Member Case
Lead case is: 1:16-bk-10296

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:16-bk-10300
Case Filed:Feb 02, 2016
Terminated:Oct 18, 2017

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$50,000,001 to $100 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
HF Enterprises, Inc.
1 Fashion Way
Baldwyn, MS 38824-8547
Represented By
Mark D. Collins
Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
844 King Street, Room 2207 Lockbox #35
Wilmington, DE 19899


Docket last updated: 58 minutes ago
Wednesday, October 18, 2017
court Close Bankruptcy Case Wed 10/18 4:24 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (MML)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 16, 2017
8 8 order Final Decree Mon 10/16 2:45 PM
Order And Final Decree Closing the Chapter 11 Cases of Hancock Fabrics, Inc.'s Subsidiary Corporations. Signed on 10/16/2017 (LCN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 28, 2016
7 7 misc Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity Tue 06/28 7:27 PM
Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity filed: Sch D, , Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by HF Enterprises, Inc.. (Haywood, Brett)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 04, 2016
6 6 misc Schedules/Statements Mon 04/04 11:33 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by HF Enterprises, Inc.. (Biblo, Rachel)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Schedules/Statements Mon 04/04 11:32 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by HF Enterprises, Inc.. (Biblo, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 03, 2016
4 4 order Order-Joint Admin Wed 02/03 1:32 PM
Order Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases (Case No. 16-10296 through 16-10302 . An order has been entered in this case consolidating this case with the case of Hancock Fabrics, Inc. (Case No. 16-10296 BLS)) for procedural purposes only and Providing for its joint administration in accordance with the terms thereof. The docket in Case No. 16-10296 BLS) should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Signed on 2/3/2016 (LCN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 02, 2016
3 3 motion Joint Administration - Motion (Multi) Tue 02/02 10:54 AM
Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Hancock Fabrics, Inc.. (Collins, Mark)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd none Tue 02/02 10:47 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 16-10300 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 7884161, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 18 pgs misc RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Tue 02/02 10:32 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by HF Enterprises, Inc.. (Collins, Mark)
Related: [-]
court Case Assigned Tue 02/02 11:15 AM
Judge Brendan Linehan Shannon added to case. (AK)
Related: [-]