Hancock Fabrics, Inc.
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Brendan Linehan Shannon |
Case #: | 1:16-bk-10296 |
Case Filed: | Feb 02, 2016 |
Creditor Meeting: | Apr 20, 2016 |
Terminated: | Mar 16, 2020 |
Plan Confirmed: | Jun 20, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 5,001-10,000 |
Est. Assets | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Est. Liabilities | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Hancock Fabrics, Inc.
P.O. Box 4440
Tupelo, MS 38803 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: Friday Jan 18, 2019 12:47 PM EST |
Alternate Claims Agent
Hancock Fabrics, Inc.
P.O. Box 4440
Tupelo, MS 38803 |
|
Attorney
Brian Arban
|
Represented By
|
Attorney
Richards Layton & Finger, P.A.
|
Represented By
|
Consultant
RCS Real Estate Advisors
|
|
Consumer Privacy Ombudsman
Lucy L Thomson
1455 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.,Suite 400
Washington, DC 20004 |
|
Creditor
452 LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
ANE, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
ARC JCLOUKY001, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
ARC WLHUMTX001, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
AmCap Austin Bluffs, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
American Electric Power, CenterPoint Energy Arkla
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
American National Insurance Company
One Moody Plaza
Galveston, TX 77550 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Aronov Realty Management
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Atascocita Commons II Associates, L.P.
2029 Century Park East Suite 2600
Los Angeles, CA 90067 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
BC Wood Properties, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Bexar County
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Brixmor Property Group, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
CBL & Associates Management, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Canon Financial Services, Inc. c/o Nicola G. Suglia, Esquire
Fleischer, Fleischer & Suglia, PC 601 Route 73 North Suite 305
Marlton, NJ 08043 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
CenterPoint Energy Resources Corp. d/b/a CenterPoint Energy Minnesota Gas, CenterPoint Energy Resources Corp. d/b/a CenterPoint Energy Mississippi Gas, CenterPoint Energy Texas Gas
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Central Avenue Mall
490 North 31st St., Ste. 500 PO Box 2529
Billings, MT 59103 |
|
Creditor
Central Heights, Ltd.
3800 Ross Tower 500 N. Akard Street
Dallas, TX 75201 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Certain Texas Taxing Authorities
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Certain Texas Taxing Entities
1235 North Loop West Suite 600
Houston, TX 77008 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Charleston Plaza 631, LLC and Kimco Tyvola, LP
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Charleston Plaza 631, LLC, Kimco Tyvola, LP and Kirkwood Crossing 803, LLC ("Kimco Landlords")
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Chatham County Tax Commissioner
P.O. Box 8324
Savannah, GA 31412 |
|
Creditor
Chubb Companies
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
City of Garland
1919 S Shiloh Rd Suite 310, LB 40
Garland, TX, TX 75042 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Clear Creek Independent School District
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Commonwealth Edison Company, Georgia Power Company, Tucson Electric Power , Virginia Electric and Power Company d/b/a Dominion Virginia Power
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Commonwealth Of Pennsylvania, Department Of Labor And Industry
UCTS 651 Boas Street, Room 702
Harrisburg, PA 17121 |
|
Creditor
Barbara Connett-Rayman
2929 Guthrie Ave.
Des Moines, IA 50317 |
|
Creditor
Cypress Fairbanks ISD
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP c/o John P. Dillman P.O. Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
DDR Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Dallas County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson,LLP c/o Elizabeth Weller 2777 N Stemmons Frwy Suite 1000
Dallas, TX 75207 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Deutsche Asset & Wealth Management
2029 Century Park East Suite 2600
Los Angeles, CA 90067 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Drusilla Village, LLC
PO Box 77130
Baton Rouge, LA 70879 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Ellis & Co., Ltd
P.O. Box 1879
Tarpon Springs, FL 34688 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Equity One, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Fair Harbor Capital, LLC
Ansonia Finance Station PO Box 237037
New York, NY 10023 |
|
Creditor
Fairfield Processing Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Federal Realty Investment Trust
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
G&I VIII WTC, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
GGP Limited Partnership
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Garland ISD
1919 S Shiloh Rd Suite 310, LB 40
Garland, TX 75042 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Gateway Fashion Mall, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Gateway Plaza Property LLC
Two North Central Avenue
Phoenix, AZ 85004 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Jeffie L. Gatlin
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Great American Group, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Hallain Brothers No. 1
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Paula Hardin
418 Planters Canal Road
Belle Chasse, LA 70037 |
|
Creditor
Harris County
Post Office Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Henrico County, Virginia
County Attorney P.O. Box 90775
Henrico, VA 23273 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Highland Management Associates, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Frances Freund Hillsman
Hillsman Properties 1006 W. Taft, #350
Sapulpa, OK 74066 |
|
Creditor
