Louisiana Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Stephen D Wheelis
Case #: 1:15-bk-81004
Case Filed:Sep 11, 2015
Creditor Meeting:Oct 27, 2015
Claims Deadline:Dec 15, 2015

Debtor
Louisiana Safety Association of Timberman - Self Insured Fund
PO Box 1439
Winnfield, LA 71483-1439
Represented By
Bradley L. Drell
contact info
Debtor
Louisiana Safety Association of Timbermen - Self Insured Fund
PO Box 1439
Winnfield, LA 71483-1439
Represented By
Bradley L. Drell
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Ted Brett Brunson
P.O. Box 12
Natchitoches, LA 71457
Represented By
John W. Luster
contact info
U.S. Trustee
Office of U. S. Trustee
300 Fannin St., Suite 3196
Shreveport, LA 71101
Represented By
Richard Drew
U. S. Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/11/2015 4:06 PM CDT
Friday, September 11, 2015
1 1 Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition. All Schedules, Statements and Disclosure of Compensation for Attorney. Receipt Number O, Fee Amount Due $335 Filed by Bradley L. Drell on behalf of Louisiana Safety Association of Timberman - Self Insured Fund. Declaration of ECF Filing due by 09/14/2015. Social Security Card due by 09/14/2015. Picture Identification Card due by 09/14/2015. (Drell, Bradley)
Related: [-]
2 2 Verification of Creditor Matrix. Related [+] Filed by Bradley L. Drell on behalf of Louisiana Safety Association of Timberman - Self Insured Fund (dian)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition Chapter 7
3 3 Schedule F, Creditors Holding Unsecured Nonpriority Claims in the Amount of $822883.89 Filed by Bradley L. Drell on behalf of Louisiana Safety Association of Timberman - Self Insured Fund (dian)
Related: [-]