Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:J Kate Stickles
Case #: 1:16-bk-10386
Case Filed:Feb 14, 2016
Creditor Meeting:Mar 24, 2016
Terminated:Nov 30, 2022
Plan Confirmed:Jun 07, 2017

TypeOther Entity Type
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors10,001-25,000
Est. Assets$1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Est. Liabilities $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Paragon Offshore plc

,
Represented By
Daniel H. Golden
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
contact info
Robert J. Stearn, Jr.
Richards, Layton & Finger, P. A.
contact info
Stephen A. Youngman
Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP
contact info
Alexis Freeman
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
contact info
Joseph Charles Barsalona II
Morris Nichols Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Christopher M. Lopez
Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP
contact info
Gary T. Holtzer
Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP
contact info
Amanda R. Steele
Richards, Layton And Finger
contact info
Bruce S. Meyer
Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP
contact info
Alfredo R. Perez
Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP
contact info
Peter D. Isakoff
Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP
contact info
Mark D. Collins
Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A.
contact info
Edward Soto
Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP
contact info
Paul R. Genender
Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP
contact info
Edward R. McCarthy
Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP
contact info
Jessica Liou
Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP
contact info
Christopher Michael De Lillo
Richards, Layton & Finger, P. A.
contact info
Last checked: Friday Jan 18, 2019 1:03 PM EST
Attorney
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
Attorney
Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP
Attorney
Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP
Represented By
Joseph Charles Barsalona II
Morris Nichols Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Attorney
Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A.
Attorney
Clyde & Co LLP
Represented By
Amanda R. Steele
Richards, Layton And Finger
contact info
Attorney
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
Auditor
BDO USA, LLP
Claims Agent
Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC
www.kccllc.com 2335 Alaska Ave
El Segundo, CA 90245
Represented By
Albert Kass
Kurtzman Carson Consultants, LLC
contact info
Creditor
Engie
Creditor
DC Capital Advisors, Ltd.
Represented By
Mark E. Felger
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Karen B. Dine
Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
contact info
Jerry L. Hall
Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
contact info
Jerry Hall
Kiatten Muchin Rosenman LLP
contact info
Creditor
Marcel De Groot
Represented By
Mark E. Felger
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Karen B. Dine
Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
contact info
Jerry L. Hall
Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
contact info
Simon E. Fraser
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Rebecca Kinburn
Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
contact info
Creditor
United States/USAO
U.S. Attorney's Office 1007 N. Orange Street Suite 700
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Ellen Slights
contact info
Creditor
Travis County
P.O. Box 1748
Austin, TX 78767
Represented By
Kay Diebel Brock
Travis County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Creditor
Iron Mountain Information Management, LLC
One Federal Street
Boston, MA 02110
Represented By
Joseph Corrigan
Iron Mountain Information Management, Ll
contact info
Creditor
Michael Eaglin
Represented By
Maria Aprile Sawczuk
Goldstein & Mcclintock Lllp
contact info
Creditor
Harris County
Post Office Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253
Represented By
John P. Dillman
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
United States of America on Behalf of the Internal Revenue Service
Represented By
Ward W. Benson
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Creditor
Fort Bend County
Post Office Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253
Represented By
John P. Dillman
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Fort Bend Independent School District
Represented By
Owen M. Sonik
Perdue, Brandon, Fielder, Collins & Mott
contact info
Yolanda Michelle Humphrey
Perdue Brandon Fielder Collins & Mott
contact info
Creditor
GPI Briarpark Green, LP
Represented By
Monica S. Blacker
Jackson Walker L.L.P.
contact info
Creditor
Michael Hammersley
Represented By
Mark E. Felger
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Karen B. Dine
Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
contact info
Jerry L. Hall
Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
contact info
Simon E. Fraser
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Rebecca Kinburn
Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
contact info
Creditor
CyrusOne LLC
Glenn Rogers PLLC 11610 Bee Caves Rd Suite 220
Austin, TX 78738
Represented By
Marvin E Sprouse, III
Sprouse Law Firm
contact info
Creditor
Cypress Fairbanks ISD
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP c/o John P. Dillman P.O. Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253
Represented By
John P. Dillman
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Arthur R. Lehmann
2152 Park Drive
Arnold, MO 63010
Creditor
Oracle America, Inc.
