Member Case
Lead case is: 8:12-bk-01855

North Carolina Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stephani W Humrickhouse
Case #: 8:12-bk-01863
Case Filed:Mar 09, 2012
Terminated:Jan 15, 2014

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Single Asset Real Estate
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Whitehall Corporate Center #5, LLC
3700 Arco Corporate Dr Ste 350
Charlotte, NC 28273-7129
Represented By
Vicki L. Parrott
Northen Blue, LLP
contact info
John A. Northen
Northen Blue, LLP
contact info

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 03/24/2012 8:06 PM EDT
Friday, March 09, 2012
Receipt Of Filing Fee For Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 12-01863 8) [misc,volp11] (1046.00), Receipt Number 7528634, Amount $1046.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
NOTE: Case Manager Assigned To Case Is Christy Gurgone (Roberson, Tina)
Related: [-]
1 1 30+ pgs Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Whitehall Corporate Center #5, LLC (Northen, John)
Related: [-]
2 2 Corporate Resolution filed by Vicki L. Parrott on behalf of Whitehall Corporate Center #5, LLC. (Parrott, Vicki)
Related: [-]
3 3 Application To Employ Northen Blue, LLP as Bankruptcy Counsel for Debtors. filed by John A. Northen on behalf of Whitehall Corporate Center #5, LLC Recommendation due 3/23/2012. (Northen, John) **Certificate of Service By Docket Entry25 .** Modified on 3/19/2012 (Gurgone, Christy).
Related: [-]
4 4 Motion To Consolidate Lead Case 12-1855 With Member Case 12-1856 12-1857 12-1858 12-1859 12-1860 12-1862 12-1863 12-1864 Motion For Joint Administration Lead Case 12-1855 With 12-1856 12-1857 12-1858 12-1859 12-1860 12-1862 12-1863 12-1864 Motion to Limit Notice to 20 Largest Consolidated Unsecured Creditors Filed by John A. Northen on behalf of Brier Creek Corporate Center Associates Limited Partnership, Brier Creek Office #4, LLC, Brier Creek Office #6, LLC, Service Retail at Brier Creek, LLC, Service Retail at Whitehall II Limited Partnership, Shopton Ridge 30-C, LLC, Whitehall Corporate Center #4, LLC, Whitehall Corporate Center #5, LLC, Whitehall Corporate Center #6, LLC. Responses due by 4/2/2012. (Northen, John) **Amended Notice of Motion By Docket Entry21 .** Modified on 3/19/2012 (Gurgone, Christy).
Related: [-]
5 5 Motion For Continuation Of Utility Service, Motion To Increase Assurance Payment, Motion To Establish A Procedure filed by John A. Northen on behalf of Whitehall Corporate Center #5, LLC Responses due by 04/2/2012. (Northen, John) **Amended Notice of Motion By Docket Entry20 .** Modified on 3/19/2012 (Gurgone, Christy).
Related: [-]
6 6 Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/12/2012 at 10:00 AM at Raleigh 341 Meeting Room. Proofs of Claims due by 7/11/2012. Government Proof of Claim due by 9/5/2012. (Brock, Anna)
Related: [-]
7 7 Order To Appear For Examination (Terry Bradshaw) . (Brock, Anna)
Related: [-]
8 8 Order Regarding Administration Of Estate . (Brock, Anna)
Related: [-]
9 9 Deficiency Notice. Deficiency Of: Statement of Affairs. Incomplete Filings due by 3/23/2012. (Brock, Anna)
Related: [-]
10 10 Note To Courtroom Deputy - Schedule Hearing Date 11a Status Conference (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-]
11 11 Application To Employ Rayburn Cooper & Durham, P.A. as Special Counsel. filed by Vicki L. Parrott on behalf of Whitehall Corporate Center #5, LLC Recommendation due 3/23/2012. (Parrott, Vicki) **Certificate of Service By Docket Entry25 .** Modified on 3/19/2012 (Gurgone, Christy).
Related: [-]
12 12 Application To Employ Grant Thornton LLP as Accountants. filed by Vicki L. Parrott on behalf of Whitehall Corporate Center #5, LLC Recommendation due 3/23/2012. (Parrott, Vicki) **Certificate of Service By Docket Entry25 .** Modified on 3/19/2012 (Gurgone, Christy).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit