Original Case: 1:16-cv-00799

Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:20-cv-03907
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Case Filed:Nov 19, 2020
Terminated:Jan 11, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 12, 2022 3:33 AM EST
Defendant - Appellee
The City University of New York
Represented By
James Edward Johnson
Corporation Counsel of the City of New York
contact info
Tahirih Mehrie Sadrieh
New York City Law Department
contact info
Richard Paul Dearing
New York City Law Department
contact info
Eric Lee
New York City Law Department
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Stuart Suss
Represented By
James Edward Johnson
Corporation Counsel of the City of New York
contact info
Tahirih Mehrie Sadrieh
New York City Law Department
contact info
Richard Paul Dearing
New York City Law Department
contact info
Eric Lee
New York City Law Department
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Jeffrey Lax
Represented By
Corey S. Stark
Corey Stark PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/12/2022 3:30 AM EST
Thursday, November 19, 2020
1 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Jeffrey Lax, FILED. [2978318] 20-3907 [Entered: 11/19/2020 03:25 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax
Att: 2 13 pgs Case FILED
2 2 20 pgs DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, dated 10/21/2020, RECEIVED.[2978321] 20-3907 [Entered: 11/19/2020 03:28 PM]
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 10/22/2020, RECEIVED.[2978322] 20-3907 [Entered: 11/19/2020 03:28 PM]
Related: [-]
4 4 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Jeffrey Lax, district court receipt # ANYEDC-13706066, FILED.[2978330] 20-3907 [Entered: 11/19/2020 03:32 PM]
Related: [-]