Paragon Offshore Holdings US Inc.
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:16-bk-10386
Lead case is: 1:16-bk-10386
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Christopher S Sontchi |
Case #: | 1:16-bk-10393 |
Case Filed: | Feb 14, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jan 09, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 10,001-25,000 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Paragon Offshore Holdings US Inc.
3151 Briarpark Dr Ste 700
Houston, TX 77042-3809 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
844 King Street, Room 2207 Lockbox #35
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
Docket last updated: 11 minutes ago |
Tuesday, January 09, 2018 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Tue 01/09 2:35 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (DMC) |
||
Monday, January 08, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Order Closing Certain Chapter 11 Cases. Signed on 1/8/2018 (NAB) |
|
Thursday, April 14, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by Paragon Offshore Holdings US Inc.. (Barsalona II, Joseph) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by Paragon Offshore Holdings US Inc.. (Barsalona II, Joseph) |
|
Wednesday, February 17, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Order Authorizing Joint Administration. An order has been entered in this case directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of Paragon Offshore plc 16-10386 ; Paragon Offshore Finance Company 16-10388 ; Paragon International Finance Company 16-10391 ; Paragon Offshore Holdings US Inc. 16-10393 ; Paragon Offshore Drilling LLC 16-10385 ; Paragon FDR Holdings Ltd 16-10395 ; Paragon Duchess Ltd. 16-10398 ; Paragon Offshore (Luxembourg) S. r.l 16-10400 ;PGN Offshore Drilling (Malaysia) Sdn. Bhd 16-10403 ;Paragon Offshore (Labuan) Pte. Ltd. 16-10406 ; Paragon Holding SCS 2 Ltd. 16-10407 ; Paragon Asset Company Ltd. 16-10408 ; Paragon Holding SCS 1 Ltd 16-10409 ; Paragon Offshore Leasing (Luxembourg) S. r.l. 16-10410 ; Paragon Drilling Services 7 LLC 16-10387 ; Paragon Offshore Leasing (Switzerland) GmbH 16-10389 ; Paragon Offshore do Brasil Ltda. 16-10390 ; Paragon Asset (ME) Ltd. 16-10392 ; Paragon Asset (UK) Ltd. 16-10394 ; Paragon Offshore International Ltd. 16-10396 ; Paragon Offshore (North Sea) Ltd. 16-10397 ; Paragon (Middle East) Limited 16-10399 ; Paragon Holding NCS 2 S. r.l. 16-10401 ; Paragon Leonard Jones LLC 16-10402 ; Paragon Offshore (Nederland) B.V. 16-10404 ; and Paragon Offshore Contracting GmbH 16-10405 . The docket in Case No. 16-10386 (CSS) should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Signed on 2/17/2016 (JAF) |
|
3 | 3
crditcrd
none
Wed 02/17 9:27 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 16-10393 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 7900762, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Monday, February 15, 2016 | ||
court
Case Assigned
Mon 02/15 12:01 AM
Judge Christopher S. Sontchi added to case. (Drechsler, Stacey) |
||
Sunday, February 14, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Motion for Joint Administration Filed by PGN Offshore Drilling (Malaysia) Sdn. Bhd., Paragon (Middle East) Limited, Paragon Asset (ME) Ltd., Paragon Asset (UK) Ltd., Paragon Asset Company Ltd., Paragon Drilling Services 7 LLC, Paragon Duchess, Ltd., Paragon FDR Holdings Ltd., Paragon Holding NCS 2 S.a.r.l., Paragon Holding SCS 1 Ltd., Paragon Holding SCS 2 Ltd., Paragon International Finance Company, Paragon Leonard Jones LLC, Paragon Offshore (Labuan) Pte. Ltd., Paragon Offshore (Luxembourg) S. r.l., Paragon Offshore (Nederland) B.V., Paragon Offshore (North Sea) Ltd., Paragon Offshore Contracting GmbH, Paragon Offshore Drilling LLC, Paragon Offshore Finance Company, Paragon Offshore Holdings US Inc., Paragon Offshore International Ltd., Paragon Offshore Leasing (Luxembourg) S.a r.l., Paragon Offshore Leasing (Switzerland) GmbH, Paragon Offshore do Brasil Ltda., Paragon Offshore plc. (Collins, Mark) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by Paragon Offshore Holdings US Inc.. (Collins, Mark) |