Patricia Hoeft
1116 Shoal creek Trail
Chesapeake, VA 23320 |
|
Creditor
Hunnington Center Partners, Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
IRC Woodbury Commons, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Inland Woodbury Commons L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
JAHCO OKLAHOMA Properties I, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
JSMIV, LLC and 122 Cherokee Road, LLC, formerly Huntersville Square I, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Janome America, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Jefferson Investment Partners, LLC
2029 Century Park East Suite 2600
Los Angeles, CA 90067 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Judson ISD
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
KMPW Center, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
KRG Management, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
KRG Market Street Village, LP
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Kern County Treasurer and Tax Collector Office
c/o Salina Thomas P.O. Box 579
Bakersfield, CA 93302 |
|
Creditor
Larry G. Kirk
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Kirkwood Crossing 803, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Kootenai County Treasurer, c/o Kootenai County Legal Services
P.O. Box 9000
Coeur d'Alene, ID 83816 |
|
Creditor
LVP Center, LLC
840 East High Street
Lexington, KY 40502 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Layton Village Retail Associates, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Lightman South Lake Co., LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Lion Brand Yarn Company
Scarinci & Hollenbeck, LLC 1100 Valley Brook Avenue P.O. Box 790
Lyndhurst, NJ 07071 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Loomis Centre LLC
Leverson Lucey & Metz, SC 303 W. Highland Blvd.
Milwaukee, WI 53208 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Macon-Bibb County Tax Commissioner
PO Box 4101
Macon, GA 31208 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Menard, Inc.,
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Mississippi Department of Revenue
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Missouri Department of Revenue
Bankruptcy Unit PO Box 475
Jefferson City, MO 65105 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Monarch at Acworth Crossing, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Montage Textiles Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Montclair Center, LLC and Grand 72, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Montgomery County
Post Office Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Mundial, Inc.
132 Central Street, Suite 215
Foxborough, MA 02035 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Muskogee Property Shopping Center, LLC
231 S. Bemiston Avenue Suite 750
St. Louis, MO 63105 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Myletex International
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Napa River Park Center, LLC
Trainor Fairbrook 980 Fulton Avenue
Sacramento, CA 95825 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
National Retail Properties, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Anne C. Newton
627 Tamaqua Dr.
Marietta, GA 80066 |
|
Creditor
North Pima Anchors, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Ohio Bureau of Workers' Compensation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Oklahoma County Treasurer
320 Robert S Kerr Ave Rm 307
Oklahoma City, OK 73102 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
PGIM Real Estate
2029 Century Park East Suite 800
Los Angeles, CA 90067 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Parker Plaza West, Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Pearl-Hwy 80, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation
Office of the Chief Counsel 1200 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Phillips Edison & Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Pring Corporation
Paine Hamblen LLP 717 W Sprague Ave Ste 1200
Spokane, WA 99201 |
|
Creditor
Regency Centers Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Retail Management Services Co., LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
SKY Properties, Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
SM Financial Services Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Sam Gordon Family Limited Partnership
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Simplicity Pattern Co., Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Slate Sutherland Retail Holdings, LLC
|
|
Creditor
South Park Shopping Center, LLC
Post Office Box 33009
Raleigh, NC 27636 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
State Board of Equalization
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
State of Michigan, Department of Treasury
Department of Attorney General Cadillac Place 3030 W. Grand Blvd., Ste. 10-200
Detroit, MI 48202 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Sykel Enterprises, Division of Fabrique Innovations Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
TN Dept of Revenue
Bankruptcy Division P.O. Box 20207
Nashville, TN 37202 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Tennessee Attorney General- Consumer Division
Bankruptcy Division P.O. Box 20207
Nashville, TN 37202 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Texas Ad Valorem Taxing Jurisdictions
Lee Gordon P O Box 1269
Round Rock, TX 78680 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Thalia Wayside Associates
500 East Main Street Suite 1225
Norfolk, VA 23510 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
The Farm Properties, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
The Grewe Limited Partnership
|
|
Creditor
The Prudential Insurance Company of America
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
The Realty Associates Fund VIII L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
The Sam Gordon Family Limited Partnership
400 Capitol Mall, Suite 2560
Sacramento, CA 95814 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Thornton Lane, L.P.
