Member Case
Lead case is: 1:16-bk-10386

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Christopher S Sontchi
Case #: 1:16-bk-10410
Case Filed:Feb 14, 2016
Terminated:Jan 09, 2018

TypeOther Entity Type
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors10,001-25,000
Est. Assets$1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Est. Liabilities $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Paragon Offshore Leasing (Luxembourg) S.a r.l.

,
Represented By
Mark D. Collins
Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
844 King Street, Room 2207 Lockbox #35
Wilmington, DE 19899


Docket last updated: 12 minutes ago
Tuesday, January 09, 2018
court Close Bankruptcy Case Tue 01/09 2:47 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (DMC)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2018
7 7 9 pgs order Order Mon 01/08 2:39 PM
Order Closing Certain Chapter 11 Cases. Signed on 1/8/2018 (NAB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 14, 2016
6 6 misc Schedules/Statements Thu 04/14 11:16 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by Paragon Offshore Leasing (Luxembourg) S.a r.l.. (Steele, Amanda)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Schedules/Statements Thu 04/14 11:15 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by Paragon Offshore Leasing (Luxembourg) S.a r.l.. (Steele, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 18, 2016
4 4 crditcrd none Thu 02/18 1:37 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 16-10410 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 7903218, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 17, 2016
3 3 order Order-Joint Admin Wed 02/17 12:22 PM
Order Authorizing Joint Administration. An order has been entered in this case directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of Paragon Offshore plc 16-10386 ; Paragon Offshore Finance Company 16-10388 ; Paragon International Finance Company 16-10391 ; Paragon Offshore Holdings US Inc. 16-10393 ; Paragon Offshore Drilling LLC 16-10385 ; Paragon FDR Holdings Ltd 16-10395 ; Paragon Duchess Ltd. 16-10398 ; Paragon Offshore (Luxembourg) S. r.l 16-10400 ;PGN Offshore Drilling (Malaysia) Sdn. Bhd 16-10403 ;Paragon Offshore (Labuan) Pte. Ltd. 16-10406 ; Paragon Holding SCS 2 Ltd. 16-10407 ; Paragon Asset Company Ltd. 16-10408 ; Paragon Holding SCS 1 Ltd 16-10409 ; Paragon Offshore Leasing (Luxembourg) S. r.l. 16-10410 ; Paragon Drilling Services 7 LLC 16-10387 ; Paragon Offshore Leasing (Switzerland) GmbH 16-10389 ; Paragon Offshore do Brasil Ltda. 16-10390 ; Paragon Asset (ME) Ltd. 16-10392 ; Paragon Asset (UK) Ltd. 16-10394 ; Paragon Offshore International Ltd. 16-10396 ; Paragon Offshore (North Sea) Ltd. 16-10397 ; Paragon (Middle East) Limited 16-10399 ; Paragon Holding NCS 2 S. r.l. 16-10401 ; Paragon Leonard Jones LLC 16-10402 ; Paragon Offshore (Nederland) B.V. 16-10404 ; and Paragon Offshore Contracting GmbH 16-10405 . The docket in Case No. 16-10386 (CSS) should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Signed on 2/17/2016 (JAF)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 15, 2016
court Case Assigned Mon 02/15 12:01 AM
Judge Christopher S. Sontchi added to case. (Drechsler, Stacey)
Related: [-]
Sunday, February 14, 2016
2 2 motion Joint Administration - Motion (Multi) Sun 02/14 8:25 PM
Motion for Joint Administration Filed by PGN Offshore Drilling (Malaysia) Sdn. Bhd., Paragon (Middle East) Limited, Paragon Asset (ME) Ltd., Paragon Asset (UK) Ltd., Paragon Asset Company Ltd., Paragon Drilling Services 7 LLC, Paragon Duchess, Ltd., Paragon FDR Holdings Ltd., Paragon Holding NCS 2 S.a.r.l., Paragon Holding SCS 1 Ltd., Paragon Holding SCS 2 Ltd., Paragon International Finance Company, Paragon Leonard Jones LLC, Paragon Offshore (Labuan) Pte. Ltd., Paragon Offshore (Luxembourg) S. r.l., Paragon Offshore (Nederland) B.V., Paragon Offshore (North Sea) Ltd., Paragon Offshore Contracting GmbH, Paragon Offshore Drilling LLC, Paragon Offshore Finance Company, Paragon Offshore Holdings US Inc., Paragon Offshore International Ltd., Paragon Offshore Leasing (Luxembourg) S.a r.l., Paragon Offshore Leasing (Switzerland) GmbH, Paragon Offshore do Brasil Ltda., Paragon Offshore plc. (Collins, Mark)
Related: [-]
1 1 24 pgs misc RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Sun 02/14 8:13 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by Paragon Offshore Leasing (Luxembourg) S.a r.l.. (Collins, Mark)
Related: [-]