Buchalter Nemer PC Shawn M. Christianson 55 Second Street, 17th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94105
Represented By
Shawn M. Christianson
Buchalter P.C.
contact info
Creditor
CEVA Freight, LLC
Represented By
Noel C. Burnham
Burnham Law Associates, LLC
contact info
Creditor
Tannor Partners Credit Fund LP
150 Grand Street, Suite 401
White Plains, NY 10601
Creditor
Riverside Claims LLC
PO Box 626 Planetarium Station
New York, NY 10024
Represented By
Neil Herskowitz
Riverside Contracting
contact info
Creditor
Alief Independent School District
Represented By
Owen M. Sonik
Perdue, Brandon, Fielder, Collins & Mott
contact info
Creditor
Water Quality Insurance Syndicate (WQIS)
Represented By
Stephen L. Williamson
Gordon Arata Montgomery Barnett
contact info
Michael E. Landis
Montgomery Barnett, L.L.P.
contact info
Creditor
SAP America, Inc.
Brown & Connery, LLP Donald K. Ludman, Esquire 6 N. Broad Street Suite 100
Woodbury, NJ 08096
Represented By
Donald K. Ludman
Brown & Connery LLP
contact info
Creditor
Sodexo, Inc.
Represented By
Judy D. Thompson
Jd Thompson Law
contact info
Creditor Committee
OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS
Represented By
Jaime Luton Chapman
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info
Moses Silverman
Paul Weiss Rifkind Wharton & Garrison Ll
contact info
Elizabeth Soper Justison
Young Conaway
contact info
James Johnston
Jones Day
contact info
Jennifer L. Del Medico
Jones Day
contact info
Brian S. Hermann
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison
contact info
Robert N. Kravitz
Paul Weiss Rifkind Wharton Eta.
contact info
Genna L. Ghaul
Jones Day
contact info
Sidney P. Levinson
Jones Day
contact info
Pauline K. Morgan
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info
Crystal Johnson
Paul Weiss Rifkind Wharton Garrison LLP
contact info
Michael S. Neiburg
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info
Samuel E. Lovett
Paul Weiss Rifkind Wharton & Garrison Ll
contact info
Kellie A. Cairns
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison
contact info
Joel A. Waite
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor
contact info
Andrew N. Rosenberg
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison
contact info
Geoffrey S. Stewart
Jones Day
contact info
Bruce Bennett
Jones Day
contact info
Jeanne L. John
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison
contact info
Oksana Lashko
Paul Weiss Rifkind Wharton &
contact info
Aidan Synnott
Paul Weiss Rifkind Wharton Garrison LLP
contact info
Fee Examiner
David M. Klauder
Bielli & Klauder, LLC 1204 N. King Street
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
David M. Klauder
Bielli & Klauder, LLC
contact info
Cory P. Stephenson
Bielli & Klauder, LLC
contact info
Financial Advisor
AlixPartners LLP
Financial Advisor
Ducera Partners LLC
Interested Party
Certain holders of the 6.75% Senior Notes due 2022 and the 7.25% Senior Notes due 2024
Represented By
Elizabeth R. McColm
contact info
Maris J. Kandestin
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Elizabeth Soper Justison
Young Conaway
contact info
Andrew N. Rosenberg
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison
contact info
Pauline K. Morgan
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info
Jeanne L. John
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison
contact info
Oksana Lashko
Paul Weiss Rifkind Wharton &
contact info
Interested Party
Symmetry, LLC
Represented By
Gregory A. Taylor
Ashby & Geddes
contact info
Interested Party
Ezequiel Mariano Aiello
Interested Party
Bjarne Ryland
Interested Party
Aspen American Insurance Company
Represented By
Beth J. Rotenberg
Chiesa Shahinian & Giantomasi PC
contact info
Scott A Zuber
Chiesa Shahinian & Giantomasi PC
contact info
Scott Alan Zuber
Chiesa Shahinian & Giantomasi PC
contact info
Thomas Joseph Francella, Jr.
Whiteford Taylor Preston LLC
contact info
Interested Party
Aspen Insurance UK Limited
Represented By
Beth J. Rotenberg
Chiesa Shahinian & Giantomasi PC
contact info
Scott A Zuber
Chiesa Shahinian & Giantomasi PC
contact info
Scott Alan Zuber
Chiesa Shahinian & Giantomasi PC
contact info
Thomas Joseph Francella, Jr.
Whiteford Taylor Preston LLC
contact info
Interested Party
The Unofficial Equity Committee of the Shareholders of Paragon Offshore, plc.
Interested Party
David Carnes
Represented By
Kevin A. Guerke
Baird Mandalas Brockstedt, LLC
contact info
Interested Party
Paragon Litigation Trust
Represented By
Jeffrey Zeiger
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
David J. Zott
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Laura Davis Jones
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Anne I. Salomon
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
William E. Arnault
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Timothy P. Cairns
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Michael S. Neiburg
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Cortland Capital Market Services L.L.C.
