Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-81004

Louisiana Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:John W Kolwe
Case #: 1:16-ap-08006
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Feb 18, 2016
Terminated:Jun 13, 2016
Last checked: never
Defendant
Terrebonne General Medical Center
President and CEO 8166 Main Street
Houma, LA 70360
Represented By
Terrebonne General Medical Center
contact info
Plaintiff
Ted Brett Brunson
POB 12
Natchitoches, LA 71457
Represented By
John W. Luster
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:07 PM CDT
Monday, June 13, 2016
utility Disposition of Adversary Mon 06/13 10:19 AM
Disposition of Adversary - Dismissed. Judgment For Plaintiff. (mela)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Mon 06/13 10:51 AM
Adversary Case 16AP-8006 Closed. (mela)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 07, 2016
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 05/08 12:04 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 05/07/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Order on Application to Approve Compromise
Thursday, May 05, 2016
7 7 order Approve Compromise Thu 05/05 4:13 PM
Order Granting Related [+]. (mela)
Related: [-] 5 Application to Approve Compromise of Adversary filed by Plaintiff Ted Brett Brunson
Wednesday, May 04, 2016
court Hearing - Minute Entry Held or Continued Re: Wed 05/04 10:04 AM
Hearing - Minute Entry Re: Related [+]. Application Approved; E-Order will be signed. (kels)
Related: [-] 5 Application to Approve Compromise
Monday, April 11, 2016
6 6 notice Hearing Notice Served. (Definite Hearing) Mon 04/11 11:39 AM
Notice of Hearing Served on Related [+] with Certificate of Service . Filed by John W. Luster on behalf of Ted Brett Brunson Hearing scheduled for 5/4/2016 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom, 2nd Floor, Alexandria. (Luster, John)
Related: [-] 5 Application to Approve Compromise
5 5 motion Approve Compromise Mon 04/11 11:38 AM
Application to Approve Compromise Related [+] of Adversary Proceeding with Exhibit "A" Filed by John W. Luster on behalf of Ted Brett Brunson (Luster, John)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, February 23, 2016
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Tue 02/23 1:03 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by John W. Luster on behalf of Ted Brett Brunson (Luster, John)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 02/23 1:02 PM
Summons Service Executed on Terrebonne General Medical Center 2/23/2016 . (Luster, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 19, 2016
2 2 court Summons Issued Fri 02/19 3:12 PM
Summons Issued on Terrebonne General Medical Center. Date Issued 2/19/2016, Answer Due 3/21/2016 (mela)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 18, 2016
1 1 cmp Complaint (Fee) Thu 02/18 4:33 PM
Adversary case 16-08006 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)): Complaint to Recover Preferential Transfer of Assets with Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet by Ted Brett Brunson (attorney John W. Luster) against Terrebonne General Medical Center. Fee Amount Due $350 (Luster, John)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Autodocket US Treasury Receipt Thu 02/18 4:39 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Complaint 16-08006 [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Related [+]. Receipt Number 16293525, in the Amount of $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1