Lax v. The City University of New York et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Lashann Dearcy Hall |
Referred: | Vera M Scanlon |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-00799 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment) |
Case Filed: | Feb 16, 2016 |
Terminated: | Oct 22, 2020 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 14, 2016 5:27 AM EDT |
Defendant
Stuart Suss
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The City University of New York
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeffrey Lax
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, February 01, 2022 | ||
75 | 75
appeal
USCA Mandate
Tue 02/01 9:43 AM
MANDATE of USCA as to73 Notice of Appeal filed by Jeffrey Lax. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that the Judgment of the District Court is AFFIRMED. Issued as Mandate: 2/1/2022. USCA# 20-3907 (Jones, Vasean) |