Represented By
Etta Ren Wolfe
Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Cortland Capital Market Services L.L.C. as successor in interest to JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. as administrative agent under the Senior Secured Loan Agreement, dated as of July 18, 2014
Represented By
R. Stephen McNeill
Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP
contact info
Scott D. Talmadge
Kaye Scholer LLP
contact info
Etta R. Mayers
Potter Anderson & Corroon, LLP
contact info
Jeremy William Ryan
Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP
contact info
Jeffrey Fuisz
Kaye Scholer LLP
contact info
David Ryan Slaugh
Potter Anderson & Corron LLP
contact info
Emery A. Abdel-Latif
Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP
contact info
Mark F. Liscio
Kaye Scholer LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Noble Corporation plc
Represented By
George A. Zimmerman
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Jay M Goffman
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Shana A. Elberg
Meagher & Flom, LLP
contact info
Sarah E. Pierce
contact info
Stephen Della Penna
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Lauren E. Aguiar
Skadden Arps, Slate, Et Al
contact info
Wallis M. Hampton
Skadden Arps Slate, Al Et
contact info
Interested Party
Moody's Investors Service, Inc.
Represented By
Pamela A. Bosswick
Satterlee Stephens Burke & Burke LLP
contact info
Christopher R. Belmonte
Satterlee Stephens Burke & Burke LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Thompson Coburn LLP
Interested Party
Cortland Capital Market Services LLC as successor in interest to JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. as administrative agent under the Senior Secured Loan Agreement, dated as of July 18, 2014
Represented By
R. Stephen McNeill
Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP
contact info
John A. Sensing
Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP
contact info
Benjamin Mintz
Kaye Scholer LLP
contact info
Jeremy William Ryan
Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP
contact info
Ryan M. Murphy
Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP
contact info
H. Peter Haveles, Jr.
Kaye Scholer LLP
contact info
Madlyn Gleich Primoff
Kay Scholer LLP
contact info
Etta Ren Wolfe
Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP
contact info
Steven Fruchter
Freshfields Bruckhaus, Et Al
contact info
Interested Party
Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas
Represented By
Crystal R. Axelrod
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Joshua Dorchak
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP
contact info
Glenn E Siegel
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
James O Moore
Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Matthew C. Ziegler
Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Jody C. Barillare
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Interested Party
USB Switzerland AG
Interested Party
JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By
Nicholas Baker
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP
contact info
Mary B Forshaw
Simpson Thacher And Bartlett LLP
contact info
Matthew T. O'Connor
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP
contact info
Travis J. Ferguson
Landis Rath & Cobb LLP
contact info
Uzezi Abugo
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP
contact info
Matthew Stichinsky
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP
contact info
Kimberly A. Brown
Landis Rath & Cobb LLP
contact info
Megan A. Tweed
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP
contact info
Leah Barnes
Simpson Thacher & Barlett LLP
contact info
Kerri K. Mumford
Landis Rath & Cobb LLP
contact info
Sandeep Qusba
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP
contact info
M. Faye Shin
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP
contact info
Ariana Sahar Watson
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP
contact info
Morris J Massel
contact info
Kathrine A. McLendon
Simpson Thacher And Bartlett LLP
contact info
Bryce L. Friedman
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP
contact info
Michael Brasky
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP
contact info
Adam G. Landis
Landis Rath & Cobb LLP
contact info
Other Prof.
Tauil & Chequer Advogados
Other Prof.
PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP
Other Prof.
Lazard Freres & Co. LLC
Other Prof.
Ernst & Young LLP
Other Prof.
Deloitte LLP
Other Prof.
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
Spec. Counsel
Jones Day
Stockholder
Sanjay Mehta
1554 Manasco Circle
Folsom, CA 95630
Stockholder
Thomas Waller
POB 103
Fifty Lakes, MN 65448
Transcriber
Reliable Companies
1007 North Orange Street Suite 110
Wilmington, DE 19801
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19899
Represented By
Benjamin A. Hackman
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info
Natalie M. Cox
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
844 King Street, Room 2207 Lockbox #35
Wilmington, DE 19899

GPO Aug 06 2018
Opinion (CAS)
GPO Mar 11 2019
Opinion (CAS)

1. Paragon Offshore emerges from Chapter 11 Bankruptcy (splash247.com)
Submitted Thu 07/20/2017
2. Paragon Offshore tumbles into Chapter 11 bankruptcy (usatoday.com)
Submitted Tue 02/16/2016
Docket last updated: 55 minutes ago
Wednesday, January 11, 2023
2303 2303 misc Certificate of Service Wed 01/11 8:02 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Paragon Offshore plc. (Steele, Amanda)
Related: [-] 2302
2302 2302 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Wed 01/11 7:10 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for the Quarter Ending: 12/31/2022 Filed by Paragon Offshore plc. (Steele, Amanda)
Related: [-]