Washington Eastern District Court
Judge:Salvador Mendoza, Jr
Case #: 4:16-cv-05023
Nature of Suit870 Federal Tax Suits - Taxes (U.S. Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause26:6703 IRS: Refund of Tax Penalty
Case Filed:Feb 25, 2016
Terminated:Aug 01, 2016
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 23, 2016 2:33 AM PDT
Defendant
Commissioner of Internal Revenue
Represented By
Charles J Butler
U.S. Department Of Justice - Tax Division
contact info
Plaintiff
Donald J Taylor
an individual and citizen of the State of Washington 100 N Morain Suite 202
Kennewick, WA 99336
Represented By
Charles H Hammer
Law Office Of Charles H Hammer
contact info

GPO Aug 01 2016
ORDER GRANTING UNITED STATES' MOTION TO DISMISS AND CLOSING FILE - granting 6 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr. (CC, Case Administrator)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, September 17, 2018
25 25 appeal 9CCA Mandate Mon 09/17 11:32 AM
MANDATE from 9CCA as to18 Notice of Appeal, filed by Donald J Taylor. Decision of the District Court is Affirmed. 9CCA: 16-35775 (TR, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 24, 2018
24 24 appeal 9CCA Slip Opinion Tue 07/24 11:27 AM
9CCA Slip Opinion: Decision of the District Court is AFFIRMED. 9CCA Case No. 16-35775 (TR, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 19, 2018
23 23 appeal 9CCA Order Tue 06/19 3:45 PM
COPY OF 9CCA ORDER SUBMITTING CASE WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT as to18 Notice of Appeal, filed by Donald J Taylor 9CCA: 16-35775 (TR, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 03, 2016
22 22 misc Transcript Mon 10/03 10:49 AM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing. Proceedings held on 7/28/2016 in Richland, WA before Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr. Page Numbers: 1-18 Parties have seven (7) business days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court website at www.waed.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/transcript_policy_notice_20130215.pdf. To purchase a copy of the transcript contact Court Reporter/Transcriber Kimberly J. Allen at 509-943-8175 or Kim_Allen@waed.uscourts.gov . Redaction Request due 10/24/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/3/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/3/2017. (Allen, Kim)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 26, 2016
21 21 appeal 9CCA Time Schedule Mon 09/26 3:00 PM
9CCA Appeal Time Schedule and Case Number: 16-35775 for18 Notice of Appeal filed by Donald J. Taylor. Designation Due: 10/26/16. Transcript Due: 11/25/16. Opening Brief Due: 1/4/17. Appellees Brief Due: 2/6/17. Mediation Questionnaire Due: 10/3/16. cc: Court Reporter: Kimberly Allen. (CC, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
20 20 appeal Letter - Appeal Mon 09/26 11:58 AM
Letter from Appeal Deputy Clerk to Charles H. Hammer dated September 26, 2016.(CC, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Appeal,
Att: 2 Docket sheet
19 19 appeal 9CCA Payment Notification Mon 09/26 11:57 AM
9CCA Payment Notification form regarding18 Notice of Appeal. Received $505, receipt number 0980-2439754. (CC, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
18 18 appeal 9CCA Notice of Appeal Mon 09/26 11:54 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL from District Court decision as to16 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction by Donald J. Taylor. cc: Court Reporter: Kimberly Allen. (CC, Case Administrator) 9CCA Appeal Case Number: 16-35775 Modified on 9/26/2016 (CC, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
17 17 appeal 9CCA Lodged Notice of Appeal Mon 09/26 11:01 AM
LODGED NOTICE OF APPEAL from District Court decision as to16 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction by Donald J Taylor. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0980-2439754.(Hammer, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, August 01, 2016
16 16 order Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Mon 08/01 10:28 AM
ORDER GRANTING UNITED STATES' MOTION TO DISMISS AND CLOSING FILE - granting6 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr. (CC, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 28, 2016
15 15 minutes Motion Hearing Thu 07/28 2:38 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr: Motion Hearing held on 7/28/2016 re6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Commissioner of Internal Revenue. Related [+] (DB, Courtroom Deputy)
Related: [-] ported/Recorded by: Kimberly Allen
Friday, July 15, 2016
14 14 notice Notice of Hearing on Motion - By Court Fri 07/15 11:20 AM
NOTICE of Hearing on Motion - By Court - Text entry;no PDF document. Oral Argument Requested re6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction : CHANGE IN TIME ONLY Scheduling Conference/Motion Hearing RESET for 7/28/2016 at 02:00 PM Richland Courtroom 189 before Judge Salvador Mendoza Jr. (DB, Courtroom Deputy)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Fri 07/15 11:21 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Scheduling Conference set for 7/28/2016 at 02:00 PM in Richland Courtroom 189 before Judge Salvador Mendoza Jr. (DB, Courtroom Deputy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 14, 2016
13 13 misc Attorney Report - LR 26.1 / LR 16.1 Thu 07/14 11:19 AM
LR 26.1 / LR 16.1 Attorney Report by Commissioner of Internal Revenue. (Butler, Charles)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 13, 2016
12 12 respm Reply Memorandum Wed 07/13 1:51 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM re6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Commissioner of Internal Revenue. (Butler, Charles)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 30, 2016
11 11 respm Response to Motion Thu 06/30 4:01 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Donald J Taylor. (Hammer, Charles)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 21, 2016
10 10 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 06/21 7:42 AM
ORDER: Before the Court without oral argument is Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to File Response to Defendant's Answer,9 . Having reviewed the pleadings the Court is fully informed and GRANTS the motion. The Plaintiff shall file the response by June 30, 2016. Signed by Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY ENTRY. NO PDF TO ISSUE. THIS CONSTITUTES THE COURT'S RULING/NOTICE ON THE MATTER. (DB, Courtroom Deputy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 16, 2016
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 06/16 4:13 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 7/28/2016 at 01:30 PM in Richland Courtroom 189 before Judge Salvador Mendoza Jr.(Hammer, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, June 14, 2016
8 8 notice Scheduling Conference Notice Tue 06/14 2:48 PM
SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE : Scheduling Conference set for 7/28/2016 at 01:30 PM in Richland Courtroom 189 before Judge Salvador Mendoza Jr.(DB, Courtroom Deputy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge
Tuesday, May 31, 2016
7 7 notice Notice of Hearing on Motion - By Court Tue 05/31 8:08 AM
NOTICE of Hearing on Motion - By Court - Text entry;no PDF document. Oral Argument Requested re6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction : Motion Hearing RESET for 7/28/2016 at 01:30 PM Richland Courtroom 189 before Judge Salvador Mendoza Jr. (DB, Courtroom Deputy)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 30, 2016
6 6 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Mon 05/30 8:46 AM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Commissioner of Internal Revenue. Motion Hearing set for 7/20/2016 at 10:00 AM in Richland Courtroom 189 before Judge Salvador Mendoza Jr.(Butler, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, April 29, 2016
5 5 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 04/29 10:24 AM
TEXT ORDER: Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint, ECF No.4 , is GRANTED . Defendant shall file an answer on or before Monday, May 30, 2016 . THIS IS A TEXT ONLY ENTRY; NO PDF WILL FOLLOW; THIS ENTRY CONSTITUTES THE COURT'S RULING/NOTICE ON THE MATTER. Signed by Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr. (MV, Judicial Assistant)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 15, 2016
4 4 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 04/15 10:27 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Commissioner of Internal Revenue. Motion Hearing set for 5/16/2016 Without Oral Argument before Judge Salvador Mendoza Jr.(Butler, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, March 02, 2016
3 3 service Certificate of Service Wed 03/02 2:10 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Donald J Taylor. (Hammer, Charles)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 25, 2016
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 02/25 4:48 PM
Summons Issued as to Commissioner of IRS. (CV, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 02/25 3:41 PM
COMPLAINT against Commissioner of IRS ( Filing fee $ 400; Receipt # 0980-2277045) Filed by Donald J Taylor.(Hammer, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons
notice Notice of Judge Assignment Thu 02/25 4:46 PM
Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr assigned to case. (CV, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]