Lara)
Related: [-] 2458
2458 2458 motion Application for Compensation (incl. Quantum Meruit) Wed 04/30 12:52 PM
Verified Application for Compensation (Universal Health Care Group, Inc.)
Related: [-]
2457 2457 notice Notice (DO NOT USE for appearances or hearings) Wed 04/30 12:44 PM
Notice of Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses and Opportunity to Object and Request for Hearing (American Managed Care LLC) Filed by Lara Roeske Fernandez on behalf of Liquidating Trustee Soneet R. Kapila Related [+]. (Fernandez, Lara)
Related: [-] 2456
2456 2456 motion Application for Compensation (incl. Quantum Meruit) Wed 04/30 12:39 PM
Verified Application for Compensation (American Managed Care, LLC)
Related: [-]
2455 2455 notice Notice (DO NOT USE for appearances or hearings) Wed 04/30 12:35 PM
Notice of Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses and Opportunity to Object and Request For Hearing Filed by Lara Roeske Fernandez on behalf of Liquidating Trustee Soneet R. Kapila Related [+]. (Fernandez, Lara)
Related: [-] 2454
2454 2454 motion Application for Compensation (incl. Quantum Meruit) Wed 04/30 12:30 PM
Verified Application for Compensation (Universal Health Care Group, Inc.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
court Prepare Hearing Notice - Automation Use Only Tue 04/29 1:51 PM
Preliminary Hearing Scheduled for 06/04/2025 11:00 am Tampa, FL - Courtroom 9A, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N Florida Avenue. Re: Motion to Approve Compromise of Controversy or Settlement Agreement. and Payment of Contingency Fee and Costs to Special Litigation Counsel, Berger Singerman, LLP. Doc2453 . This entry is not an official notice of hearing from the court. Noticing Instructions : The Court directs Paul Steven Singerman to prepare, file, and serve a notice of hearing that includes the information on the Notice of Hearing Sample Form available at https://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/proguide/documents/Samples/Notice_of_Hearing_Bankruptcy_Sample_Form.pdf?id=1 Counsel must file and serve the notice of hearing on interested parties within 3 days. If the hearing is on an Emergency/Expedited matter, then counsel must file and serve the notice of hearing immediately upon receipt of this directive. If the notice of hearing is not timely served and filed, then the Court will remove it from the hearing calendar and, in its discretion, may deny the relief requested. Related [+]. (Bill)
Related: [-] 2453
Friday, April 25, 2025
2453 2453 motion Motion to Approve Compromise of Controversy or Settlement Agreement Fri 04/25 2:08 PM
Related: [-]