Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:14-bk-11802

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Sean H Lane
Case #: 1:16-ap-01016
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
Case Filed:Feb 02, 2016
Terminated:Apr 05, 2016
Last checked: never
Defendant
David Bergstein
Represented By
Garry T Stevens, Jr
Squitieri & Fearon, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Graybox LLC
Represented By
Graybox LLC
contact info
Defendant
Iskra Enterprises, LLC
Represented By
Iskra Enterprises, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Weston Capital Asset Management, LLC
Represented By
Weston Capital Asset Management, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Asia Capital Markets Limited LLC
Represented By
Asia Capital Markets Limited LLC
contact info
Defendant
Gerova Management, Inc.
Represented By
Gerova Management, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Henry N. Jannol
Represented By
Henry N. Jannol
contact info
Defendant
Spillane Weingarten, LLP
Represented By
Spillane Weingarten, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Venable LLP
Represented By
Venable LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Wimbledon Financing Master Fund, Ltd.
Represented By
Wimbledon Financing Master Fund, Ltd.
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, January 13, 2017
10 10 misc Affidavit of Service Fri 01/13 11:01 AM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] Filed by John E. Jureller Jr. on behalf of Wimbledon Financing Master Fund, Ltd.. (Jureller, John)
Related: [-] 9
Thursday, January 12, 2017
9 9 notice Notice, Proposed Order/Presentment Thu 01/12 6:10 PM
Amended Notice of Proposed Order /Amended Notice of Presentment of Proposed Order Directing Distribution on Allowed Bergstein Claim Pursuant to Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law, and Order Confirming First Amended Joint Liquidating Plan of Reorganization of the Debtors and Debtors in Possession Dated January 28, 2016 filed by John E. Jureller Jr. on behalf of Wimbledon Financing Master Fund, Ltd.. with presentment to be held on 1/26/2017 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 701 (SHL) Objections due by 1/23/2017,(Jureller, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Proposed Order
Att: 3 Exhibit B to Proposed Order
Tuesday, December 20, 2016
8 8 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Tue 12/20 11:13 AM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on Notice of Presentment of Proposed Order Directing Distribution on Allowed Bergstein Claim Pursuant to Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law, and Order Confirming First Amended Joint Liquidating Plan of Reorganization of Debtors and Debtors in Possession Dated January 28, 2016 filed by John E. Jureller Jr. on behalf of Wimbledon Financing Master Fund, Ltd.. with hearing to be held on 1/26/2017 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 701 (SHL) (Jureller, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 15, 2016
7 7 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Tue 11/15 4:13 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on Notice of Presentment of Proposed Order Directing Distribution on Allowed Bergstein Claim filed by John E. Jureller Jr. on behalf of Wimbledon Financing Master Fund, Ltd.. with hearing to be held on 12/21/2016 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 701 (SHL) (Jureller, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 05, 2016
misc Adversary Closed Tue 04/05 2:45 PM
Adversary Case 1:16-ap-1016 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Ebanks, Liza)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 12, 2016
6 6 20 pgs misc Transcript Wed 02/24 10:56 AM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 2/5/2016 4:35PM RE: Status conference re: transferred case. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 5/12/2016. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Legal Solutions.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 2/19/2016. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 3/4/2016. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 3/14/2016. Transcript access will be restricted through 5/12/2016. (Ortiz, Carmen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 11, 2016
4 4 misc Letter Thu 02/11 4:08 PM
Letter dated 02/11/2016, To The New York State Supreme Court, County Clerks Office Re: Acknowledgment Of Receipt Of Documents Related [+] Filed by Clerk's Office Office, U.S.Bankruptcy, S.D.N.Y. (Ho, Amanda)
Related: [-] 3
Tuesday, February 09, 2016
5 5 32 pgs misc Transcript Thu 02/18 3:31 PM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 2/4/2016 11:44AM RE: Status Conference Re: Transferred Case. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 5/9/2016. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Legal Solutions.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 2/16/2016. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 3/1/2016. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 3/11/2016. Transcript access will be restricted through 5/9/2016. (Ortiz, Carmen)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 08, 2016
3 3 order So Ordered Stipulation Mon 02/08 10:27 AM
So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 2/8/2016, Remanding Proceeding To New York Supreme Court. (Ebanks, Liza)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 03, 2016
2 2 motion Motion, Intervene Wed 02/03 11:26 PM
Motion to Intervene Memorandum Of Law In Support Of SulmeyerKupetz, A Professional Corporation's Motion To Intervene Pursuant To Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 24(a) And (b); Declaration Of Victor A. Sahn filed by Victor A Sahn on behalf of SulmeyerKupetz, A Professional Corporation. (Sahn, Victor)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 02, 2016
1 1 notice Transfer Order Tue 02/02 3:46 PM
Adversary case 16-01016 Copy of Certified Order Transferring Case No. 16CV681 from the U.S. District Court, S.D.N.Y. to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court, S.D.N.Y. Related [+]. Nature(s) of Suit: (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) Filed by Wimbledon Financing Master Fund, Ltd.. (Aquino, Lourdes)
Related: [-] ceipt Number USDC95681, Fee Amount $ 350.
Att: 1 docket report
Att: 2 doc 1
Att: 3 doc 1a
Att: 4 doc 1b
Att: 5 doc 1c
Att: 6 doc 1d
Att: 7 doc 1e
Att: 8 doc 1f
Att: 9 doc 1g
Att: 10 doc 1h
Att: 11 doc 1i
Att: 12 doc 1j
Att: 13 doc 1k