3800 Ross Tower 500 North Akard Street
Dallas, TX 75201 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Tom Green County Tax Appraisal District
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Travis County
P.O. Box 1748
Austin, TX 78767 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Trend Offset Printing Services, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Triple B #3, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
United States/USAO
U.S. Attorney's Office 1007 N. Orange Street Suite 700
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Karen Varel
|
|
Creditor
Viking Partners Houma, LLC
840 East High Street
Lexington, KY 40502 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
WC Northtown Village, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
WEC 97-H Idaho Investment Trust
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
WP Glimcher Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
WP Realty
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Wax 77 Investors LP
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Wax 77 Investors, LP
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Wilton Brands LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Wm. Wright Co.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
World Dynasty International Trading Co., Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Hancock Fabrics, Inc., et al.
|
Represented By
|
Financial Advisor
Clear Thinking Group LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Anmar Investments, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Bonanza Retail Partners, LLC
199 S. Los Robles Avenue Suite 600
Pasadena, CA 91101 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Brickyard Retail, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Jack W. Busby, Jr.
4956 Butler Rd.
Tupelo, MS 38801 |
|
Interested Party
CCP Paseo I, LLC d/b/a Plaza Paseo, LLC
Commercial Real Estate Management, LLC Attn: Jodie Stone 5951 Jefferson St. NE, Suite A
Albuquerque, NM 87109 |
|
Interested Party
Charles County Maryland
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
City of Bellaire, et al.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Country Village Shopping Center, LLC
Best & Flanagan LLP Att: Patrick B. Hennessy 60 South 6th Street Suite 2700
Minneapolis, MN 55402 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Curlander Holdings, LLC
8960 Mountain View Lane
Boulder, CO 80303 |
|
Interested Party
Dana Rapid City LLC
718 East St. Andrews
Dakota Dunes, SD 57049 |
|
Interested Party
Sylvia L. Dumford
1343 Wood Park Drive
Kennesaw, GA 30152 |
|
Interested Party
Federal Construction, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
GACP Finance Co., LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Sheron Harris
|
|
Interested Party
Hawthorne Retail Partners, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Hilltop Development, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
IA Atlanta Buckhead, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
IA Edmond Bryant, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Denise E. Jones
675 Wooddale Blvd. #76
Baton Rouge, LA 70806 |
|
Interested Party
Jubilee Square LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Kim Killian
|
|
Interested Party
Kirk G. Larry
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Lincoln Partners Advisors, LLC
|
|
Interested Party
Liquidity Solutions, Inc.
One University Plaza Suite 312
Hackensack, NJ 07601 |
|
Interested Party
Madison Waldorf LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Marisol International, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Minnesota Department of Revenue
|
|
Interested Party
Mississippi Edgewater Square Investors, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Billy M. Morgan
P.O. Box 3847
Tupelo, MS 38803 |
|
Interested Party
Northwest Natural Gas Company
|
|
Interested Party
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Orli Rachel Daniels Trust
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
PREIT Services, LLC, as agent for PR Wiregrass Commons, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Parker Plaza West, Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Prestige Global Co. Ltd.
Ste 320
Garden City, NY 11530 |
|
Interested Party
Prince George's County, Maryland
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Prym Consumer USA
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Quad Capital Partners LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Ralphs Grocery Company
|
|
Interested Party
Ramco Auburn Crossroads SPE, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Ramco-Gershenson Properties, LP
31500 Northwestern Hwy. Suite 300
Farmington Hills, MI 48334 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Rosenthal & Rosenthal, Inc.
|
|
Interested Party
Silver State Station, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Singer Sewing Company
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Springs Creative Products Group, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Sun 'N' Sand Accessories
Rish Mehra, Vice President 1813 109th Street
Grand Prairie, TX 75050 |
|
Interested Party
Tallywood Shopping Center
P.O. Box 1660
Fayetteville, NC 28303 |
|
Interested Party
Tower Park Management Co.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
U.S. Bank National Association
|
|
Interested Party
United Parcel Service, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
WNQE Independence VI, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Wade T. Batson, III, Delaney Cannon Batson, Laney Batson White, and Wade Thomas Batson IV
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Wells Fargo Bank National Association
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Y&O WF, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Yakima County Treasurer
|
|
Transcriber
Reliable Companies
1007 North Orange Street Suite 110
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
844 King Street, Room 2207 Lockbox #35
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Claims Agent
Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC
Terminated: 10/18/2017
www.kccllc.com 2335 Alaska Ave
El Segundo, CA 90245 |
Represented By
|
1. | Michaels buys Hancock Fabrics for $1.3 million, taking it out of bankruptcy (dallasnews.com) |
Submitted Tue 08/09/2016 | |
2. | Hancock Fabrics files for chapter 11 bankruptcy and closes 70 stores in a restructuring effort (semissourian.com) |
Submitted Tue 04/05/2016 | |
3. | WTVA.com | Hancock Fabrics files Chapter 11 to reorganize (wtva.com) |
Submitted Wed 02/03/2016 | |
Docket last updated: 2 minutes ago |