North Carolina Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stephani W Humrickhouse
Case #: 8:12-bk-01855
Case Filed:Mar 09, 2012
Terminated:Apr 02, 2014

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Brier Creek Corporate Center Associates Limited Partnership
3700 Arco Corporate Dr Ste 350
Charlotte, NC 28273-7129
Represented By
Vicki L. Parrott
Northen Blue, LLP
contact info
John A. Northen
Northen Blue, LLP
contact info
Accountant
Grant Thornton, LLP
Appraiser
Bidencope & Associates
Bankruptcy Administrator
Bankruptcy Administrator
Creditor
Amdocs, Inc.
Creditor
Bank Of America N.A.
Creditor
Bank Of America, N.A.
Creditor
Bank Of America, NA
Creditor
Novant Health
Creditor
Oracle America, Inc.
Creditor
Qualcomm Incorporated
Creditor
The John R. McAdams Company, Inc.
Creditor
TP Triangle Construction, LLC
Creditor
Wake County Department of Revenue
Debtor
Brier Creek Corporate Center Associates Limited Partnership
Interested Party
AAC Investments, Inc., et. al.
Interested Party
Ballroom Dance Center, Inc.
Interested Party
Campbell Alliance Group, Inc.
Interested Party
Qualcomm Incorporated
Interested Party
Strategic Pharma Solutions, LLC
Interested Party
Surety Systems, Inc.
Officer
Terry Bradshaw
Special Counsel
C. Richard Rayburn
Special Counsel
Rayburn Cooper & Durham, P.A.

GPO Jan 14 2013
Order Granting. Judge Entering Opinion: SWH (RE: related document(s)305 Motion to Stay Arbitration filed by Shelley K. Abel on behalf of Rayburn Cooper & Durham, P.A). Appeal time due 1/28/2013. (Bissette, Amy)
GPO Jan 18 2013
Order Regarding Debtors' Limited Objections to Claims of Bank of America, N.A.. Judge Entering Opinion: SWH (RE: related document(s)230 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Brier Creek Corporate Center Associates Limited Partnership, 231 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Brier Creek Corporate Center Associates Limited Partnership, 232 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Brier Creek Corporate Center Associates Limited Partnership, 233 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Brier Creek Corporate Center Associates Limited Partnership, 234 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Brier Creek Corporate Center Associates Limited Partnership, 235 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Brier Creek Corporate Center Associates Limited Partnership, 236 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Brier Creek Corporate Center Associates Limited Partnership, 237 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Brier Creek Corporate Center Associates Limited Partnership, 238 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Brier Creek Corporate Center Associates Limited Partnership). Appeal time due 2/1/2013. (Gurgone, Christy)
GPO Feb 12 2013
Order Denying. Judge Entering Opinion: SWH (RE: related document(s)350 Motion To Stay Pending Appeal filed by Creditor Bank Of America, N.A.). Appeal time due 2/26/2013. (Gurgone, Christy)
GPO May 29 2013
Order Denying Bankruptcy Administrator's Objection, Granting Application for Compensation. Judge Entering Opinion: SWH (RE: related document(s)388 Application for Compensation). Appeal time due 6/12/2013. (Gurgone, Christy)

Docket last updated: 03/24/2012 8:01 PM EDT
Friday, March 09, 2012
Receipt Of Filing Fee For Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 12-01855 8) [misc,volp11] (1046.00), Receipt Number 7528218, Amount $1046.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
NOTE: Case Manager Assigned To Case Is Christy Gurgone (Roberson, Tina)
Related: [-]
1 1 26 pgs Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Brier Creek Corporate Center Associates Limited Partnership (Northen, John)
Related: [-]
2 2 Corporate Resolution filed by Vicki L. Parrott on behalf of Brier Creek Corporate Center Associates Limited Partnership. (Parrott, Vicki)
Related: [-]
3 3 Application To Employ Northen Blue, LLP as Bankruptcy Counsel for Debtors. filed by John A. Northen on behalf of Brier Creek Corporate Center Associates Limited Partnership Recommendation due 3/23/2012. (Northen, John) **Certificate of Service By Docket Entry26 .** Modified on 3/14/2012 (Gurgone, Christy).
Related: [-]
4 4 Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/12/2012 at 10:00 AM at Raleigh 341 Meeting Room. Proofs of Claims due by 7/11/2012. Government Proof of Claim due by 9/5/2012. (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-]
5 5 Order To Appear For Examination (Terry Bradshaw) . (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-]
6 6 Order Regarding Administration Of Estate . (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-]
7 7 Deficiency Notice. Deficiency Of: Statement of Financial Affairs. Incomplete Filings due by 3/23/2012. (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-]
8 8 Motion To Consolidate Lead Case 12-1855 With Member Case 12-1856 12-1857 12-1858 12-1859 12-1860 12-1862 12-1863 12-1864 Motion For Joint Administration Lead Case 12-1855 With 12-1856 12-1857 12-1858 12-1859 12-1860 12-1862 12-1863 12-1864 Motion to Limit Notice to 20 Largest Consolidated Unsecured Creditors Filed by John A. Northen on behalf of Brier Creek Corporate Center Associates Limited Partnership, Brier Creek Office #4, LLC, Brier Creek Office #6, LLC, Service Retail at Brier Creek, LLC, Service Retail at Whitehall II Limited Partnership, Shopton Ridge 30-C, LLC, Whitehall Corporate Center #4, LLC, Whitehall Corporate Center #5, LLC, Whitehall Corporate Center #6, LLC. Responses due by 4/2/2012. (Northen, John) **Notice Amended By Docket Entry21 .** Modified on 3/14/2012 (Gurgone, Christy).
Related: [-]
9 9 Motion For Continuation Of Utility Service, Motion To Increase Assurance Payment, Motion To Establish A Procedure filed by John A. Northen on behalf of Brier Creek Corporate Center Associates Limited Partnership Responses due by 04/2/2012. (Northen, John) **Notice of Motion Amended By Docket Entry20 .** Modified on 3/14/2012 (Gurgone, Christy).
Related: [-]
10 10 Note To Courtroom Deputy - Schedule Hearing Date 11a Status Conference (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-]
11 11 Application To Employ Rayburn Cooper & Durham, P.A. as Special Counsel. filed by Vicki L. Parrott on behalf of Brier Creek Corporate Center Associates Limited Partnership Recommendation due 3/23/2012. (Parrott, Vicki) **Certificate of Service By Docket Entry26 .** Modified on 3/14/2012 (Gurgone, Christy).
Related: [-]
12 12 Application To Employ Grant Thornton LLP as Accountants. filed by Vicki L. Parrott on behalf of Brier Creek Corporate Center Associates Limited Partnership Recommendation due 3/23/2012. (Parrott, Vicki) **Certificate of Service By Docket Entry26 .** Modified on 3/14/2012 (Gurgone, Christy).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit