New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:David S Jones
Case #: 1:14-bk-11802
Case Filed:Jun 13, 2014
Creditor Meeting:Sep 05, 2014

TypeOther Entity Type
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Aramid Entertainment Fund Limited
201 E 42nd St Fl 21
New York, NY 10017-5735
Represented By
James C. McCarroll
Reed Smith, LLP
contact info
Debtor
Aramid Entertainment Fund Limited, et al.,
675 Third Avenue, 21st Floor
New York, NY 10017
Represented By
David L. Neale
Levene Neale Bender Yoo & Brill LLP
contact info
Kerri Anne Lyman
Irell & Manella LLP
contact info
Todd M Arnold
Levene, Neale, Bender, Yoo & Brill L.LP
contact info
James C. McCarroll
Reed Smith, LLP
contact info
Kurt F. Gwynne
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Richard A. Robinson
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014
Represented By
Andrea Beth Schwartz
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info

GPO Jan 12 2022
OPINION & ORDER: re: 13 MOTION to Dismiss Appellant David Molner's interlocutory bankruptcy appeal for lack of appellate jurisdiction filed by Jordan W. Siev, James C. McCarroll, James L. Sanders, Francisca Mok, Kurt Gwynne, Reed Smith, LLP. For the foregoing reasons, Defendants' motion to dismiss is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion, Doc. 13, and close the case. It is SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 1/12/2022). (Martinez, Adelaida)

1. Aramid Entertainment Fund Files for Bankruptcy Over Suits (bloomberg.com)
Submitted Mon 06/16/2014
Docket last updated: 10 minutes ago
Thursday, May 01, 2025
1106 1106 misc Affidavit of Service Thu 05/01 9:34 PM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] Filed by James C. McCarroll on behalf of Aramid Distribution Trust. (McCarroll, James)
Related: [-] 1104 ,1105 ,1103
1105 1105 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Thu 05/01 9:30 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 14-11804 for the Quarter Ending: 03/31/2025 Filed by James C. McCarroll on behalf of Aramid Distribution Trust. (McCarroll, James)
Related: [-]
1104 1104 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Thu 05/01 9:27 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 14-11803 for the Quarter Ending: 03/31/2025 Filed by James C. McCarroll on behalf of Aramid Distribution Trust. (McCarroll, James)
Related: [-]
1103 1103 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Thu 05/01 9:24 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for the Quarter Ending: 03/31/2025 Filed by James C. McCarroll on behalf of Aramid Distribution Trust. (McCarroll, James)
Related: [-]